This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/23/2022 at 03:04:14 (UTC).

Wei v. Pinduoduo Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2020 Wei filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Pinduoduo Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1423

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Yoen Hung, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Jiaxiang Wei, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

Junyun Xiao

Jianming Yu

Haifeng Lin

Lei Chen

Zhenwei Zheng

Nanpeng Shen

Zheng Huang

Zhen Zhang

Tian Xu

Pinduoduo Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellants

Johan Johan

Kerry Asay

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Robert Alexander Fumerton Esq.

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Chi Tsun Steve Kwok

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

42/F, Edinburgh Tower, The Landmark

Scott Musoff

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Stephen J. Oddo Esq.

Attorney at Robbins LLP

5040 Shoreham Place

San Diego, CA 92122

Ex Kano Shirden Sams II

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#103

(#103) JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[3178038] [20-1423] [Entered: 09/22/2021 10:54 AM]

100 #3

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_2

100 #2

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_1

100 #1

Summary Order FILED

#98

(#98) NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[3165173] [20-1423] [Entered: 08/31/2021 09:41 AM]

#96

RESTRICTED

#95

(#95) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Lei Chen, Zheng Huang, Haifeng Lin, Pinduoduo Inc., Junyun Xiao and Zhenwei Zheng, FILED. Service date 08/13/2021 by CM/ECF. [3156477] [20-1423] [Entered: 08/13/2021 05:12 PM]

94 #2

form(s) sent

94 #1

Calendar_Notice_Hearing

#9

#8

#7

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[3178038] [20-1423] [Entered: 09/22/2021 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docket(#101) CAPTION, per summary order filed 08/31/2021, AMENDED.[3165197] [20-1423] [Entered: 08/31/2021 09:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) SUMMARY ORDER AND JUDGMENT, affirming the district court judgment, by BDP, GEL, JFB, FILED.[3165192] [20-1423] [Entered: 08/31/2021 09:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[3165173] [20-1423] [Entered: 08/31/2021 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docket(#97) CASE, before BDP, GEL, JFB, HEARD.[3164261] [20-1423] [Entered: 08/29/2021 11:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) INSTRUCTIONS FOR ARGUMENT to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [3158003] [20-1423] [Entered: 08/18/2021 01:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Lei Chen, Zheng Huang, Haifeng Lin, Pinduoduo Inc., Junyun Xiao and Zhenwei Zheng, FILED. Service date 08/13/2021 by CM/ECF. [3156477] [20-1423] [Entered: 08/13/2021 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) REVISED ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3154222] [20-1423] [Entered: 08/11/2021 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Kerry Asay and Johan Johan, FILED. Service date 07/14/2021 by CM/ECF. [3137878] [20-1423] [Entered: 07/14/2021 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3130101] [20-1423] [Entered: 07/01/2021 08:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION, to remove case from the Court's expedited calendar, on behalf of Appellant Kerry Asay and Johan Johan, FILED. Service date 05/21/2020 by CM/ECF. [2845434] [20-1423]--[Edited 05/22/2020 by JB] [Entered: 05/21/2020 09:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 06/19/2020, appellee's brief due date as 07/24/2020,TRANSMITTED.[2840466] [20-1423] [Entered: 05/15/2020 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jasmine Beard, ASSIGNED.[2839789] [20-1423] [Entered: 05/14/2020 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Kerry Asay and Johan Johan, FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2839036] [20-1423] [Entered: 05/13/2020 09:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Kerry Asay and Johan Johan, FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2839035] [20-1423] [Entered: 05/13/2020 09:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Kerry Asay and Johan Johan, FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2839034] [20-1423] [Entered: 05/13/2020 09:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2829887] [20-1423] [Entered: 04/30/2020 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2020, RECEIVED.[2829297] [20-1423] [Entered: 04/30/2020 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 03/30/2020, RECEIVED.[2829295] [20-1423] [Entered: 04/30/2020 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Kerry Asay and Johan Johan, FILED. [2829286] [20-1423] [Entered: 04/30/2020 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PINDUODUO INC. is a litigant