22-30164
04/04/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Insurance
Weyerhaeuser Company
Weyerhaeuser NR Company
Burlington Insurance Company
Evanston Insurance Company
Charles Henderson Abbott Esq.
Kathleen M. O'Sullivan
Spencer M. Ritchie
Thomas Peyton Smith
Celeste Darmstadter Elliott
Abigail Gerrity
Kristopher Todd Wilson Esq.
Seth Andrew Schmeeckle Esq.
Heather Nicole Sharp
PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Weyerhaeuser Company and Weyerhaeuser NR Company [22-30164] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/04/2022 03:17 PM]
INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9816913-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-30164] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/06/2022 11:36 AM]
APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30164] (Celeste Darmstadter Elliott ) [Entered: 04/12/2022 08:28 AM]
APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Charles Henderson Abbott, Esq. for Weyerhaeuser Company and Weyerhaeuser NR Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30164] (Charles Henderson Abbott ) [Entered: 04/14/2022 12:27 PM]
APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Thomas Peyton Smith ) [Entered: 04/14/2022 12:41 PM]
APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Spencer M. Ritchie ) [Entered: 04/14/2022 12:51 PM]
No Description Available
No Description Available
APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Abigail Gerrity ) [Entered: 04/18/2022 09:37 AM]
APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Kristopher Todd Wilson, Esq. for Burlington Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Kristopher Todd Wilson ) [Entered: 04/20/2022 11:12 AM]
APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Kathleen M. O'Sullivan ) [Entered: 04/21/2022 01:51 PM]
BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/06/2022 for Appellants Weyerhaeuser Company and Weyerhaeuser NR Company. [22-30164] (DDL) [Entered: 04/25/2022 03:32 PM]
DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/06/2022 for Appellants Weyerhaeuser Company and Weyerhaeuser NR Company. [22-30164] (DDL) [Entered: 04/25/2022 03:32 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-30164] (DDL) [Entered: 04/25/2022 03:32 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kathleen M. O'Sullivan for party(s) Appellant Weyerhaeuser NR Company Appellant Weyerhaeuser Company, in case 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/25/2022 04:08 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Kathleen M. O'Sullivan ) [Entered: 04/21/2022 01:51 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kristopher Todd Wilson for Appellee Burlington Insurance Company in 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/21/2022 09:39 AM]
[-] Read LessDocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Kristopher Todd Wilson, Esq. for Burlington Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Kristopher Todd Wilson ) [Entered: 04/20/2022 11:12 AM]
[-] Read LessDocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Abigail Gerrity for party(s) Appellee Burlington Insurance Company, in case 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/19/2022 09:11 AM]
[-] Read LessDocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Heather Nicole Sharp for Appellee Evanston Insurance Company in 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/19/2022 09:09 AM]
[-] Read LessDocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Seth Andrew Schmeeckle for Appellee Evanston Insurance Company in 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/19/2022 09:08 AM]
[-] Read LessDocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Abigail Gerrity ) [Entered: 04/18/2022 09:37 AM]
[-] Read LessDocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Thomas Peyton Smith for party(s) Appellant Weyerhaeuser NR Company, Appellant Weyerhaeuser Company, in case 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/19/2022 08:59 AM]
[-] Read LessDocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Charles Henderson Abbott for Appellant Weyerhaeuser NR Company in 22-30164, Attorney Charles Henderson Abbott for Appellant Weyerhaeuser Company in 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/18/2022 03:02 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Spencer M. Ritchie ) [Entered: 04/14/2022 12:51 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30164] (Thomas Peyton Smith ) [Entered: 04/14/2022 12:41 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Charles Henderson Abbott, Esq. for Weyerhaeuser Company and Weyerhaeuser NR Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30164] (Charles Henderson Abbott ) [Entered: 04/14/2022 12:27 PM]
[-] Read LessDocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Celeste Darmstadter Elliott for party(s) Appellee Burlington Insurance Company, in case 22-30164. [22-30164] (SEP) [Entered: 04/12/2022 10:59 AM]
[-] Read LessDocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30164] (Celeste Darmstadter Elliott ) [Entered: 04/12/2022 08:28 AM]
[-] Read LessDocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:21-CV-905. Electronic ROA due on 04/21/2022. [22-30164] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/06/2022 11:47 AM]
[-] Read LessDocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9816913-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-30164] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/06/2022 11:36 AM]
[-] Read LessDocketPRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Weyerhaeuser Company and Weyerhaeuser NR Company [22-30164] (WMJ) [Entered: 04/04/2022 03:17 PM]
[-] Read Less