This case was last updated from PACER on 01/06/2020 at 06:03:06 (UTC).

Weeman v. Life Insurance Co. of N. Am.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 Weeman filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Co of N Am. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2088

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

MITCHELL A. WEEMAN

Bar Mills, ME 04004

Defendant / Appellee

LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Andrew Jay Bernstein

Attorney at Law Office of Joe Bornstein

5 Moulton St, Po Box 4686

Portland, ME 04112

Mitchell A. Weeman

Po Box 181

Bar Mills, ME 04004

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Byrne Joseph Decker

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

2 Monument Sq, 7Th Flr

Portland, ME 04101

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated District Court Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 12/23/2019 for appellant Mitchell A. Weeman. Appendix due 12/23/2019 for appellant Mitchell A. Weeman. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-2088] (CMP) [Entered: 11/13/2019 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #18) filed pro se by Appellant Mitchell A. Weeman. Docketing Statement due 11/21/2019. Appearance form due 11/21/2019. [19-2088]. (CMP) [Entered: 11/07/2019 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Byrne J. Decker