This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/07/2023 at 00:33:03 (UTC).

WB Music Corp., et al v. Royce Intl. Broadcasting Corp., et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 WB Music Corp , filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Royce Intl Broadcasting Corp ,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55264

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

EMI APRIL MUSIC INC.

DIVINE MILL MUSIC

OBVERSE CREATION MUSIC

WB MUSIC CORP.

UNIVERSAL POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, INC.

NICE HAIR PUBLISHING

SONY ATV TUNES, LLC

HUNTERBORO MUSIC

ESKAYWHY PUBLISHING

FINGAZ GOAL MUSIC

PARTY ROCK MUSIC

UH OH ENTERTAINMENT

BUT FATHER I JUST WANT TO SING MUSIC

UNIVERSAL MUSIC CORP.

CHEBRA MUSIC

Defendant / Appellants

GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING

ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATION

PLAYA DEL SOL BROADCASTERS

SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Sharon Douglass Mayo

Richard H. Reimer

Jackson Paul Wagener

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Donald Charles Schwartz Esquire

G. Scott Sobel

Other Attorneys

Fred D. Heather Esquire I

Rory Stuart Miller

Aaron Peter Allan

 

Court Documents

#86

(#86) MANDATE ISSUED.(AWT, PJW and MTF) Costs taxed against Appellant in the amount of $67.44. Mandate issues to all parties except Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Golden State Broadcasting. [12567530] (RL) [Entered: 10/19/2022 12:08 PM]

#85

(#85) Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, PAUL J. WATFORD and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) Judges Watford and Friedland vote to deny the petition for rehearing en banc and Judge Tashima so recommends. The full court has been advised of the petition for rehearing en banc and no judge of the court has requested a vote on en banc rehearing. See Fed. R. App. P. 35(f). The petition for rehearing en banc is denied. [12559593] (WL) [Entered: 10/11/2022 09:55 AM]

#84

(#84) Filed (ECF) Appellant Golden State Broadcasting petition for rehearing en banc (from 09/14/2022 opinion). Date of service: 09/14/2022. [12540714] [21-55264] (Schwartz, Donald) [Entered: 09/14/2022 09:57 PM]

#83

(#83) Filed (ECF) Appellee W. Lawrence Patrick bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of 67.44 USD. Date of service: 09/14/2022 [12540392] [21-55264] (Heather, Fred) [Entered: 09/14/2022 02:57 PM]

#82

(#82) Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 63 ] submitted by appellants is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [12531219] (SML) [Entered: 08/31/2022 04:59 PM]

81 #2

Post Judgment Form

81 #1

Opinion

#63

(#82) Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 63 ] submitted by appellants is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [12531219] (SML) [Entered: 08/31/2022 04:59 PM]

#54

(#81) FILED OPINION (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, PAUL J. WATFORD and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) AFFIRMED. The pending motions for judicial notice (Docket #[ # 54 ]) and to file a combined reply brief (Docket #[ # 62 ]) are GRANTED. Judge: AWT Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [12530254] (MM) [Entered: 08/31/2022 08:57 AM]

#6

#5

3 #2

Emergency Motion Under Circuit Rule 27-3 to Dismiss the Receiver, Terminate the

3 #1

Certificate for Emergency Motion

#2

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) MANDATE ISSUED.(AWT, PJW and MTF) Costs taxed against Appellant in the amount of $67.44. Mandate issues to all parties except Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Golden State Broadcasting. [12567530] (RL) [Entered: 10/19/2022 12:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, PAUL J. WATFORD and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) Judges Watford and Friedland vote to deny the petition for rehearing en banc and Judge Tashima so recommends. The full court has been advised of the petition for rehearing en banc and no judge of the court has requested a vote on en banc rehearing. See Fed. R. App. P. 35(f). The petition for rehearing en banc is denied. [12559593] (WL) [Entered: 10/11/2022 09:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Filed (ECF) Appellant Golden State Broadcasting petition for rehearing en banc (from 09/14/2022 opinion). Date of service: 09/14/2022. [12540714] [21-55264] (Schwartz, Donald) [Entered: 09/14/2022 09:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Filed (ECF) Appellee W. Lawrence Patrick bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of 67.44 USD. Date of service: 09/14/2022 [12540392] [21-55264] (Heather, Fred) [Entered: 09/14/2022 02:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Filed clerk order: The reply brief [ # 63 ] submitted by appellants is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [12531219] (SML) [Entered: 08/31/2022 04:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) FILED OPINION (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, PAUL J. WATFORD and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) AFFIRMED. The pending motions for judicial notice (Docket #[ # 54 ]) and to file a combined reply brief (Docket #[ # 62 ]) are GRANTED. Judge: AWT Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [12530254] (MM) [Entered: 08/31/2022 08:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) Filed Audio recording of oral argument. Note: Video recordings of public argument calendars are available on the Court's website, at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/media/ [12502866] (BG) [Entered: 07/26/2022 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Docket(#79) ARGUED AND SUBMITTED TO A. WALLACE TASHIMA, PAUL J. WATFORD and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND. [12501178] (BG) [Entered: 07/25/2022 12:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • Docket(#78) Added Attorney(s) Aaron Peter Allan for party(s) Appellee W. Lawrence Patrick, in case 21-55264. [12499409] (NAC) [Entered: 07/21/2022 03:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • Docket(#77) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Aaron P. Allan (Glaser Weil LLP, 10250 Constellation Blvd. 19th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90067) for Appellee W. Lawrence Patrick. Date of service: 07/21/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12499342] [21-55264] (Allan, Aaron) [Entered: 07/21/2022 02:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellants Edward R Stolz, Esquire, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Playa Del Sol Broadcasters and Golden State Broadcasting reply to response (). Date of service: 04/16/2021. [12077716] [21-55264] (Adli, Dariush) [Entered: 04/16/2021 03:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellees But Father I Just Want to Sing Music, Chebra Music, Divine Mill Music, EMI April Music Inc., Eskaywhy Publishing, Fingaz Goal Music, Hi Mom I Dit It, Hunterboro Music, Nice Hair Publishing, Obverse Creation Music, Party Rock Music, Sony ATV Tunes, LLC, UH OH Entertainment, Universal Music Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. and Yeah Baby Music response opposing motion ([ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 04/09/2021. [12070093] [21-55264] (Mayo, Sharon) [Entered: 04/09/2021 07:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellee W. Lawrence Patrick response opposing motion ([ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 5 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 3 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 3 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 04/09/2021. [12069809] [21-55264] (Miller, Rory) [Entered: 04/09/2021 03:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellants Golden State Broadcasting, Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Edward R Stolz, Esquire EMERGENCY Motion to dismiss party from case. Date of service: 04/08/2021. [12068275] [21-55264] (Adli, Dariush) [Entered: 04/08/2021 02:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12062369] (VS) [Entered: 04/02/2021 02:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket(#4) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/30/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12058933]. [21-55264] (AD) [Entered: 03/31/2021 06:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellants Golden State Broadcasting, Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Edward R Stolz, Esquire Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to file oversized document]. Date of service: 03/30/2021. [12059281] --[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [ # 3 ] .] (TYL) [Entered: 03/31/2021 10:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellants Golden State Broadcasting, Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Edward R Stolz, Esquire EMERGENCY Motion to dismiss party from case. Date of service: 03/30/2021. [12058911] [21-55264] --[COURT UPDATE: Removed moition (refiled in entry [ # 5 ]). 3/31/2021 by TYL] (Adli, Dariush) [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC, Edward R Stolz, Esquire and Golden State Broadcasting Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/30/2021. [12058910] [21-55264] (Adli, Dariush) [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Golden State Broadcasting, Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Edward R Stolz Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/29/2021. Transcript ordered by 04/19/2021. Transcript due 05/17/2021. Appellants Golden State Broadcasting, Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Edward R Stolz opening brief due 06/28/2021. Appellees But Father I Just Want to Sing Music, Chebra Music, Divine Mill Music, EMI April Music Inc., Eskaywhy Publishing, Fingaz Goal Music, Hi Mom I Dit It, Hunterboro Music, Nice Hair Publishing, Obverse Creation Music, Party Rock Music, W. Lawrence Patrick, Sony ATV Tunes, LLC, UH OH Entertainment, Universal Music Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. and Yeah Baby Music answering brief due 07/28/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12048722] (JBS) [Entered: 03/22/2021 10:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less