This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2019 at 06:11:16 (UTC).

Whitesell Corporation v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 Whitesell Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Electrolux Home Products, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11865

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, INC.

HUSQVARNA OUTDOOR PRODUCTS, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

WHITESELL CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Amanda Waide

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

1201 W Peachtree St Nw Ste 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

Kyle G.A. Wallace

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP

1201 W Peachtree St Nw Ste 4900

Atlanta, GA 30309

Robert Perry Sentell III

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

1450 Greene St Rm 230

Augusta, GA 30901

Joseph H. Huff

Attorney at Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

1450 Greene St Rm 230

Augusta, GA 30901

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew B. Devisse

Attorney at Coleman Yovanovich & Koester, PA

4001 Tamiami Trl N Ste 300

Naples, FL 34103-3591

Edmond E. Koester

Attorney at Coleman Yovanovich & Koester, PA

4001 Tamiami Trl N Ste 300

Naples, FL 34103-3591

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Reply to response filed by Appellee Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc.. [19-11865] (ECF: Robert Sentell) [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:13 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to consolidate appeals 19-11865 and 19-11866 filed by Whitesell Corporation. Motion is Unopposed. [8814179-1] [19-11865] (ECF: Matthew Devisse) [Entered: 07/01/2019 12:19 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE to Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellee Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc. [ # 8797880-2 ] filed by Attorney Matthew B. Devisse for Appellant Whitesell Corporation. [19-11865] (ECF: Matthew Devisse) [Entered: 06/24/2019 02:17 PM]

Open Document

ORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellees Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc. and Amanda Waide is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8798694-2 ] Attorney terminated: Attorney James C. Grant for Appellee Electrolux Home Products, Inc. in 19-11865, Attorney Elizabeth Helmer for Appellee Electrolux Home Products, Inc. in 19-11865, Attorney Amanda Waide for Appellee Electrolux Home Products, Inc. in 19-11865, Attorney Kyle G.A. Wallace for Appellee Electrolux Home Products, Inc. in 19-11865. [Entered: 06/14/2019 11:26 AM]

Open Document

Notice to withdraw notices of appearance CONSTRUED as a motion to withdraw filed by Attorney Amanda Waide for Appellees Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc.. [19-11865]--[Edited 06/13/2019 by CB] (ECF: Amanda Waide) [Entered: 06/13/2019 08:37 AM]

Open Document

MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction filed by Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc.. Motion is Opposed. [8797880-1] [19-11865] (ECF: Robert Sentell) [Entered: 06/12/2019 12:06 PM]

Open Document

Appellee's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellee Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc.. [Entered: 06/11/2019 09:37 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Matthew B. Devisse for Appellant Whitesell Corporation. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11865] (ECF: Matthew Devisse) [Entered: 05/28/2019 01:28 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Matthew B. Devisse for Appellant Whitesell Corporation. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-11865] (ECF: Matthew Devisse) [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:43 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew B. Devisse for Whitesell Corporation. [19-11865] (ECF: Matthew Devisse) [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:56 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edmond E. Koester for Whitesell Corporation. [19-11865] (ECF: Edmond Koester) [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:52 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elizabeth Helmer, Electrolux Home Products, Inc. [19-11865] (ECF: Elizabeth Helmer) [Entered: 05/23/2019 02:43 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James C. Grant, Electrolux Home Products, Inc. [19-11865] (ECF: James Grant) [Entered: 05/23/2019 02:12 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Amanda Waide for Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc.. [19-11865] (ECF: Amanda Waide) [Entered: 05/23/2019 01:48 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kyle G.A. Wallace for Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc.. [19-11865] (ECF: Kyle Wallace) [Entered: 05/23/2019 01:43 PM]

Open Document #3

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

usdc 1186

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to response filed by Appellee Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc.. [19-11865] (ECF: Robert Sentell) [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to consolidate appeals 19-11865 and 19-11866 filed by Whitesell Corporation. Motion is Unopposed. [8814179-1] [19-11865] (ECF: Matthew Devisse) [Entered: 07/01/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE to Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellee Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc. [ # 8797880-2 ] filed by Attorney Matthew B. Devisse for Appellant Whitesell Corporation. [19-11865] (ECF: Matthew Devisse) [Entered: 06/24/2019 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Over the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Matthew B. Devisse for Appellant Whitesell Corporation. Appellants brief due on 07/08/2019 as to Appellant Whitesell Corporation. Appendix due on 07/15/2019 as to Appellant Whitesell Corporation. [Entered: 06/18/2019 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Appellees Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc. and Amanda Waide is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8798694-2 ] Attorney terminated: Attorney James C. Grant for Appellee Electrolux Home Products, Inc. in 19-11865, Attorney Elizabeth Helmer for Appellee Electrolux Home Products, Inc. in 19-11865, Attorney Amanda Waide for Appellee Electrolux Home Products, Inc. in 19-11865, Attorney Kyle G.A. Wallace for Appellee Electrolux Home Products, Inc. in 19-11865. [Entered: 06/14/2019 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Notice of deficient Notice to withdraw notices of appearance CONSTRUED as a motion to withdraw filed by Amanda Waide for Electrolux Home Products, Inc and Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc. Certificate of Service needs to reflect service to the parties. Please file a corrected motion within three days. [Entered: 06/13/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to withdraw notices of appearance CONSTRUED as a motion to withdraw filed by Attorney Amanda Waide for Appellees Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc.. [19-11865]--[Edited 06/13/2019 by CB] (ECF: Amanda Waide) [Entered: 06/13/2019 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to James C. Grant for Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Elizabeth Helmer for Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Amanda Waide for Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc. and Kyle G.A. Wallace for Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc.. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/12/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction filed by Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc.. Motion is Opposed. [8797880-1] [19-11865] (ECF: Robert Sentell) [Entered: 06/12/2019 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellee's AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellee Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc.. [Entered: 06/11/2019 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Matthew B. Devisse for Appellant Whitesell Corporation. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11865] (ECF: Matthew Devisse) [Entered: 05/28/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Matthew B. Devisse for Appellant Whitesell Corporation. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11865] (ECF: Matthew Devisse) [Entered: 05/28/2019 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Matthew B. Devisse for Appellant Whitesell Corporation. All necessary transcript(s) are on file. [19-11865] (ECF: Matthew Devisse) [Entered: 05/28/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Matthew B. Devisse for Whitesell Corporation. [19-11865] (ECF: Matthew Devisse) [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edmond E. Koester for Whitesell Corporation. [19-11865] (ECF: Edmond Koester) [Entered: 05/23/2019 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elizabeth Helmer, Electrolux Home Products, Inc. [19-11865] (ECF: Elizabeth Helmer) [Entered: 05/23/2019 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James C. Grant, Electrolux Home Products, Inc. [19-11865] (ECF: James Grant) [Entered: 05/23/2019 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Amanda Waide for Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc.. [19-11865] (ECF: Amanda Waide) [Entered: 05/23/2019 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kyle G.A. Wallace for Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc.. [19-11865] (ECF: Kyle Wallace) [Entered: 05/23/2019 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Whitesell Corporation on 05/13/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/28/2019 as to Appellant Whitesell Corporation. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/10/2019 as to Appellees Electrolux Home Products, Inc. and Husqvarna Outdoor Products, Inc. [Entered: 05/20/2019 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less