This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/04/2021 at 06:07:15 (UTC).

Wiley v. Dunbar

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 Wiley filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Dunbar. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-50935

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Keith Bernard Wiley, as next friend of C.S.B., C.L.B. and L.C.B., minor children

Copperas Cove, TX 76522

Defendant / Appellees

Daquisha Lea Dunbar

Torrie White

Tresa Silcott

Julie Branch

Diana Dupont

Beverly Davis

Aaron Moon

Jennine Jarolik

Charles Van Orden

Natalie Flower

Scott Sinsabaugh

John Messer

Ralph Garcia

Lindsay Beaton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Keith Bernard Wiley

405 Creek Street

Copperas Cove, TX 76522

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John Daniel Coolidge

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711

Joe Anthony Rivera Esq.

Attorney at Naman, Howell, Smith & Lee, P.L.L.C.

400 Austin Avenue

Waco, TX 76701

Scot Macdonald Graydon

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 W. 15Th Street, William P. Clements Building

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

DIS-2 Order

Open Document #1

MDT-1 Letter

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-50935] (Scot Macdonald Graydon ) [Entered: 11/16/2021 01:40 PM]

Open Document #4

MOT-1 Letter

Open Document #3

MOT-1 Letter

Open Document #2

Exhibit A

Open Document #1

Motion Filed on Behalf of Party

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Joe Anthony Rivera, Esq. for Ms. Jennine Jarolik and Mr. Charles Van Orden for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-50935] (Joe Anthony Rivera ) [Entered: 10/21/2021 09:44 AM]

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #1

Unfiled Document

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. John Daniel Coolidge for Ms. Julie Branch, Ms. Beverly Davis, Ms. Daquisha Lea Dunbar, Ms. Diana Dupont, Ms. Tresa Silcott and Ms. Torrie White for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-50935] (John Daniel Coolidge ) [Entered: 10/15/2021 02:42 PM]

Open Document #2

Pro Se Notice

Open Document #1

BR-1 Letter

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9687539-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-50935] (CAS) [Entered: 10/13/2021 08:52 AM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to file appellant's brief and record excerpts [9721537-2] [21-50935] (CAS) [Entered: 11/29/2021 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Scot Macdonald Graydon for party(s) Appellee Charles Van Orden, in case 21-50935 [21-50935] (CAS) [Entered: 11/17/2021 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-50935] (Scot Macdonald Graydon ) [Entered: 11/16/2021 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketThe Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellees Ms. Beverly Davis, Ms. Daquisha Lea Dunbar, Ms. Torrie White, Ms. Tresa Silcott, Ms. Julie Branch and Ms. Diana Dupont in 21-50935 [ # 9708749-2 ] has been made sufficient. Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Rpl deadline satisfied. [21-50935] (CAS) [Entered: 11/10/2021 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSED MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [9708749-2], to dismiss appeal as frivolous [9708749-3]. Date of service: 11/09/2021 [21-50935] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [9708749-2]. Date of service: 11/09/2021 Response/Opposition due on 11/22/2021. [21-50935] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [9708749-2]. Date of service: 11/09/2021 Document is insufficient for the following reasons: appellant is not an electronic filer, and not noted as being served Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Reply due on 11/19/2021 for Appellees Julie Branch, Beverly Davis, Daquisha Lea Dunbar, Diana Dupont, Tresa Silcott and Torrie White [21-50935] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Ms. Julie Branch, Ms. Beverly Davis, Ms. Daquisha Lea Dunbar, Ms. Diana Dupont, Ms. Tresa Silcott and Ms. Torrie White to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [9708749-2]. Date of service: 11/09/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Coolidge, Rivera; US mail - Appellant Wiley [21-50935] (John Daniel Coolidge ) [Entered: 11/09/2021 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Joe Rivera is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:not representing Charles Van Orden. [21-50935] (CAS) [Entered: 10/21/2021 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joe Anthony Rivera for Appellee Jennine Jarolik in 21-50935 [21-50935] (CAS) [Entered: 10/21/2021 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Joe Anthony Rivera, Esq. for Ms. Jennine Jarolik and Mr. Charles Van Orden for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-50935] (Joe Anthony Rivera ) [Entered: 10/21/2021 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney John Daniel Coolidge for Appellee Beverly Davis in 21-50935, Attorney John Daniel Coolidge for Appellee Diana Dupont in 21-50935, Attorney John Daniel Coolidge for Appellee Julie Branch in 21-50935, Attorney John Daniel Coolidge for Appellee Tresa Silcott in 21-50935, Attorney John Daniel Coolidge for Appellee Torrie White in 21-50935, Attorney John Daniel Coolidge for Appellee Daquisha Lea Dunbar in 21-50935 [21-50935] (CAS) [Entered: 10/19/2021 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form from Mr. Joe Rivera because the incorrect party is noted. [21-50935] (CAS) [Entered: 10/19/2021 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. John Daniel Coolidge for Ms. Julie Branch, Ms. Beverly Davis, Ms. Daquisha Lea Dunbar, Ms. Diana Dupont, Ms. Tresa Silcott and Ms. Torrie White for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-50935] (John Daniel Coolidge ) [Entered: 10/15/2021 02:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 11/22/2021 for Appellant Keith Bernard Wiley. [21-50935] (DDL) [Entered: 10/13/2021 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-50935] (DDL) [Entered: 10/13/2021 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 6:20-CV-1059. Electronic ROA due on 10/28/2021. [21-50935] (CAS) [Entered: 10/13/2021 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9687539-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-50935] (CAS) [Entered: 10/13/2021 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Keith Bernard Wiley [21-50935] (MBC) [Entered: 10/05/2021 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joe Anthony Rivera

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scot Macdonald Graydon