This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/25/2021 at 06:12:13 (UTC).

Where Do We Go Berkeley, et al v. Caltrans, et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 Where Do We Go Berkeley filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Caltrans. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-16790

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

WHERE DO WE GO BERKELEY

KEVIN CODDINGTON

JOSE MORFIN

JONATHAN JAMES

KINNDRA MARTIN

MARIAH JACKSON

SHAWNA GARCIA

ALHONDRO MYERS

RONNIE BROOKS

TERRY LEE WALKER

JASON MILLER

SARAH TEAGUE

Defendant / Appellants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

TOKS OMISHAKIN, individually and in his official capacity ad Director of Caltrans

DINA EL-TAWANSY, individually and in her official capacity as Director of District Four

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

EmilyRose Johns

Attorney at Siegel, Yee, Brunner & Mehta

475 14Th Streetsuite 500

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Ardine Nieder Zazzeron

P.O. Box 24325

Oakland, CA 94623

Alex F. Pevzner Esquire

Attorney at CA Department of Transportation--Legal

111 Grand Avenuesuite 11-100

Oakland, CA 94612

Ardine Nieder Zazzeron Esquire

Attorney at CA Department of Transportation--Legal

111 Grand Avenuesuite 11-100

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SH): The unopposed motion for extension of time to file the answering brief (Docket Entry No. [ # 16 ]) is granted. The answering brief is due December 27, 2021. The optional reply brief remains due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12320101] (AF) [Entered: 12/20/2021 09:11 AM]

16 #2

Additional Document

16 #1

Main Document

#13

(#13) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 12 ] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 11 ] submitted by appellants are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12298456] (KT) [Entered: 11/26/2021 10:21 AM]

#12

(#12) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants California Department of Transportation, Dina El-Tawansy and Toks Omishakin. Date of service: 11/23/2021. [12297294] [21-16790]--[COURT UPDATE: attached corrected PDF of opening brief. 11/26/2021 by KT] (Pevzner, Alex) [Entered: 11/23/2021 06:36 PM]

#11

ER Vol 10

11 #10

ER Vol 9

11 #9

ER Vol 8

11 #8

ER Vol 7

11 #7

ER Vol 6

11 #6

ER Vol 5

11 #5

ER Vol 4

11 #4

ER Vol 3

11 #3

ER Vol 2

11 #2

ER Vol 1

11 #1

ER Vol Index

#10

(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12281774] (BLS) [Entered: 11/08/2021 03:51 PM]

#9

(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/08/2021, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12273919] (BLS) [Entered: 11/01/2021 10:17 AM]

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SH): The unopposed motion for extension of time to file the answering brief (Docket Entry No. [ # 16 ]) is granted. The answering brief is due December 27, 2021. The optional reply brief remains due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12320101] (AF) [Entered: 12/20/2021 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Filed (ECF) Appellees Ronnie Brooks, Kevin Coddington, Shawna Garcia, Mariah Jackson, Jonathan James, Kinndra Martin, Jason Miller, Jose Morfin, Alhondro Myers, Sarah Teague, Terry Lee Walker and Where Do We Go Berkeley Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 12/27/2021. Date of service: 12/16/2021. [12318637] [21-16790] (Johns, EmilyRose) [Entered: 12/16/2021 07:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 12 ] filed by Appellants. [12304830] (SD) [Entered: 12/03/2021 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 11 ] in 10 volume(s) and index volume filed by Appellants. [12304735] (LA) [Entered: 12/03/2021 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 12 ] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 11 ] submitted by appellants are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12298456] (KT) [Entered: 11/26/2021 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants California Department of Transportation, Dina El-Tawansy and Toks Omishakin. Date of service: 11/23/2021. [12297294] [21-16790]--[COURT UPDATE: attached corrected PDF of opening brief. 11/26/2021 by KT] (Pevzner, Alex) [Entered: 11/23/2021 06:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants California Department of Transportation, Toks Omishakin and Dina El-Tawansy. Date of service: 11/23/2021. [12297230] [21-16790]--[COURT UPDATE: attached correceted PDFs of excerpts of record. 11/26/2021 by KT] (Pevzner, Alex) [Entered: 11/23/2021 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12281774] (BLS) [Entered: 11/08/2021 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/08/2021, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12273919] (BLS) [Entered: 11/01/2021 10:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docket(#8) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/29/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12272955]. [21-16790] (AD) [Entered: 10/29/2021 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellants California Department of Transportation, Toks Omishakin and Dina El-Tawansy Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/29/2021. [12272911] [21-16790] (Pevzner, Alex) [Entered: 10/29/2021 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docket(#6) Added Attorney(s) Alex F. Pevzner for party(s) Appellant California Department of Transportation Appellant Dina El-Tawansy Appellant Toks Omishakin, in case 21-16790. [12272727] (RT) [Entered: 10/29/2021 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/27/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12271150]. [21-16790] (AD) [Entered: 10/27/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellees Ronnie Brooks, Kevin Coddington, Shawna Garcia, Mariah Jackson, Jonathan James, Kinndra Martin, Jason Miller, Jose Morfin, Alhondro Myers, Sarah Teague, Terry Lee Walker and Where Do We Go Berkeley Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/27/2021. [12271128] [21-16790] (Johns, EmilyRose) [Entered: 10/27/2021 05:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 10/27/2021. [12270162] (RT) [Entered: 10/27/2021 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed October 26, 2021, is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than November 23, 2021; the answering brief is due January 3, 2022 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31- 2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [12269682] (RT) [Entered: 10/26/2021 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: To be set. Preliminary injunction appeal, C.R. 3-3. [12269315] (JBS) [Entered: 10/26/2021 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant