Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2019 at 06:06:57 (UTC).

Wells Wyatt v. Banner Bank

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 Wells Wyatt filed an Other lawsuit against Banner Bank. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1213

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

WELLS ALAN WYATT

Debtor

In re: WELLS ALAN WYATT

Appellee

BANNER BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Patrick J. Geile

953 S. Industry Way

Meridian, ID 83680

Appellee Attorney

Randall A. Peterman

Attorney at GIVENS PURSLEY LLP

601 West Bannock Street

Boise, ID 83702

 

Court Documents

4 #7

Copy:Aple's Ntc of Elect to Have Appeal Heard by Dist.Ct.- BAP Doc #3

4 #6

BAP Status Request to Bankruptcy Court - BAP Doc #2-3

4 #5

BAP Briefing Order - BAP Doc #2-2

#4

BAP Opening Letter - BAP Doc #2-1

4 #3

Adv. Docket, Bk.Ct. Memo Decision, Bk.Ct. Order and Notice of Appeal -BAP Doc #1

4 #2

BAP Docket - Re: WYATT / BAP#: ID-19-1213

4 #1

District Court Notice Sent

#3

(#3) Received from Bankruptcy Court - COPY Appellee's Notice of Election to Have Appeal Heard by District Court (objection to BAP) filed in Bk.Ct. on 09/09/2019. -- [Edited 09/25/2019 by VB - Corrected spelling: Election.] (VB) [Entered: 09/25/2019 01:04 PM]

2 #5

BAP Rules

2 #3

Banktruptcy Record Request Form

#2

Briefing Order

2 #1

Opening Letter Schedule

1 #3

Transmittal

1 #2

Notice of Referral

#1

Notice of Appeal

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • (#5) CLOSED: Case closed: Election without judicial action; 09/25/2019, ID-19-1213, Transferred by appellee's election (objection to BAP). (VB) [Entered: 09/25/2019 01:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE sent 09/25/2019 to U.S. District Court transferring appeal per appellee's notice of election to have appeal heard by U.S. District Court (objection to BAP). (VB) [Entered: 09/25/2019 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Received from Bankruptcy Court - COPY Appellee's Notice of Election to Have Appeal Heard by District Court (objection to BAP) filed in Bk.Ct. on 09/09/2019. -- [Edited 09/25/2019 by VB - Corrected spelling: Election.] (VB) [Entered: 09/25/2019 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant Wells Alan Wyatt. Copies to all parties. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. Appellant Wells Alan Wyatt's opening brief due 10/15/2019. (CLS) [Entered: 08/30/2019 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 08/28/2019, notice of referral and transmittal form. --[Edited 08/30/2019 by CLS] (CLS) [Entered: 08/30/2019 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BANNER BANK A CORPORATION is a litigant