This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/05/2020 at 06:08:06 (UTC).

WB Music Corp., et al v. Royce Intl. Broadcasting Corp., et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 WB Music Corp , filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Royce Intl Broadcasting Corp ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55806

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

HI MOM I DIT IT

EMI APRIL MUSIC INC.

DIVINE MILL MUSIC

OBVERSE CREATION MUSIC

WB MUSIC CORP.

UNIVERSAL POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, INC.

NICE HAIR PUBLISHING

SONY ATV TUNES, LLC

HUNTERBORO MUSIC

ESKAYWHY PUBLISHING

FINGAZ GOAL MUSIC

PARTY ROCK MUSIC

UH OH ENTERTAINMENT

BUT FATHER I JUST WANT TO SING MUSIC

UNIVERSAL MUSIC CORP.

CHEBRA MUSIC

Defendant / Appellants

GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING

ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATION

PLAYA DEL SOL BROADCASTERS

SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Sharon Douglass Mayo

Jackson Paul Wagener

Cassandra Eva Havens

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Dariush G. Adli

Other Attorneys

Rory Stuart Miller

Fred D. Heather Esquire I

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator by email should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11825577] (VS) [Entered: 09/16/2020 08:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 09/15/2020, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 09/10/2020 ). [11808837] (VS) [Entered: 09/01/2020 08:09 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 09/10/2020, 2:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11799342] (VS) [Entered: 08/24/2020 08:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/13/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11788795]. [20-55806] (AD) [Entered: 08/13/2020 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC, Edward R Stolz, Esquire and Golden State Broadcasting Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/13/2020. [11788740] [20-55806] (Adli, Dariush) [Entered: 08/13/2020 05:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Golden State Broadcasting, Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Edward R Stolz Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/13/2020. Transcript ordered by 09/04/2020. Transcript due 10/05/2020. Appellants Golden State Broadcasting, Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Edward R Stolz opening brief due 11/13/2020. Appellees But Father I Just Want to Sing Music, Chebra Music, Divine Mill Music, EMI April Music Inc., Eskaywhy Publishing, Fingaz Goal Music, Hi Mom I Dit It, Hunterboro Music, Nice Hair Publishing, Obverse Creation Music, Party Rock Music, W. Lawrence Patrick, Sony ATV Tunes, LLC, UH OH Entertainment, Universal Music Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. and Yeah Baby Music answering brief due 12/14/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11779663] (JBS) [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less