20-55806
08/06/2020
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Copyright
HI MOM I DIT IT
EMI APRIL MUSIC INC.
DIVINE MILL MUSIC
OBVERSE CREATION MUSIC
WB MUSIC CORP.
UNIVERSAL POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, INC.
NICE HAIR PUBLISHING
SONY ATV TUNES, LLC
HUNTERBORO MUSIC
ESKAYWHY PUBLISHING
FINGAZ GOAL MUSIC
PARTY ROCK MUSIC
UH OH ENTERTAINMENT
BUT FATHER I JUST WANT TO SING MUSIC
UNIVERSAL MUSIC CORP.
CHEBRA MUSIC
GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING
ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATION
PLAYA DEL SOL BROADCASTERS
SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC
Sharon Douglass Mayo
Jackson Paul Wagener
Cassandra Eva Havens
Dariush G. Adli
Rory Stuart Miller
Fred D. Heather Esquire I
Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Mediation Letter
Case Opening Packet
Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator by email should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11825577] (VS) [Entered: 09/16/2020 08:22 AM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 09/15/2020, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 09/10/2020 ). [11808837] (VS) [Entered: 09/01/2020 08:09 AM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 09/10/2020, 2:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11799342] (VS) [Entered: 08/24/2020 08:49 AM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/13/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11788795]. [20-55806] (AD) [Entered: 08/13/2020 06:44 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC, Edward R Stolz, Esquire and Golden State Broadcasting Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/13/2020. [11788740] [20-55806] (Adli, Dariush) [Entered: 08/13/2020 05:30 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Golden State Broadcasting, Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Edward R Stolz Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/13/2020. Transcript ordered by 09/04/2020. Transcript due 10/05/2020. Appellants Golden State Broadcasting, Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Edward R Stolz opening brief due 11/13/2020. Appellees But Father I Just Want to Sing Music, Chebra Music, Divine Mill Music, EMI April Music Inc., Eskaywhy Publishing, Fingaz Goal Music, Hi Mom I Dit It, Hunterboro Music, Nice Hair Publishing, Obverse Creation Music, Party Rock Music, W. Lawrence Patrick, Sony ATV Tunes, LLC, UH OH Entertainment, Universal Music Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. and Yeah Baby Music answering brief due 12/14/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11779663] (JBS) [Entered: 08/06/2020 11:39 AM]
[-] Read Less