This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/05/2022 at 06:19:27 (UTC).

Wendy Gish, et al v. Gavin Newsom, et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Wendy Gish, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Gavin Newsom,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-56324

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

ROBERT LOVINGGOOD, in his official capacity as a San Bernardino County Supervisor

KAREN SPIEGEL, in her official capacity as a Riverside County Supervisor

JANICE RUTHERFORD, in her official capacity as a San Bernardino County Supervisor

V. MANUEL PEREZ, in his official capacity as a Riverside County Supervisor

KEVIN JEFFRIES, in his official capacity as a Riverside County Supervisor

GAVIN NEWSOM, in his official capacity as the Governor of California

CHUCK WASHINGTON, in his official capacity as a Riverside County Supervisor

XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of California

JOHN MCMAHON, in his official capacity as the San Bernardino County Sheriff

CURT HAGMAN, in his official capacity as a San Bernardino County Supervisor

ERIN GUSTAFSON, in her official capacity as the San Bernardino County Acting Public Health Officer

GEORGE JOHNSON, in his official capacity as the Riverside County Executive Officer and Director of Emergency Services

CAMERON KAISER, in his official capacity as the Riverside County Public Health Officer

JOSIE GONZALES, in his official capacity as a San Bernardino County Supervisor

JEFF HEWITT, in his official capacity as a Riverside County Supervisor

CHAD BIANCO, in his official capacity as a Riverside County Sheriff

Plaintiff / Appellants

BRENDA WOOD

WENDY GISH

PATRICK SCALES

JAMES DEAN MOFFATT

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michelle Blakemore

Matthew B. Nazareth Esquire

Margaret W. Rosequist Esquire

Penelope Ann Alexander-Kelley

Deborah J. Fox Esquire

Ronak N. Patel

James E. Brown

Todd Grabarsky

Lisa Jane Plank

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Mark P. Meuser

Harmeet Dhillon Esquire

Gregory Richard Michael Esquire

Ronald D. Coleman

 

Court Documents

#146

#145

#142

#52

#51

#50

7 #9

Additional Document

7 #8

Additional Document

7 #3

Additional Document

7 #2

Additional Document

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 20A120 Filed on: 02/08/2021 Cert Petition Action 1: Granted, 02/08/2021 Ruling: Vacated/Remanded, 02/08/2021 Judgment Date: 03/12/2021 [12040384] [20-55445, 20-56324] (RR) [Entered: 03/15/2021 06:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) MANDATE ISSUED.(KMW, RRC and TH) [12016453] [20-55445, 20-56324] (JFF) [Entered: 02/25/2021 10:06 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket(#55) Added Attorney(s) Ronald D. Coleman for party(s) Appellant James Dean Moffatt Appellant Patrick Scales Appellant Brenda Wood Appellant Wendy Gish, in case 20-56324 Attorney(s) Ronald D. Coleman for party(s) Appellant James Dean Moffatt Appellant Patrick Scales Appellant Brenda Wood Appellant Wendy Gish, in case 20-55445. [12008396] [20-55445, 20-56324] (JFF) [Entered: 02/18/2021 01:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • Docket(#54) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Ronald David Coleman (Dhillon Law Group Inc., 177 Post Street, Suite 700, San Francisco, CA 94108) for Appellants Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales and Brenda Wood in 20-56324, 20-55445. Date of service: 02/18/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12008315] [20-56324, 20-55445] (Coleman, Ronald) [Entered: 02/18/2021 12:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Order filed for PUBLICATION (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and TIMOTHY HILLMAN) Pursuant to the order of the United States Supreme Court dated February 8, 2021, the case is remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with South Bay United Pentecostal Church v. Newsom, 592 U.S. ___ (2021). The motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal in Case No. 20-55445 pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b) is granted. The four motions to take judicial notice in Case No. 20-55445 and the two motions to take judicial notice in Case No. 20-56324 are dismissed as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. [12006450] [20-55445, 20-56324]--[Edited (attached reformatted slip op) 02/22/2021 by AKM] (AKM) [Entered: 02/17/2021 11:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Filed (ECF) Appellants Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales and Brenda Wood in 20-56324, 20-55445 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 02/12/2021. [12002970] [20-56324, 20-55445] (Dhillon, Harmeet) [Entered: 02/12/2021 05:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Supreme Court Case Info Case number: 20A120 Filed on: 02/08/2021 Cert Petition Action 1: Granted, 02/08/2021 Ruling: Vacated/Remanded, 02/08/2021 Judgment Date: 02/08/2021 [11996606] [20-55445, 20-56324] (RR) [Entered: 02/08/2021 03:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/ [11969004] [20-55445, 20-56324] (BG) [Entered: 01/20/2021 07:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docket(#49) ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, RICHARD R. CLIFTON and TIMOTHY HILLMAN. [11966310] [20-55445, 20-56324] (BG) [Entered: 01/15/2021 03:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket(#48) Received 6 paper copies of Reply Brief [ # 45 ] filed by Appellants. (sent to panel) [11961224] [20-55445, 20-56324] (SD) [Entered: 01/12/2021 03:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellants Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales and Brenda Wood reply to response (). Date of service: 12/23/2020. [11938170] [20-56324] (Dhillon, Harmeet) [Entered: 12/23/2020 11:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellees County of San Bernardino, Erin Gustafson, Curt Hagman, John McMahon, Janice Rutherford and Dawn Rowe reply to response (motion to take judicial notice). Date of service: 12/22/2020. [11937412] [20-56324] (Fox, Deborah) [Entered: 12/22/2020 04:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellees Chad Bianco, Jeff Hewitt, Kevin Jeffries, George Johnson, Cameron Kaiser, V. Manuel Perez, Karen Spiegel and Chuck Washington response opposing motion ([ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 3 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 3 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 12/22/2020. [11937317] [20-56324] (Patel, Ronak) [Entered: 12/22/2020 03:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellees Xavier Becerra and Gavin Newsom response opposing motion ([ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 12/22/2020. [11937224] [20-56324] (Grabarsky, Todd) [Entered: 12/22/2020 03:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • Docket(#6) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/22/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11936867]. [20-56324] (AD) [Entered: 12/22/2020 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellants Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales and Brenda Wood Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/22/2020. [11936760] [20-56324] (Dhillon, Harmeet) [Entered: 12/22/2020 12:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: DLB): On December 18, 2020, appellants filed an emergency motion for an injunction pending appeal or alternatively to expedite this appeal. Any response to appellants emergency motion is due by 4:00 p.m. Pacific Time on December 22, 2020. The optional reply in support of the motion is due by 12:00 p.m. Pacific Time on December 23, 2020. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [11933769] (AC) [Entered: 12/19/2020 01:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellants Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales and Brenda Wood EMERGENCY Motion to take judicial notice of. Date of service: 12/18/2020. [11933627] [20-56324] (Dhillon, Harmeet) [Entered: 12/18/2020 05:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales and Brenda Wood EMERGENCY Motion for injunction pending appeal. Date of service: 12/18/2020. [11933593] [20-56324] (Dhillon, Harmeet) [Entered: 12/18/2020 04:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales and Brenda Wood Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/22/2020. Appellants Wendy Gish, James Dean Moffatt, Patrick Scales and Brenda Wood opening brief due 02/12/2021. Appellees Xavier Becerra, Chad Bianco, County of San Bernardino, Josie Gonzales, Erin Gustafson, Curt Hagman, Jeff Hewitt, Kevin Jeffries, George Johnson, Cameron Kaiser, Robert Lovinggood, John McMahon, Gavin Newsom, V. Manuel Perez, Dawn Rowe, Janice Rutherford, Karen Spiegel and Chuck Washington answering brief due 03/15/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11928434] (JBS) [Entered: 12/15/2020 01:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less