This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/02/2022 at 06:14:45 (UTC).

Wi-LAN Inc. v. Sharp Electronics Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 Wi-LAN Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sharp Electronics Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1870

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

WI-LAN INC.

Defendant / Appellees

SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION

VIZIO, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Brian E. Farnan

919 North Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jeffrey Bragalone

Attorney at Bragalone Olejko Saad PC

901 Main Street

Dallas, TX 75202

Daniel Fletcher Olejko

Attorney at Bragalone Olejko Saad PC

901 Main Street

Dallas, TX 75202

Terry Saad

Attorney at Bragalone Olejko Saad PC

901 Main Street

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jack B. Blumenfeld

1201 North Market Street, Po Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Gianni Cutri

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

William H. Burgess

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

John C. O'Quinn

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Pilar G. Kraman

1000 North King Street, Rodney Square

Wilmington, DE 19801

Mark S. Davies Esq.

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1152 15Th Street, Nw, Columbia Center

Washington, DC 20005

Elizabeth Moulton

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#2

(#2) ORDER consolidating appeals 22-1870 and 22-1871. Appellant's opening brief is due no later than August 2, 2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [854625] [22-1870, 22-1871] [ALK] [Entered: 06/09/2022 10:38 AM]

#4

(#4) Entry of appearance for Mark S. Davies; Elizabeth Moulton as counsel for Appellee VIZIO, Inc.. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856156] [22-1870] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 06/17/2022 11:37 AM]

#5

(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellee VIZIO, Inc.. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856157] [22-1870] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 06/17/2022 11:39 AM]

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellee VIZIO, Inc.. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856160] [22-1870] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 06/17/2022 11:41 AM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Jeffrey R. Bragalone; Daniel F. Olejko; Terry A. Saad as counsel for Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856236] [22-1870] [Daniel Olejko] [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:30 PM]

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856238] [22-1870] [Daniel Olejko] [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:32 PM]

#9

(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856239] [22-1870] [Daniel Olejko] [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:34 PM]

#10

(#10) Entry of appearance for Gianni Cutri; John O'Quinn; William Burgess as counsel for Appellee Sharp Electronics Corporation. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856347] [22-1870] [William Burgess] [Entered: 06/17/2022 09:25 PM]

#11

(#11) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Sharp Electronics Corporation. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856348] [22-1870] [William Burgess] [Entered: 06/17/2022 09:26 PM]

#12

(#12) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Sharp Electronics Corporation. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856350] [22-1870] [William Burgess] [Entered: 06/17/2022 09:27 PM]

#13

(#13) MOTION of Appellant Wi-LAN Inc. to extend the time to 09/01/2022 to file brief. Service: 07/13/2022 by email. [860800] [22-1870] [Daniel Olejko] [Entered: 07/13/2022 01:39 PM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 13 ] filed by Appellant Wi-LAN Inc. The opening brief is due 09/01/2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [860851] [ALK] [Entered: 07/13/2022 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION of Appellant Wi-LAN Inc. to extend the time to 09/01/2022 to file brief. Service: 07/13/2022 by email. [860800] [22-1870] [Daniel Olejko] [Entered: 07/13/2022 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Sharp Electronics Corporation. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856350] [22-1870] [William Burgess] [Entered: 06/17/2022 09:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Sharp Electronics Corporation. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856348] [22-1870] [William Burgess] [Entered: 06/17/2022 09:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for Gianni Cutri; John O'Quinn; William Burgess as counsel for Appellee Sharp Electronics Corporation. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856347] [22-1870] [William Burgess] [Entered: 06/17/2022 09:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856239] [22-1870] [Daniel Olejko] [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856238] [22-1870] [Daniel Olejko] [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Jeffrey R. Bragalone; Daniel F. Olejko; Terry A. Saad as counsel for Appellant Wi-LAN Inc.. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856236] [22-1870] [Daniel Olejko] [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellee VIZIO, Inc.. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856160] [22-1870] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 06/17/2022 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Docketing Statement for the Appellee VIZIO, Inc.. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856157] [22-1870] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 06/17/2022 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Mark S. Davies; Elizabeth Moulton as counsel for Appellee VIZIO, Inc.. Service: 06/17/2022 by email. [856156] [22-1870] [Mark Davies] [Entered: 06/17/2022 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docket(#3) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 22-1870 (Lead) with 22-1871 (Member). The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [854631] [22-1870, 22-1871] [ALK] [Entered: 06/09/2022 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER consolidating appeals 22-1870 and 22-1871. Appellant's opening brief is due no later than August 2, 2022. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [854625] [22-1870, 22-1871] [ALK] [Entered: 06/09/2022 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 06/01/2022. [853509] Entry of Appearance is due on 06/17/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 06/17/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 06/17/2022. Appellant's brief is due on 08/02/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 06/03/2022 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WI-LAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sharp Electronics Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where V and A Flooring Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth Moulton