Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/28/2020 at 06:02:50 (UTC).

Wendy Feucht, et al v. Triad Local Schools Bd of Ed, et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 Wendy Feucht filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Triad Local Schools Bd of Ed. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-4270

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DUANE CAUDILL

CHRISTOPHER PIPER

JOHN AND JANE DOE, 11-20

JOHN AND JANE DOE, 21

TRIAD LOCAL SCHOOL DISTRICT

JOHN AND JANE DOE, 1-10

TRIAD LOCAL SCHOOLS BOARD OF EDUCATION

JESSICA GRONAS

Plaintiff / Appellants

WENDY PYFRIN FEUCHT

PAUL THOMPSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Stacy Virginia Pollock

Attorney at Mazanec Raskin & Ryder

175 S. Third Street, Suite 1000

Columbus, OH 43215-7619

Cara Michelle Wright

Attorney at Mazanec Raskin & Ryder

175 S. Third Street, Suite 1000

Columbus, OH 43215-7619

Douglas P. Holthus

Attorney at Mazanec Raskin & Ryder

175 S. Third Street, Suite 1000

Columbus, OH 43215-7619

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Natasha Wells-Niklas

Attorney at Kisling, Nestico & Redick

3412 W. Market Street

Akron, OH 44333

Donald Jeffrey Kral

Attorney at Kisling, Nestico & Redick

3412 W. Market Street

Akron, OH 44333

John J. Reagan

Attorney at Kisling, Nestico & Redick

3412 W. Market Street

Akron, OH 44333

Christopher John Van Blargan

Attorney at Kisling, Nestico & Redick

3412 W. Market Street

Akron, OH 44333

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Paul Thompson and Wendy Pyfrin Feucht by Natasha A. Wells Niklas. Certificate of Service: 01/29/2020. [19-4270] (CJV) [Entered: 01/29/2020 11:51 AM]

#13

(#13) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 03/02/2020. appellee brief now due 03/30/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 01/28/2020 04:47 PM]

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Christopher John Van Blargan for Appellants Wendy Pyfrin Feucht and Paul Thompson Certificate of Service: 01/15/2020. [19-4270] (CJV) [Entered: 01/15/2020 03:19 PM]

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Cara Michelle Wright for Appellees Duane Caudill, Jessica Gronas, Christopher Piper, Triad Local School District and Triad Local Schools Board of Education Certificate of Service: 01/13/2020. [19-4270] (CMW) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:39 PM]

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Duane Caudill, Jessica Gronas, Christopher Piper, Triad Local School District and Triad Local Schools Board of Education by Cara M. Wright. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2020. [19-4270] (CMW) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:38 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Duane Caudill, Jessica Gronas, Christopher Piper, Triad Local School District and Triad Local Schools Board of Education by Douglas P. Holthus. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2020. [19-4270] (DPH) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:22 PM]

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Duane Caudill, Jessica Gronas, Christopher Piper, Triad Local School District and Triad Local Schools Board of Education by Stacy V. Pollock. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2020. [19-4270] (SVP) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:19 PM]

#7

(#7) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Christopher John Van Blargan for Appellants Wendy Pyfrin Feucht and Paul Thompson. Certificate of Service:01/03/2020. [19-4270] (CJV) [Entered: 01/03/2020 04:11 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Wendy Pyfrin Feucht and Paul Thompson by Christopher J. Van Blargan. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2020. [19-4270] (CJV) [Entered: 01/03/2020 10:30 AM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation Conference has been scheduled for 01/22/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Robert Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:17 PM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/10/2020; appellee brief due 03/09/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:31 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Wendy Pyfrin Feucht and Paul Thompson. Transcript needed: n. (RLJ) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:28 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Paul Thompson and Wendy Pyfrin Feucht by Natasha A. Wells Niklas. Certificate of Service: 01/29/2020. [19-4270] (CJV) [Entered: 01/29/2020 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 03/02/2020. appellee brief now due 03/30/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 01/28/2020 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Christopher John Van Blargan for Appellants Wendy Pyfrin Feucht and Paul Thompson Certificate of Service: 01/15/2020. [19-4270] (CJV) [Entered: 01/15/2020 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Cara Michelle Wright for Appellees Duane Caudill, Jessica Gronas, Christopher Piper, Triad Local School District and Triad Local Schools Board of Education Certificate of Service: 01/13/2020. [19-4270] (CMW) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Duane Caudill, Jessica Gronas, Christopher Piper, Triad Local School District and Triad Local Schools Board of Education by Cara M. Wright. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2020. [19-4270] (CMW) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Duane Caudill, Jessica Gronas, Christopher Piper, Triad Local School District and Triad Local Schools Board of Education by Douglas P. Holthus. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2020. [19-4270] (DPH) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Duane Caudill, Jessica Gronas, Christopher Piper, Triad Local School District and Triad Local Schools Board of Education by Stacy V. Pollock. Certificate of Service: 01/13/2020. [19-4270] (SVP) [Entered: 01/13/2020 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Christopher John Van Blargan for Appellants Wendy Pyfrin Feucht and Paul Thompson. Certificate of Service:01/03/2020. [19-4270] (CJV) [Entered: 01/03/2020 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Wendy Pyfrin Feucht and Paul Thompson by Christopher J. Van Blargan. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2020. [19-4270] (CJV) [Entered: 01/03/2020 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation Conference has been scheduled for 01/22/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Robert Kaiser. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docket(#4) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 01/02/2020 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/10/2020; appellee brief due 03/09/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Johnson (RLJ) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Wendy Pyfrin Feucht and Paul Thompson. Transcript needed: n. (RLJ) [Entered: 12/30/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less