This case was last updated from PACER on 05/10/2019 at 06:03:37 (UTC).

Widi v. McNeil, et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 Widi filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against McNeil. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1241

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY

US ATTORNEYS OFFICE

US BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES

Defendant / Appellees

LIEUTENANT KEVIN CADY

ELIOT POLICE DEPARTMENT

SA STEPHEN E. HICKEY, JR.

CHIEF THEODORE STRONG

SA SCOTT C. ROCHEFANT

SA GLENN N. ANDERSON

CORPORAL JEROME CARR

NEIL VACCARO

DOUGLAS LARA

DETECTIVE THOMAS PHELAN

TROOPER MICHAEL COOK

OFFICER ADAM C. MARTIN

RYAN CORTINA

STEVE MAZZIOTTI

OFFICER ROBERT BROWN

ME DEPARTMENT OF PROBATION AND PAROLE

SA SCOTT DURST

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

Sheila Watters Sawyer

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

100 Middle St, East Tower, 6Th Flr

Portland, ME 04101-4100

John G. Osborn

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

100 Middle St, East Tower, 6Th Flr

Portland, ME 04101-4100

Renee M. Bunker

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

100 Middle St, East Tower, 6Th Flr

Portland, ME 04101-4100

Evan J. Roth

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

100 Middle St, East Tower, 6Th Flr

Portland, ME 04101-4100

John J. Wall III

Attorney at Monaghan Leahy LLP

95 Exchange St., Po Box 7046

Portland, ME 04112-0000

Aaron M. Frey

Attorney at ME Attorney General's Office

6 State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

Other Attorneys

Travis Webber

16 Witchtrot Rd

South Berwick, ME 03908

Joseph G. Talbot

Attorney at Perkins Thompson PA

1 Canal Plaza, Po Box 426

Portland, ME 04112-0426

Benjamin J. Wahrer

Attorney at Thompson Bowie & Hatch LLC

415 Congress St, Ste 500, Po Box 4630

Portland, ME 04112-4630

Edward R. Benjamin Jr.

Attorney at Drummond Woodsum

84 Marginal Way, Ste 600

Portland, ME 04101-2480

James Edward Fortin

Attorney at ME Attorney General's Office

6 State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

David Bruce McConnell

Attorney at Perkins Thompson PA

1 Canal Plaza, Po Box 426

Portland, ME 04112-0426

Diane Elizabeth Sleek

Attorney at ME Attorney General's Office

6 State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

Kasia Soon Park

Attorney at Drummond Woodsum

84 Marginal Way, Ste 600

Portland, ME 04101-2480

David J. Widi Jr.

Po Box 240

Adelphia, NJ 07710-0240

Brendan R. O'Rourke

Attorney at Thompson Bowie & Hatch LLC

415 Congress St, Ste 500, Po Box 4630

Portland, ME 04112-4630

 

Court Documents

Open Document

RESPONSE filed by Appellant David J. Widi, Jr. to order regarding untimely appeal [ # 6246256-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 05/09/2019. [19-1241] (DJW) [Entered: 05/09/2019 10:29 PM]

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file response filed by Appellant David J. Widi, Jr. Response to show cause order due 05/09/2019. [19-1241] (KC) [Entered: 04/30/2019 04:10 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to extend time to file a response filed by Appellant David J. Widi, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2019. [19-1241] (DJW) [Entered: 04/29/2019 10:55 PM]

Open Document

CORRECTED ORDER* to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as untimely. Show cause response due 04/25/2019. *Corrected Order issued to amend date of order. [19-1241] (KC) [Entered: 04/11/2019 04:19 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Aaron M. Frey for ME State Police, Maine Drug Enforcement Agency, Stephen Borst, ME Department of Probation and Parole, Paul F. Shaw, Scott C. Rochefant, Scott Durst, Steve Mazziotti, Jerome Carr, Michael Cook, Dennis R. Clark and Michael Lyon. [19-1241] (KC) [Entered: 04/11/2019 03:31 PM]

Open Document

ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as untimely. Show cause response due 04/25/2019. [19-1241] (KC) [Entered: 04/11/2019 03:28 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of default issued. Appellant failed to file a transcript report/order form by the deadline. If transcripts are necessary for this appeal, appellant is directed to file a transcript order form by 04/12/2019. Absent a timely response, this court will set a briefing schedule, if appropriate. [19-1241] (KC) [Entered: 03/29/2019 04:18 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 04/10/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Aaron M. Frey for ME State Police, Maine Drug Enforcement Agency, Stephen Borst, ME Department of Probation and Parole, Paul F. Shaw, Scott C. Rochefant, Scott Durst, Steve Mazziotti, Jerome Carr, Michael Cook, Dennis R. Clark and Michael Lyon. [19-1241] (KC) [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:38 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Dennis R. Clark and Michael Lyon filed by Attorney James E. Fortin. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1241] (JEF) [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:00 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Theodore Short and Elliott Moya filed by Attorney Brendan R. O'Rourke. Certificate of service dated 03/15/2019. [19-1241] (BRO) [Entered: 03/15/2019 08:36 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Paul McNeil, Stephen E. Hickey, Jr., Christopher J. Durkin, Dale L. Armstrong, Glenn N. Anderson, Michael Grasso, John Morris and Douglas Kirk filed by Attorney Sheila W. Sawyer. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1241] (SWS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:00 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Kevin Cady and Robert Brown filed by Attorney John J. Wall, III. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1241] (JJW) [Entered: 03/14/2019 08:14 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Kevin Curran filed by Attorney Edward R. Benjamin, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2019. [19-1241] (ERB) [Entered: 03/13/2019 04:11 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Kevin Curran filed by Attorney Kasia S. Park. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2019. [19-1241] (KSP) [Entered: 03/13/2019 12:28 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party TD Banknorth, N. A. filed by Attorney Joseph G. Talbot. Certificate of service dated 03/12/2019. [19-1241] (JGT) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:39 PM]

Open Document #5

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #3

Transcript Order Form

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE filed by Appellant David J. Widi, Jr. to order regarding untimely appeal [ # 6246256-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 05/09/2019. [19-1241] (DJW) [Entered: 05/09/2019 10:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to file response filed by Appellant David J. Widi, Jr. Response to show cause order due 05/09/2019. [19-1241] (KC) [Entered: 04/30/2019 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to extend time to file a response filed by Appellant David J. Widi, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 04/29/2019. [19-1241] (DJW) [Entered: 04/29/2019 10:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTED ORDER* to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as untimely. Show cause response due 04/25/2019. *Corrected Order issued to amend date of order. [19-1241] (KC) [Entered: 04/11/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Aaron M. Frey for ME State Police, Maine Drug Enforcement Agency, Stephen Borst, ME Department of Probation and Parole, Paul F. Shaw, Scott C. Rochefant, Scott Durst, Steve Mazziotti, Jerome Carr, Michael Cook, Dennis R. Clark and Michael Lyon. [19-1241] (KC) [Entered: 04/11/2019 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as untimely. Show cause response due 04/25/2019. [19-1241] (KC) [Entered: 04/11/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of default issued. Appellant failed to file a transcript report/order form by the deadline. If transcripts are necessary for this appeal, appellant is directed to file a transcript order form by 04/12/2019. Absent a timely response, this court will set a briefing schedule, if appropriate. [19-1241] (KC) [Entered: 03/29/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. After 04/10/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Aaron M. Frey for ME State Police, Maine Drug Enforcement Agency, Stephen Borst, ME Department of Probation and Parole, Paul F. Shaw, Scott C. Rochefant, Scott Durst, Steve Mazziotti, Jerome Carr, Michael Cook, Dennis R. Clark and Michael Lyon. [19-1241] (KC) [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Dennis R. Clark and Michael Lyon filed by Attorney James E. Fortin. Certificate of service dated 03/18/2019. [19-1241] (JEF) [Entered: 03/18/2019 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Theodore Short and Elliott Moya filed by Attorney Brendan R. O'Rourke. Certificate of service dated 03/15/2019. [19-1241] (BRO) [Entered: 03/15/2019 08:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Paul McNeil, Stephen E. Hickey, Jr., Christopher J. Durkin, Dale L. Armstrong, Glenn N. Anderson, Michael Grasso, John Morris and Douglas Kirk filed by Attorney Sheila W. Sawyer. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1241] (SWS) [Entered: 03/14/2019 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Kevin Cady and Robert Brown filed by Attorney John J. Wall, III. Certificate of service dated 03/14/2019. [19-1241] (JJW) [Entered: 03/14/2019 08:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Kevin Curran filed by Attorney Edward R. Benjamin, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2019. [19-1241] (ERB) [Entered: 03/13/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Kevin Curran filed by Attorney Kasia S. Park. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2019. [19-1241] (KSP) [Entered: 03/13/2019 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party TD Banknorth, N. A. filed by Attorney Joseph G. Talbot. Certificate of service dated 03/12/2019. [19-1241] (JGT) [Entered: 03/12/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #602) filed by Appellant David J. Widi, Jr. Transcript Report/Order form due 03/25/2019. [19-1241] (KC) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less