This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 06:24:48 (UTC).

Whitnum v. Woodbridge

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 Whitnum filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Woodbridge. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-48

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Robert B. Crowther, personally and professionally

Town of Woodbridge

Frank P. Cappiello, personally and professionally

Plaintiff / Appellant

L. Lee Whitnum

Greenwich, CT 06830

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

James N. Tallberg

Attorney at Karsten & Tallberg, LLC

500 Enterprise Drive

Rocky Hill, CT 06067

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

L. Lee Whitnum

P.O. Box 7482

Greenwich, CT 06830

 

Court Documents

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

1 #2

Case FILED

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/12/2018, RECEIVED.[2469139] [19-48] [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:23 PM]

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

5 #2

Case FILED

5 #1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

#6

(#6) DISTRICT COURT TEXT ORDER located at entry #132, dated 12/12/2018, RECEIVED.[2469160] [19-49] [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:35 PM]

7 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#66

(#66) MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Frank P. Cappiello, Robert B. Crowther and Town of Woodbridge in 19-48, 19-229, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54, FILED. Service date 03/06/2019 by CM/ECF, email, US mail. [2512027] [19-48, 19-229, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54] [Entered: 03/06/2019 05:11 PM]

#47

(#60) CURED DEFECTIVE Form D-P and the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, Motion for costs, [ # 47 ], [ # 48 ], [ # 53 ], [ # 58 ], on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum in 19-48, FILED.[2506018] [19-48, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54, 19-229] [Entered: 02/27/2019 09:19 AM]

#48

(#60) CURED DEFECTIVE Form D-P and the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, Motion for costs, [ # 47 ], [ # 48 ], [ # 53 ], [ # 58 ], on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum in 19-48, FILED.[2506018] [19-48, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54, 19-229] [Entered: 02/27/2019 09:19 AM]

#58

(#58) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance and Form D-P, [51], [ # 2499998-2 ], [ # 2499997-2 ], [ # 2499996-2 ], [ # 2499995-2 ], [ # 2499994-2 ], [ # 2499992-2 ], [ # 2499991-2 ], [56], [ # 2503895-2 ], [ # 2503894-2 ], [ # 2503893-2 ], [ # 2503892-2 ], [ # 2503891-2 ], [ # 2503890-2 ], [ # 2503889-2 ], on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum in 19-48, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54, 19-229, FILED.[2504192] [19-48, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54, 19-229] [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:47 AM]

#53

(#53) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance and the Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [49], [ # 2499983-2 ], [50], [ # 2499985-2 ], [ # 2499986-2 ], [ # 2499987-2 ], [ # 2499988-2 ], [ # 2499989-2 ], [ # 2500005-2 ], [ # 2500007-2 ], [ # 2500008-2 ], [52], on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum in 19-48, FILED.[2500233] [19-48, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54, 19-229] [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:05 AM]

#59

(#59) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum, FILED. Service date 02/27/2019 by US mail.[2505946] [19-48] [Entered: 02/27/2019 05:13 AM]

#57

(#57) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Certificate of mailing of T1080, Motion for Pauperis, Local 24.1, on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum in 19-48, 19-229, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54, FILED. Service date 02/22/2019 by US mail.[2503897] [19-48, 19-229, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54] [Entered: 02/23/2019 12:13 AM]

#55

(#55) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum, FILED. Service date 02/22/2019 by US mail.[2503881] [19-48] [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:50 PM]

#54

(#54) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum in 19-48, 19-229, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54, FILED. Service date 02/22/2019 by US mail. [2503880] [19-48, 19-229, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54] [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:29 PM]

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) MOTION, to dismiss, on behalf of Appellee Frank P. Cappiello, Robert B. Crowther and Town of Woodbridge in 19-48, 19-229, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54, FILED. Service date 03/06/2019 by CM/ECF, email, US mail. [2512027] [19-48, 19-229, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54] [Entered: 03/06/2019 05:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) CURED DEFECTIVE Form D-P and the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, Motion for costs, [ # 47 ], [ # 48 ], [ # 53 ], [ # 58 ], on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum in 19-48, FILED.[2506018] [19-48, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54, 19-229] [Entered: 02/27/2019 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum, FILED. Service date 02/27/2019 by US mail.[2505946] [19-48] [Entered: 02/27/2019 05:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance and Form D-P, [51], [ # 2499998-2 ], [ # 2499997-2 ], [ # 2499996-2 ], [ # 2499995-2 ], [ # 2499994-2 ], [ # 2499992-2 ], [ # 2499991-2 ], [56], [ # 2503895-2 ], [ # 2503894-2 ], [ # 2503893-2 ], [ # 2503892-2 ], [ # 2503891-2 ], [ # 2503890-2 ], [ # 2503889-2 ], on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum in 19-48, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54, 19-229, FILED.[2504192] [19-48, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54, 19-229] [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Certificate of mailing of T1080, Motion for Pauperis, Local 24.1, on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum in 19-48, 19-229, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54, FILED. Service date 02/22/2019 by US mail.[2503897] [19-48, 19-229, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54] [Entered: 02/23/2019 12:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • (#56) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum, FILED. Service date 02/22/2019 by US mail.[2503896] [19-48] [Entered: 02/22/2019 11:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum, FILED. Service date 02/22/2019 by US mail.[2503881] [19-48] [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum in 19-48, 19-229, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54, FILED. Service date 02/22/2019 by US mail. [2503880] [19-48, 19-229, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54] [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance and the Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, [49], [ # 2499983-2 ], [50], [ # 2499985-2 ], [ # 2499986-2 ], [ # 2499987-2 ], [ # 2499988-2 ], [ # 2499989-2 ], [ # 2500005-2 ], [ # 2500007-2 ], [ # 2500008-2 ], [52], on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum in 19-48, FILED.[2500233] [19-48, 19-49, 19-50, 19-51, 19-52, 19-53, 19-54, 19-229] [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • (#52) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant L. Lee Whitnum in 19-52, 19-51, 19-50, 19-49, 19-48, FILED. Service date 02/19/2019 by US mail. [2500009] [19-52, 19-51, 19-50, 19-49, 19-48] [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant L. "Lee" Whitnum, FILED. [2469201] [19-51] [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2469181] [19-50] [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/12/2018, RECEIVED.[2469180] [19-50] [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant L. "Lee" Whitnum, FILED. [2469176] [19-50] [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2469161] [19-49] [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISTRICT COURT TEXT ORDER located at entry #132, dated 12/12/2018, RECEIVED.[2469160] [19-49] [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant L. "Lee" Whitnum, FILED. [2469156] [19-49] [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2469141] [19-48] [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/12/2018, RECEIVED.[2469139] [19-48] [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant L. "Lee" Whitnum, FILED. [2469138] [19-48] [Entered: 01/07/2019 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.