This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/14/2019 at 06:06:33 (UTC).

Wi-LAN Inc. v. VIZIO, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Wi-LAN Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against VIZIO, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1043

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

VIZIO, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

WI-LAN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Pilar G. Kraman

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

1000 North King Street, Rodney Square

Wilmington, DE 19801

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellee VIZIO, Inc., Entries of Appearance - S. Gibson and R. Hwang; Certificate of Interest; Docketing Statement [ # 4 ], [ # 5 ], [ # 6 ], [ # 7 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). No corrections are required. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [646087] [JAL] [Entered: 10/31/2019 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellee VIZIO, Inc. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645648] [20-1043] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Rex Hwang] [Entered: 10/29/2019 06:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellee VIZIO, Inc. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645646] [20-1043] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Rex Hwang] [Entered: 10/29/2019 06:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Rex Hwang as of counsel for Appellee VIZIO, Inc. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645645] [20-1043] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Rex Hwang] [Entered: 10/29/2019 06:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Stanley M. Gibson as principal counsel for Appellee VIZIO, Inc. Service: 10/29/2019 by email. [645644] [20-1043] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 8 ] [Stanley Gibson] [Entered: 10/29/2019 06:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Docket(#3) Note to file: The following cases are associated: 20-1041 Lead with 20-1043 Member Case. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [645059] [20-1041, 20-1043] [JAL] [Entered: 10/28/2019 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER consolidating appeals 20-1041 and 20-1043. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. Appellant's brief is due 12/27/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [645050] [20-1041, 20-1043] [JAL] [Entered: 10/28/2019 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 10/11/2019. [642226] Entry of Appearance is due 10/29/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/29/2019. Docketing Statement is due 10/29/2019. Appellant's brief is due 12/16/2019. [JAL] [Entered: 10/15/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WI-LAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where V and A Flooring Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian E. Farnan