This case was last updated from PACER on 03/11/2019 at 06:18:26 (UTC).

Wilfred Holmes v. Christopher Christie, et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 Wilfred Holmes filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Christopher Christie. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1089

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

N.J. GOV. CHRISTOPHER J. CHRISTIE, Both individually and in his official capacity as the Govenor of the State of New Jersey

JAMES T. PLOUSIS, Both individually and in his offiical capacity as the cahirman of the N.J. State Parole Board

STUART RABNER, Both individually and in his offiical capacity as the chief justice of the Supreme Court

CARMEN MESSANO, Both individually and in her official capacity as the acting presiding judge for the administration for the Superior Court of New Jersey, Appellate Division

MARGARET M. HAYDEN

DAVID W. THOMAS, Both individually and in his official capacity as the executive director of the N.J. State Parole Board

JOHN R. TASSINI, Both individually and in their official capacities as judges of the Superior Court, Appellate Division

SMAUEL PLUMERI, JR., Both individually and in his official capacity as the vice-chairman of the N.J. State Parole Board

Plaintiff / Appellant

WILFRED LEE HOLMES

Rahway, NJ 07065

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Melissa H. Raksa Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, Richard J. Hughes Complex

Trenton, NJ 08625

Christopher C. Josephson Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, Richard J. Hughes Complex

Trenton, NJ 08625

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Wilfred Lee Holmes

Attorney at East Jersey State Prison

Lock Bag R

Rahway, NJ 07065

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

District Court Order

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Melissa H. Raksa, Esq. for Christopher J. Christie requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/08/2019. (SB) [Entered: 01/25/2019 10:31 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christopher C. Josephson on behalf of Appellee(s) David W. Thomas, James Plousis, Samuel J. Plumeri. [19-1089] (CCJ) [Entered: 01/14/2019 01:09 PM]

Open Document #4

Case Caption

Open Document #5

Standing Order Excess Pagination

Open Document #3

District Court Opinion

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #1

Notice of Appeal

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Wilfred Lee Holmes. The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order, filed. (SB) [Entered: 03/07/2019 02:30 PM]

Open Document

NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellant Wilfred Lee Holmes requesting Prison Account Statement. Compliance due 02/22/2019. (SB) [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:29 PM]

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Wilfred Lee Holmes. The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order, filed. (SB) [Entered: 03/07/2019 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Wilfred Lee Holmes, filed. (SB) [Entered: 02/28/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellant Wilfred Lee Holmes requesting Prison Account Statement. Compliance due 02/22/2019. (SB) [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Melissa H. Raksa, Esq. for Christopher J. Christie requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 02/08/2019. (SB) [Entered: 01/25/2019 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Wilfred Lee Holmes to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Response due on 02/04/2019. Certificate of Service dated 01/23/2019. Service made by ECF. (JK) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christopher C. Josephson on behalf of Appellee(s) David W. Thomas, James Plousis, Samuel J. Plumeri. [19-1089] (CCJ) [Entered: 01/14/2019 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 01/10/2019 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Wilfred Lee Holmes in District Court No. 2-16-cv-0143. (SB) [Entered: 01/10/2019 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.