This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2020 at 06:05:26 (UTC).

Western Star v. MarketSoup, et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 Western Star filed an Other lawsuit against MarketSoup. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1437

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN STAR, LLC.

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee

SHAUN HOLLIS

Counter Claimants

DANIEL WEBER

MARKETSOUP, INC.

3Rd Party Defendants

BILL BRADLEY

5280 WASTE SOLUTIONS, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Emily Wasserman

Attorney at Davis Graham & Stubbs

1550 Seventeenth Street, Suite 500

Denver, CO 80202

Charles Casteel

Attorney at Davis Graham & Stubbs

1550 Seventeenth Street, Suite 500

Denver, CO 80202

Michiko A. Brown

Attorney at Davis Graham & Stubbs

1550 Seventeenth Street, Suite 500

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Frank Brittin Clayton III

Attorney at Ryley Carlock & Applewhite

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 3500

Denver, CO 80203

Counter Claimant Attorney

Bruce E. Rohde

Attorney at Campbell, Bohn, Killin, Brittan & Ray

270 St. Paul Street, Suite 200

Denver, CO 80206

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10701451] Mandate issued. [19-1437] [Entered: 12/11/2019 09:10 AM]

Open Document

[10701443] Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action; Clerk of the Court. [19-1437] [Entered: 12/11/2019 09:03 AM]

Open Document

[10700977] Motion filed by Appellants Mr. Daniel Weber and MarketSoup, Inc. to dismiss case. Served on: 12/09/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1437] BER [Entered: 12/09/2019 03:51 PM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10698714] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Bruce E. Rohde for MarketSoup, Inc. and Mr. Daniel Weber. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/27/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1437] [Entered: 11/29/2019 08:44 AM]

Open Document

[10698700] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by MarketSoup, Inc. and Mr. Daniel Weber. Transcript ordered: Jury Instructions, Trial, 8/23/2019. Served on: 11/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1437] BER [Entered: 11/27/2019 07:25 PM]

Open Document

[10698698] Docketing statement filed by MarketSoup, Inc. and Mr. Daniel Weber. Served on 11/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1437] BER [Entered: 11/27/2019 07:20 PM]

Open Document

[10698509] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Michiko A. Brown and Ms. Emily Wasserman for Western Star, LLC., 5280 Waste Solutions, LLC., and Bill Bradley. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y(One of the parties listed is or was counsel of record). Served on 11/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1437] [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:34 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document #1

Prelim ROA

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701451] Mandate issued. [19-1437] [Entered: 12/11/2019 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10701443] Frap 42; Procedural termination without judicial action; Clerk of the Court. [19-1437] [Entered: 12/11/2019 09:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • [10701441] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellants motion to dismiss case, as contained in the court's final order. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-1437] [Entered: 12/11/2019 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10700977] Motion filed by Appellants Mr. Daniel Weber and MarketSoup, Inc. to dismiss case. Served on: 12/09/2019. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1437] BER [Entered: 12/09/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10699953] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 12/12/2019 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-1437] [Entered: 12/04/2019 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10698714] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Bruce E. Rohde for MarketSoup, Inc. and Mr. Daniel Weber. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 11/27/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1437] [Entered: 11/29/2019 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • [10698704] Minute order filed - Transcript order form due 12/13/2019 for Sara Mitchell (8/23/19 jury instructions and trial). (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1437] [Entered: 11/29/2019 08:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10698700] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by MarketSoup, Inc. and Mr. Daniel Weber. Transcript ordered: Jury Instructions, Trial, 8/23/2019. Served on: 11/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1437] BER [Entered: 11/27/2019 07:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10698698] Docketing statement filed by MarketSoup, Inc. and Mr. Daniel Weber. Served on 11/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1437] BER [Entered: 11/27/2019 07:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • [10698697] Entry of appearance submitted by Bruce E. Rohde for Appellants MarketSoup, Inc. and Mr. Daniel Weber for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 11/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1437] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 11/29/2019 by NA] BER [Entered: 11/27/2019 07:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10698509] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Michiko A. Brown and Ms. Emily Wasserman for Western Star, LLC., 5280 Waste Solutions, LLC., and Bill Bradley. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y(One of the parties listed is or was counsel of record). Served on 11/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1437] [Entered: 11/27/2019 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • [10698465] Entry of appearance submitted by Michiko A. Brown, Emily L. Wasserman for Not Parties 5280 Waste Solutions, LLC., Bill Bradley and Appellee Western Star, LLC. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 11/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1437] --[Edited 11/27/2019 by AT to remove PDF as pleading was filed on 11/27/2019.] MAB [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10694580] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/13/2019 Docketing statement due 11/27/2019 for MarketSoup, Inc. and Daniel Weber. Transcript order form due 11/27/2019 for MarketSoup, Inc. and Daniel Weber. Notice of appearance due on 11/27/2019 for MarketSoup, Inc., Daniel Weber, and Western Star, LLC. [19-1437] [Entered: 11/13/2019 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.