This case was last updated from PACER on 03/24/2019 at 06:08:22 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Fotiades

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 Wells Fargo Bank, N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Fotiades. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1103

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

WMC MORTGAGE, LLC, as successor-by-merger to WMC Mortgage Corp.

STEWART TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY, a/k/a Stewart Title Company

PREMIERE SETTLEMENT SERVICES, LLC

LAURA HAMMOND-KORANDA

DAVID B. MOSKOFF

Newmarket, NH 03857

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Appellees

LEONE, MCDONNELL & ROBERTS

PAULA J. DALEY DEPLANCHE

Defendant / Appellants

DAPHNE FOTIADES, a/k/a Dafne Fotiades, a/k/a Daphne Moskoff

Newmarket, NH 03857

DAPHNE M.N. FOTIADES, a/k/a Dafne Fotiades, a/k/a Daphne Moskoff

Newmarket, NH 03857

Interested Party

SAMANTHA D. ELLIOTT

Concord, NH 03302-1415

Plaintiff / Appellee

WELLS FARGO, N.A., Trustee for Option One Mortgage Loan Trust 2007-2, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2007-2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Peter M. Solomon

Attorney at Solomon Professional Assn

1 Buttrick Rd, Po Box 937

Londonderry, NH 03053-0000

David B. Moskoff

Po Box 436

Newmarket, NH 03857

Appellee Attorney

Thomas Kincaid McCraw Jr.

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP

60 State St, Ste 600

Boston, MA 02109

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Daphne Fotiades

Po Box 436

Newmarket, NH 03857

Daphne M.N. Fotiades

Po Box 436

Newmarket, NH 03857

Interested Party Attorney

Samantha D. Elliott

Attorney at Gallagher Callahan & Gartrell PC

214 N Main St

Concord, NH 03302-1415

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

John S. McNicholas

Attorney at Korde & Assoc PC

900 Chelmsford St, Ste 3102

Lowell, MA 01851

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Wells Fargo, N.A.. Certificate of service dated 02/15/2019. [19-1103] (JSM) [Entered: 02/15/2019 03:13 PM]

Open Document

AFFIDAVIT filed by Appellant Daphne Fotiades in opposition to motion for summary disposition [ # 6229681-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2019. [19-1103] (TS) [Entered: 02/15/2019 02:28 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Paula J. Daley Deplanche and Leone, McDonnell & Roberts filed by Attorney Thomas K. McCraw, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2019. [19-1103] (TKM) [Entered: 02/01/2019 06:18 PM]

Open Document

MOTION for summary disposition filed by Appellee Wells Fargo, N.A.. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2019. [19-1103] (JSM) [Entered: 02/01/2019 01:11 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Wells Fargo, N.A. filed by Attorney John S. McNicholas. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2019. [19-1103] (JSM) [Entered: 02/01/2019 01:10 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance filed by Party Daphne Fotiades. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2019. [19-1103] (TS) [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:46 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Wells Fargo, N.A.. Certificate of service dated 02/15/2019. [19-1103] (JSM) [Entered: 02/15/2019 03:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT filed by Appellant Daphne Fotiades in opposition to motion for summary disposition [ # 6229681-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 02/14/2019. [19-1103] (TS) [Entered: 02/15/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Paula J. Daley Deplanche and Leone, McDonnell & Roberts filed by Attorney Thomas K. McCraw, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2019. [19-1103] (TKM) [Entered: 02/01/2019 06:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for summary disposition filed by Appellee Wells Fargo, N.A.. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2019. [19-1103] (JSM) [Entered: 02/01/2019 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Wells Fargo, N.A. filed by Attorney John S. McNicholas. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2019. [19-1103] (JSM) [Entered: 02/01/2019 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance filed by Party Daphne Fotiades. Certificate of service dated 01/27/2019. [19-1103] (TS) [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #138) filed by Appellant Daphne Fotiades. [19-1103] (TS) [Entered: 01/23/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less