21-55138
02/19/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Copyright
HI MOM I DIT IT
EMI APRIL MUSIC INC.
DIVINE MILL MUSIC
OBVERSE CREATION MUSIC
WB MUSIC CORP.
UNIVERSAL POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, INC.
NICE HAIR PUBLISHING
SONY ATV TUNES, LLC
HUNTERBORO MUSIC
ESKAYWHY PUBLISHING
FINGAZ GOAL MUSIC
PARTY ROCK MUSIC
UH OH ENTERTAINMENT
BUT FATHER I JUST WANT TO SING MUSIC
UNIVERSAL MUSIC CORP.
CHEBRA MUSIC
GOLDEN STATE BROADCASTING
ROYCE INTERNATIONAL BROADCASTING CORPORATION
PLAYA DEL SOL BROADCASTERS
SILVER STATE BROADCASTING, LLC
Sharon Douglass Mayo
Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111-4024
Jackson Paul Wagener
Attorney at Ascap
250 West 57Th Street
New York, NY 10107
Dariush G. Adli
Attorney at Adli Law Group PC
12400 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1460
Los Angeles, CA 90025
Fred D. Heather Esquire I
Attorney at Glaser Weil LLP
10250 Constellation Boulevard
Los Angeles, CA 90067-5010
Rory Stuart Miller
Attorney at Glaser Weil LLP
10250 Constellation Boulevard
Los Angeles, CA 90067-5010
Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Mediation Letter
Mediation Questionnaire
Case Opening Packet
Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 04/01/2021, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 03/25/2021 ). [12052017] (VS) [Entered: 03/24/2021 12:54 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 03/25/2021, 11:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12027628] (VS) [Entered: 03/08/2021 12:37 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/26/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12018817]. [21-55138] (AD) [Entered: 02/26/2021 06:44 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Golden State Broadcasting, Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Edward R Stolz, Esquire Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/26/2021. [12018569] [21-55138] (Adli, Dariush) [Entered: 02/26/2021 03:49 PM]
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Golden State Broadcasting, Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Edward R Stolz Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/26/2021. Transcript ordered by 03/19/2021. Transcript due 04/19/2021. Appellants Golden State Broadcasting, Playa Del Sol Broadcasters, Royce International Broadcasting Corporation, Silver State Broadcasting, LLC and Edward R Stolz opening brief due 05/28/2021. Appellees But Father I Just Want to Sing Music, Chebra Music, Divine Mill Music, EMI April Music Inc., Eskaywhy Publishing, Fingaz Goal Music, Hi Mom I Dit It, Hunterboro Music, Nice Hair Publishing, Obverse Creation Music, Party Rock Music, W. Lawrence Patrick, Sony ATV Tunes, LLC, UH OH Entertainment, Universal Music Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. and Yeah Baby Music answering brief due 06/28/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12009817] (RT) [Entered: 02/19/2021 01:16 PM]
[-] Read Less