This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/13/2021 at 06:14:20 (UTC).

William A. White v. M. Collis, et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 William A White filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against M Collis. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2881

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

WILLIAM A. WHITE

Marion, IL 62959-0000

Defendant / Appellees

M. COLLIS

KATHY HILL

FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS

BILL TRUE

D. CHRISTENSEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William A. White

Attorney at UNITED STATES PENITENTIARY

P.O. Box 1000

Marion, IL 62959-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Suzanne M. Garrison

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

Nine Executive Drive

Fairview Heights, IL 62208-0000

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Filed Reply by Appellant William A. White in 21-2835, 21-2881 to to Appellee's response to the motion to stay the District Court's total filing ban pending appeal. [20][7204578] [21-2835, 21-2881] (CAH) [Entered: 12/10/2021 02:22 PM]

#19

(#19) ORDER re: Appellee's motion to strike appellant's brief, filed on 12/8/2021. The appellant shall file a response to the motion to strike on or before December 23, 2021. In that response, appellant shall explain why this court should not summarily affirm the district courts judgment and impose a circuit-wide filing bar in light of his continuing to file sensitive documents in the public record after repeated warnings.JPK [19] [7204381] [21-2835, 21-2881] (FP) [Entered: 12/09/2021 04:34 PM]

#18

(#18) Motion filed by Appellee USA in 21-2835, Appellee BOP in 21-2881 to Strike Appellant's Brief. [18] [7204029] [21-2835, 21-2881] (Garrison, Suzanne) [Entered: 12/08/2021 01:36 PM]

#17

(#17) ORDER re: Motion For Leave to Present Supplemental Facts in Support of Appellant's Opening Brief and Pending Motions to Stay. [ # 15 ] The motion is DENIED. JPK [17] [7203556] [21-2835, 21-2881] (MM) [Entered: 12/06/2021 04:14 PM]

#16

(#16) ORDER re: Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee. [ # 14 ] A review of the docket indicates that the appellant paid the $505.00 appellate filing fees in both appeal nos. 21-2835 and 21-2881 in the district court. Accordingly, the motion for an extension of time to pay the filing fee is DENIED as unnecessary. SCR [16] [7203290] [21-2835, 21-2881] (MM) [Entered: 12/06/2021 08:13 AM]

7 #1

Motion (all other motions not listed below)

#6

(#6) FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [6][7199080] [21-2881] (CM) [Entered: 11/15/2021 10:52 AM]

#5

(#5) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant William A. White. [5] [7196138] [21-2881] (CAH) [Entered: 11/01/2021 03:36 PM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant William A. White. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7195813] [21-2881] (CMD) [Entered: 10/29/2021 04:05 PM]

#21

(#15) Pro se motion filed by Appellant William A. White in 21-2835, 21-2881 to present supplemental facts in support of appellant's opening brief and pending motions to stay. [15] [7203219] [21-2835, 21-2881] (MAN) [Entered: 12/03/2021 02:59 PM]

#20

(#14) Pro se motion filed by Appellant William A. White in 21-2881 for extension of time to pay filing fee. [14] [7203218] [21-2835, 21-2881] (MAN) [Entered: 12/03/2021 02:58 PM]

#19

(#13) 10 copies Appellant's brief filed by Appellant William A. White in 21-2881, 21-2835. Disk not required. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [13] [7202475] [21-2881, 21-2835] (CM) [Entered: 12/01/2021 10:36 AM]

#18

(#12) ORDER re: Motion for leave to file instanter, filed on 11/29/2021. In light of the courts briefing order dated November 16, 2021, the motion is unnecessary and will be filed without further court action. The clerk shall file INSTANTER the tendered brief of the appellant. CMD [12] [7202452] [21-2881, 21-2835] (FP) [Entered: 12/01/2021 09:56 AM]

#3

1 #4

Notice to District Court

1 #3

PLRA Fee Notice DC

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Rights Case

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Filed Reply by Appellant William A. White in 21-2835, 21-2881 to to Appellee's response to the motion to stay the District Court's total filing ban pending appeal. [20][7204578] [21-2835, 21-2881] (CAH) [Entered: 12/10/2021 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER re: Appellee's motion to strike appellant's brief, filed on 12/8/2021. The appellant shall file a response to the motion to strike on or before December 23, 2021. In that response, appellant shall explain why this court should not summarily affirm the district courts judgment and impose a circuit-wide filing bar in light of his continuing to file sensitive documents in the public record after repeated warnings.JPK [19] [7204381] [21-2835, 21-2881] (FP) [Entered: 12/09/2021 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Motion filed by Appellee USA in 21-2835, Appellee BOP in 21-2881 to Strike Appellant's Brief. [18] [7204029] [21-2835, 21-2881] (Garrison, Suzanne) [Entered: 12/08/2021 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER re: Motion For Leave to Present Supplemental Facts in Support of Appellant's Opening Brief and Pending Motions to Stay. [ # 15 ] The motion is DENIED. JPK [17] [7203556] [21-2835, 21-2881] (MM) [Entered: 12/06/2021 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER re: Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee. [ # 14 ] A review of the docket indicates that the appellant paid the $505.00 appellate filing fees in both appeal nos. 21-2835 and 21-2881 in the district court. Accordingly, the motion for an extension of time to pay the filing fee is DENIED as unnecessary. SCR [16] [7203290] [21-2835, 21-2881] (MM) [Entered: 12/06/2021 08:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Pro se motion filed by Appellant William A. White in 21-2835, 21-2881 to present supplemental facts in support of appellant's opening brief and pending motions to stay. [15] [7203219] [21-2835, 21-2881] (MAN) [Entered: 12/03/2021 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Pro se motion filed by Appellant William A. White in 21-2881 for extension of time to pay filing fee. [14] [7203218] [21-2835, 21-2881] (MAN) [Entered: 12/03/2021 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) 10 copies Appellant's brief filed by Appellant William A. White in 21-2881, 21-2835. Disk not required. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [13] [7202475] [21-2881, 21-2835] (CM) [Entered: 12/01/2021 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER re: Motion for leave to file instanter, filed on 11/29/2021. In light of the courts briefing order dated November 16, 2021, the motion is unnecessary and will be filed without further court action. The clerk shall file INSTANTER the tendered brief of the appellant. CMD [12] [7202452] [21-2881, 21-2835] (FP) [Entered: 12/01/2021 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Prose motion filed by Appellant William A. White in 21-2881, 21-2835 to file appellant's brief. 1 copy of brief tendered. [11] [7201954] [21-2881, 21-2835] (CM) [Entered: 11/29/2021 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed Response in Opposition by Appellee BOP in 21-2881 Attorney Suzanne M. Garrison to MOTION TO STAY THE DISTRICT COURTS FILING RESTRICTION PENDING APPEAL. [10][7200552] [21-2881, 21-2835] (Garrison, Suzanne) [Entered: 11/22/2021 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER re: 1) Motion for Joinder of Appeals from White v United States SD IL Case No: 17-cv-683 and White v Collis SD IL Case No: 17-cv-1117. 2) United States of Americas Response to Motion for Joinder of Appeals. 3) Motion for Stay Pending Appeal of the District Courts Order of September 27, 2021, Absolutely Barring Me from Filing Any Document in Any Matter New or Pending in the Southern District of Illinois for Two Years (Doc 24). The motion to consolidate is GRANTED. These appeals are CONSOLIDATED for purposes of briefing and disposition. Briefing in the consolidated appeal is reset as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/16/2021 for William A. White. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/18/2022 for United States of America and Federal Bureau of Prisons. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/08/2022 for Appellant William A. White. Further, the request to seal documents included in the motion to stay, filed as Doc. 7 in No. 21-2881, is GRANTED. The clerk of this court shall separate the motion and appellants exhibits and file the exhibits under seal. The motion shall be filed in the public record. Finally, appellee may respond, on or before November 30, 2021, to appellants motion to stay, filed as Doc. 7 in No. 21-2881. Appellee may include arguments relating to either appeal or any of appellants motions to stay in that response. [ # 7191319-2 ] [ # 7 ] JPK [9] [7199518] [21-2835, 21-2881] (AD) [Entered: 11/16/2021 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 12/16/2021 for William A. White. Appellee's brief due on or before 01/18/2022 for Federal Bureau of Prisons. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 02/07/2022 for Appellant William A. White [8] [7199440] [21-2881] (CM) [Entered: 11/16/2021 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Pro se motion for stay filed by Appellant William A. White and to seal items tendered with motion to stay. [7] [7199238] [21-2881] (CAH) [Entered: 11/15/2021 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [6][7199080] [21-2881] (CM) [Entered: 11/15/2021 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant William A. White. [5] [7196138] [21-2881] (CAH) [Entered: 11/01/2021 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant William A. White. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [4] [7195813] [21-2881] (CMD) [Entered: 10/29/2021 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) No attorney(s) added for Appellees M. Collis, Kathy Hill, Bill True, D. Christensen, J. Wampler, Gary Burgess, and S. Byram, per District Court docket sheet. This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [3] [7192016] [21-2881]--[Docket updated 10/15/2021 by JR to show correct service.] (FP) [Entered: 10/14/2021 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: APPELLEES J. Wampler, Gary Burgess, and S. Byram. [2] [7192013] [21-2881] (FP) [Entered: 10/14/2021 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 10/28/2021. Docketing Statement due for Appellant William A. White by 10/19/2021. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 11/15/2021. [1] [7192008] [21-2881] (FP) [Entered: 10/14/2021 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Bureau of Prisons is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Suzanne M. Garrison