This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2021 at 06:19:32 (UTC).

Wieloszynski v. City of Niagara Falls

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Wieloszynski filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Niagara Falls. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-255

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Linda Ann Joseph

Tony P. Kelly

Toni Yvonne Bonham

Tammy Dochstader, individually, and as a Parent and Natural Guardian of E.D. and H.J., Infants

Barbara Jean Walker Robinson

Dawn Marie Leone-Hahn

Charles Pryor

Elizabeth Ann Lumpkin

Marie Angela Schryver

David Mielke

John David Wieloszynski, individually, and as Parent and Natural Guardian of D.W., Infant

Christina Bell

Theodore Ted Winston Nehrenberg

Melinda William Epps

Sarah Francis Shipp

Melvin Pryor Smith

Jennifer Nicole Schwartzkopf

Gwendolyn A. Daniels

Defendant / Appellants

City of Niagara Falls

Conestoga-Rovers & Associates

56 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Paul K. Barr Esq.

Attorney at Fanizzi & Barr, PC

2303 Pine Avenue

Niagara Falls, NY 14301

Peter A. Kraus Esq.

Attorney at Waters & Kraus, LLP

3141 Hood Street

Dallas, TX 75219

Steven J. Phillips Esq.

Attorney at Phillips & Paolicelli, LLP

747 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Thomas J. DeBoy Esq.

Attorney at City of Niagara Falls Law Department

745 Main Street, P.O. Box 69

Niagara Falls, NY 14302

Jeffrey Charles Stravino Esq.

Attorney at Hodgson Russ LLP

The Guaranty Building, 140 Pearl Street

Buffalo, NY 14202

Other Attorneys

Agnieszka Wilewicz Esq.

Attorney at Hurwitz & Fine, P.C.

1300 Liberty Building

Buffalo, NY 14202

Douglas E. Fleming Esq. III

Attorney at Dechert LLP

3 Bryant Park, 1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Brian Sutter

Attorney at Sugarman Law Firm LLP

1600 Rand Building, 14 Lafayette Square

Buffalo, NY 14203

Alice Jean Cunningham Esq.

Attorney at The Knoer Group, PLLC

424 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14202

Jeffrey D. Schulman Esq.

Attorney at Pillinger Miller Tarallo, LLP

507 Plum Street

Syracuse, NY 13204

Zackary D. Knaub Esq.

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

54 State Street

Albany, NY 12207

William G. Beck

Attorney at Lathrop GPM LLP

2345 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

Kevin M. Hogan Esq.

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

1 Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203

Robert E. Knoer

Attorney at The Knoer Group, PLLC

424 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14202

Elizabeth Bove Esq.

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

1 Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203

Andrew Patrick Devine Esq.

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

1 Canalside, 125 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14203

 

Court Documents

#34

#30

#29

#27

#23

#22

#21

#19

#18

#17

#15

#14

#12

#10

#7

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, designating 21-249 as the lead appeal, holding appeals 21-237, 21-245, 21-247, 21-248, 21-250, 21-251, 21-252, 21-253, 21-255, 21-256, 21-257, 21-259, 21-260, 21-264, 21-265, 21-269, 21-281, and 21-285 in abeyance pending the Courts decision in the lead appeal, directing opening forms be filed within 7 days, and setting the briefing schedule for lead appeal, by JON, FILED. [ # 27 ] [3058313][34] [21-255] [Entered: 03/17/2021 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ATTORNEY, Elizabeth Bove for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-255 , [ # 30 ], ADDED.[3055604] [21-255] [Entered: 03/12/2021 07:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ATTORNEY, Andrew Patrick Devine for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-255 , [ # 29 ], ADDED.[3055602] [21-255] [Entered: 03/12/2021 07:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3054483] [21-255] [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/11/2021 by CM/ECF. [3054442] [21-255] [Entered: 03/11/2021 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, on behalf of Appellant Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Occidental Chemical Corporation, FILED. Service date 03/10/2021 by CM/ECF. [3053568] [21-255] [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ATTORNEY, Kevin M. Hogan for Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc. Occidental Chemical Corporation Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., in case 21-255 , [ # 21 ], ADDED.[3053543] [21-255] [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ATTORNEY, Robert E Knoer for Roy's Plumbing, Inc., in case 21-255 , [ # 18 ], ADDED.[3053540] [21-255] [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [ # 17 ], [ # 23 ], on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED.[3053539] [21-255] [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [11], on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED.[3053535] [21-255] [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant CECOS International, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/03/2021 by CM/ECF. [3048097] [21-255] [Entered: 03/03/2021 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED. Service date 03/03/2021 by CM/ECF.[3047964] [21-255] [Entered: 03/03/2021 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant OP-Tech Environmental Services, FILED. Service date 02/26/2021 by CM/ECF.[3045219] [21-255] [Entered: 02/26/2021 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Scott Lawn Yard, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/25/2021 by CM/ECF.[3044641] [21-255] [Entered: 02/25/2021 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, FILED. Service date 02/25/2021 by CM/ECF.[3044546] [21-255] [Entered: 02/25/2021 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Occidental Chemical Corporation, Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc. and Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/24/2021 by CM/ECF.[3043628] [21-255] [Entered: 02/24/2021 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Roy's Plumbing, Inc., FILED. Service date 02/22/2021 by CM/ECF.[3041477] [21-255] [Entered: 02/22/2021 05:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant CECOS International, Inc., City of Niagara Falls, Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., OP-Tech Environmental Services, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Roy's Plumbing, Inc., Scott Lawn Yard, Inc. and Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., district court receipt # 0209-4143247, FILED.[3034700] [21-255] [Entered: 02/11/2021 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/25/2021, RECEIVED.[3034698] [21-255] [Entered: 02/11/2021 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant CECOS International, Inc., City of Niagara Falls, Conestoga-Rovers & Associates, Glenn Springs Holdings, Inc., Miller Springs Remediation Management, Inc., OP-Tech Environmental Services, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Roy's Plumbing, Inc., Scott Lawn Yard, Inc. and Sevenson Environmental Services, Inc., FILED. [3034697] [21-255] [Entered: 02/11/2021 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conestoga-Rovers & Associates is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William G. Beck