This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2021 at 06:08:17 (UTC).

Whitehead v. Traveler's Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Whitehead filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Traveler's Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2034

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Defendant

John Does, 1-10

Plaintiff / Appellant

David Louis Whitehead

Bossier, LA 71111

Defendant / Appellees

Traveler's Insurance Company

Gabrielle Bailey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David Louis Whitehead

1906 Scott Street

Bossier, LA 71111

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Meg R. Reid Esq.

Attorney at Reid & Associates

P.O. Box 2996

Hartford, CT 06104-2996

 

Court Documents

#38

#33

#32

#35

28 #2

Supporting Document

28 #1

Motion FILED

#27

#25

#19

#18

#17

#16

#9

8 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#7

#6

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to proceed in forma pauperis, [37], on behalf of Appellant David Louis Whitehead, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[3191578] [21-2034] [Entered: 10/13/2021 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Docket(#37) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant David Louis Whitehead, FILED. Service date 10/07/2021 by US mail.[3191365] [21-2034] [Entered: 10/13/2021 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file late [ # 28 ] filed by Appellee Traveler's Insurance Company and Gabrielle Bailey, Appellees opposition must be filed within 10 days of the date of this order. The Court notes that Appellants September 20, 2021 motion fails to specify what related matter is pending before the Supreme Court; however, Appellants initial motion for a stay (docket entry 12) indicated that Appellant is seeking a stay of this appeal pending the Supreme Courts decision on the case in 2d Cir. No. 20-3913, Whitehead v. Travelers Insurance Company, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [3190980][33] [21-2034] [Entered: 10/13/2021 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION ORDER, referring motion to allow statement of issues into the record to the merits panel [ # 18 ] filed by Appellant David Louis Whitehead, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [3190976][32] [21-2034] [Entered: 10/13/2021 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) REPLY TO OPPOSITION [26], on behalf of Appellant David Louis Whitehead, FILED. Service date 10/08/2021 by US mail.[3191354][35] [21-2034] [Entered: 10/13/2021 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION, to file late, on behalf of Appellee Traveler's Insurance Company and Gabrielle Bailey, FILED. Service date 10/06/2021 by US mail. [3187980] [21-2034] [Entered: 10/06/2021 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [26], on behalf of Appellee Gabrielle Bailey and Traveler's Insurance Company, FILED.[3187360] [21-2034] [Entered: 10/06/2021 08:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellee Traveler's Insurance Company, FILED. Service date 10/05/2021 by US mail. [3187189] [21-2034] [Entered: 10/05/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION ORDER, granting Appellant an extension of time to October 13, 2021 to pay the filing fee [ # 19 ] filed by Appellant David Louis Whitehead, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [3183429][25] [21-2034] [Entered: 09/29/2021 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION, to extend time [ # 16 ], [ # 19 ], on behalf of Appellant David Louis Whitehead, FILED.[3181147] [21-2034] [Entered: 09/27/2021 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docket(#13) MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant David Louis Whitehead, FILED. Service date 09/03/2021 by US mail.[3169869] [21-2034] [Entered: 09/08/2021 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docket(#12) MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant David Louis Whitehead, FILED. Service date 09/03/2021 by US mail.[3169868] [21-2034] [Entered: 09/08/2021 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Traveler's Insurance Company and Gabrielle Bailey, FILED. Service date 09/01/2021 by email, US mail.[3166377] [21-2034] [Entered: 09/01/2021 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3160851] [21-2034] [Entered: 08/23/2021 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant David Louis Whitehead, FILED.[3160850] [21-2034] [Entered: 08/23/2021 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3160713] [21-2034] [Entered: 08/23/2021 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3160705] [21-2034] [Entered: 08/23/2021 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 07/26/2021, RECEIVED.[3160701] [21-2034] [Entered: 08/23/2021 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT RULING AND ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS, dated 07/23/2021, RECEIVED.[3160697] [21-2034] [Entered: 08/23/2021 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant David Louis Whitehead, FILED. [3160691] [21-2034] [Entered: 08/23/2021 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRAVELERS INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meg R. Reid