This case was last updated from PACER on 09/06/2020 at 06:04:58 (UTC).

White Coat Waste Project v. Greater Richmond Transit Co.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 White Coat Waste Project filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Greater Richmond Transit Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1740

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT

Defendant / Appellee

GREATER RICHMOND TRANSIT COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Matthew Daniel Strugar

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MATTHEW STRUGAR

3435 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Jeffrey Edward Fogel

913 East Jefferson Street

Charlottesville, VA 22902-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Richard Earl Hill Jr.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY - RICHMOND

900 East Main Street

Richmond, VA 23219-0000

 

Court Documents

#19

(#16) COURT ORDER filed granting Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 10 ] in 20-1710. Copies to all parties. [1000795762] [20-1710, 20-1740] AB [Entered: 08/19/2020 04:16 PM]

#18

(#15) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 14 ]. Number of days granted: 15. Opening brief and appendix due 09/08/2020. Opening/Response Brief Due: 10/22/2020. Response/Reply Brief Due 11/23/2020. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000791837] [20-1710, 20-1740] EB [Entered: 08/12/2020 03:56 PM]

#17

(#14) Joint MOTION by White Coat Waste Project in 20-1710, 20-1740 to extend filing time for Opening Brief and Opening/Response Brief until September 8, 2020 (15 days) for GRTC's Opening Brief and October 22, 2020 (14 additional days) for WCW's Opening/Response Brief.. Date and method of service: 08/12/2020 ecf. [1000791634] [20-1710, 20-1740] Matthew Strugar [Entered: 08/12/2020 01:28 PM]

#15

(#13) NOTICE by Greater Richmond Transit Company in 20-1710 that a reply will be filed. [1000785569].. [20-1710, 20-1740] Richard Hill [Entered: 08/03/2020 08:35 AM]

#14

(#12) RESPONSE/ANSWER by White Coat Waste Project in 20-1710 to Motion [ # 10 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [20-1710, 20-1740] Matthew Strugar [Entered: 07/31/2020 04:48 PM]

#13

(#11) NOTICE ISSUED to White Coat Waste Project requesting response to Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 10 ]. Response due: 08/04/2020.[1000783063].. [20-1710] EB [Entered: 07/28/2020 01:05 PM]

12 #9

Additional Document

12 #8

Additional Document

12 #7

Additional Document

12 #6

Additional Document

12 #5

Additional Document

12 #4

Additional Document

12 #3

Additional Document

12 #2

Additional Document

12 #1

MOTION to Stay

#11

(#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: Greater Richmond Transit Company. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices is required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/24/2020. Opening/Response Brief Due: 09/23/2020. Response/Reply Brief Due 10/23/2020. [20-1710, 20-1740] EB [Entered: 07/14/2020 09:31 AM]

#10

(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by White Coat Waste Project. [20-1740] Matthew Strugar [Entered: 07/14/2020 01:09 AM]

#9

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by White Coat Waste Project in 20-1740, 20-1710. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000774001] [20-1740, 20-1710] Matthew Strugar [Entered: 07/14/2020 01:07 AM]

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) COURT ORDER filed granting Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 10 ] in 20-1710. Copies to all parties. [1000795762] [20-1710, 20-1740] AB [Entered: 08/19/2020 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 14 ]. Number of days granted: 15. Opening brief and appendix due 09/08/2020. Opening/Response Brief Due: 10/22/2020. Response/Reply Brief Due 11/23/2020. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000791837] [20-1710, 20-1740] EB [Entered: 08/12/2020 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint MOTION by White Coat Waste Project in 20-1710, 20-1740 to extend filing time for Opening Brief and Opening/Response Brief until September 8, 2020 (15 days) for GRTC's Opening Brief and October 22, 2020 (14 additional days) for WCW's Opening/Response Brief.. Date and method of service: 08/12/2020 ecf. [1000791634] [20-1710, 20-1740] Matthew Strugar [Entered: 08/12/2020 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by Greater Richmond Transit Company in 20-1710 that a reply will be filed. [1000785569].. [20-1710, 20-1740] Richard Hill [Entered: 08/03/2020 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE/ANSWER by White Coat Waste Project in 20-1710 to Motion [ # 10 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [20-1710, 20-1740] Matthew Strugar [Entered: 07/31/2020 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE ISSUED to White Coat Waste Project requesting response to Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 10 ]. Response due: 08/04/2020.[1000783063].. [20-1710] EB [Entered: 07/28/2020 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Greater Richmond Transit Company in 20-1710 for stay pending appeal.. Date and method of service: 07/28/2020 ecf. [1000782963] [20-1710, 20-1740] Richard Hill [Entered: 07/28/2020 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: Greater Richmond Transit Company. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices is required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/24/2020. Opening/Response Brief Due: 09/23/2020. Response/Reply Brief Due 10/23/2020. [20-1710, 20-1740] EB [Entered: 07/14/2020 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by White Coat Waste Project. [20-1740] Matthew Strugar [Entered: 07/14/2020 01:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by White Coat Waste Project in 20-1740, 20-1710. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000774001] [20-1740, 20-1710] Matthew Strugar [Entered: 07/14/2020 01:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Greater Richmond Transit Company in 20-1710, 20-1740. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000773983] [20-1710, 20-1740] Richard Hill [Entered: 07/13/2020 11:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Greater Richmond Transit Company in 20-1710, 20-1740. [1000773982] [20-1710, 20-1740] Richard Hill [Entered: 07/13/2020 11:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Matthew Strugar for White Coat Waste Project in 20-1710, 20-1740. [1000773053] [20-1710, 20-1740] Matthew Strugar [Entered: 07/10/2020 07:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1740 with 20-1710(L). Cross-appeal appellant: Greater Richmond Transit Company. Copies to all parties. [1000771156] [20-1710, 20-1740] EB [Entered: 07/08/2020 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00719-MHL. [20-1740] EB [Entered: 07/08/2020 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:17-cv-00719-MHL. Case manager: EBorneisen. [20-1740] EB [Entered: 07/08/2020 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Earl Hill, Jr.