This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/03/2022 at 06:03:36 (UTC).

Weyerhaeuser v. Burlington Insurance

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 Weyerhaeuser filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Burlington Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-30164

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Weyerhaeuser Company

Weyerhaeuser NR Company

Defendant / Appellees

Burlington Insurance Company

Evanston Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Charles Henderson Abbott Esq.

Kathleen M. O'Sullivan

Spencer M. Ritchie

Thomas Peyton Smith

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Celeste Darmstadter Elliott

Abigail Gerrity

Kristopher Todd Wilson Esq.

Seth Andrew Schmeeckle Esq.

Heather Nicole Sharp

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Weyerhaeuser Company and Weyerhaeuser NR Company [22-30164] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/04/2022 03:17 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9816913-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-30164] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/06/2022 11:36 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30164] (Celeste Darmstadter Elliott ) [Entered: 04/12/2022 08:28 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Charles Henderson Abbott, Esq. for Weyerhaeuser Company and Weyerhaeuser NR Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30164] (Charles Henderson Abbott ) [Entered: 04/14/2022 12:27 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Thomas Peyton Smith ) [Entered: 04/14/2022 12:41 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Spencer M. Ritchie ) [Entered: 04/14/2022 12:51 PM]

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Abigail Gerrity ) [Entered: 04/18/2022 09:37 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Kristopher Todd Wilson, Esq. for Burlington Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Kristopher Todd Wilson ) [Entered: 04/20/2022 11:12 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Kathleen M. O'Sullivan ) [Entered: 04/21/2022 01:51 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/06/2022 for Appellants Weyerhaeuser Company and Weyerhaeuser NR Company. [22-30164] (DDL) [Entered: 04/25/2022 03:32 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/06/2022 for Appellants Weyerhaeuser Company and Weyerhaeuser NR Company. [22-30164] (DDL) [Entered: 04/25/2022 03:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-30164] (DDL) [Entered: 04/25/2022 03:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kathleen M. O'Sullivan for party(s) Appellant Weyerhaeuser NR Company Appellant Weyerhaeuser Company, in case 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/25/2022 04:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Kathleen M. O'Sullivan ) [Entered: 04/21/2022 01:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kristopher Todd Wilson for Appellee Burlington Insurance Company in 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/21/2022 09:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Kristopher Todd Wilson, Esq. for Burlington Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Kristopher Todd Wilson ) [Entered: 04/20/2022 11:12 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Abigail Gerrity for party(s) Appellee Burlington Insurance Company, in case 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/19/2022 09:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Heather Nicole Sharp for Appellee Evanston Insurance Company in 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/19/2022 09:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Seth Andrew Schmeeckle for Appellee Evanston Insurance Company in 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/19/2022 09:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Abigail Gerrity ) [Entered: 04/18/2022 09:37 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Thomas Peyton Smith for party(s) Appellant Weyerhaeuser NR Company, Appellant Weyerhaeuser Company, in case 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/19/2022 08:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Charles Henderson Abbott for Appellant Weyerhaeuser NR Company in 22-30164, Attorney Charles Henderson Abbott for Appellant Weyerhaeuser Company in 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/18/2022 03:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Spencer M. Ritchie ) [Entered: 04/14/2022 12:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Thomas Peyton Smith ) [Entered: 04/14/2022 12:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Charles Henderson Abbott, Esq. for Weyerhaeuser Company and Weyerhaeuser NR Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30164] (Charles Henderson Abbott ) [Entered: 04/14/2022 12:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Celeste Darmstadter Elliott for party(s) Appellee Burlington Insurance Company, in case 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/12/2022 10:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30164] (Celeste Darmstadter Elliott ) [Entered: 04/12/2022 08:28 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:21-CV-905. Electronic ROA due on 04/21/2022. [22-30164] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/06/2022 11:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9816913-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-30164] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/06/2022 11:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Weyerhaeuser Company and Weyerhaeuser NR Company [22-30164] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/04/2022 03:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less