This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/23/2020 at 06:13:33 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Pico Boulevard Group, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Wells Fargo Bank, N A filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Pico Boulevard Group, LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-16625

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., a national banking association

Defendants

THE FALLS AT RHODES RANCH CONDOMINIUM OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

PROPERTIES PLUS INVESTMENTS LLC

ALESSI & KOENIG, LLC

Not Yet Classified

PICO BOULEVARD GROUP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey L. Willis Esquire

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.

One South Church Avenue

Tucson, AZ 85701

John S. Delikanakis Esquire

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer, LLP

3883 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 1100

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Kelly Harrison Dove Esquire

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer, LLP

3883 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 1100

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Andrew Martin Jacobs Esquire

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.

One Arizona Center, 400 East Van Buren Street

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Joseph Hong

Attorney at Hong Law Offices, Ltd

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 650

Las Vegas, NV 89135

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: TAH) Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties (Docket Entry No. [ # 9 ]), this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Costs and fees shall be allocated pursuant to the parties stipulation. A copy of this order sent to the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [11866136] (WL) [Entered: 10/20/2020 04:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellant Pico Boulevard Group, LLC Stipulated Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 10/19/2020. [11863493] [20-16625] (Hong, Joseph) [Entered: 10/19/2020 11:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11836072] (CL) [Entered: 09/24/2020 03:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket(#7) Added Attorney(s) Andrew Martin Jacobs, Kelly Harrison Dove for party(s) Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., in case 20-16625. [11816761] (RR) [Entered: 09/08/2020 06:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Andrew M. Jacobs (Snell & Wilmer L.L.P., One Arizona Center, 400 E. Van Buren St., Ste. 1900, Phoenix, Arizona 85004) for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 09/08/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11816156] [20-16625] (Jacobs, Andrew) [Entered: 09/08/2020 02:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kelly H. Dove (Snell & Wilmer L.L.P., 3883 Howard Hughes Parkway, Ste. 1100, Las Vegas, Nevada 89169) for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 09/08/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11816117] [20-16625] (Dove, Kelly) [Entered: 09/08/2020 02:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 09/24/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11814552] (CL) [Entered: 09/04/2020 09:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/28/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11806907]. [20-16625] (AD) [Entered: 08/28/2020 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Pico Boulevard Group, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/28/2020. [11806516] [20-16625] (Hong, Joseph) [Entered: 08/28/2020 03:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Pico Boulevard Group, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/31/2020. Appellant Pico Boulevard Group, LLC opening brief due 10/20/2020. Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answering brief due 11/19/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11799731] (JBS) [Entered: 08/24/2020 10:33 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less