This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/21/2022 at 06:10:46 (UTC).

Waters v. Facebook, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Waters filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Facebook, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1054

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendants

JEREMY HALEY

MARTHA SMITH-BLACKMORE

WILLIAM HIGGINS

JIM DALTON

MAURA TRACY HEALEY

Plaintiff / Appellant

RIAN G. WATERS

East Longmeadow, MA 01028

Defendant / Appellees

FACEBOOK, INC.

GOOGLE LLC

AIDAN KEARNEY

KATHERINE PETER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Martin Batchelor

Attorney at MA Attorney General's Office

1441 Main St, Ste 1200

Springfield, MA 01103-1400

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Rian G. Waters

199 Allen St

East Longmeadow, MA 01028

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Matan Shacham

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery St

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Joseph H. Aronson

Attorney at Kiernan Trebach LLP

40 Court St, 3Rd Flr

Boston, MA 02108

Stephen P. Hall

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

222 Berkeley St, Ste 2000

Boston, MA 02116

Erica Symone Miranda

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery St

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Eric Shumsky

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1152 15Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005-1706

Laura B. Kirshenbaum

Attorney at Rose Law Partners LLP

1 Beacon St, 23Rd Flr

Boston, MA 02108

Jason B. Mollick

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 40Th Flr

New York, NY 10019-6022

Alan D. Rose Sr.

Attorney at Rose Law Partners LLP

1 Beacon St, 23Rd Flr

Boston, MA 02108

Ryan P. McLane

Attorney at McLane & McLane LLC

269 S Westfield St, Po Box 105

Feeding Hills, MA 01030

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Google LLC filed by Attorney Jason B. Mollick. Served on 01/24/2022. [22-1054] (JBM) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:20 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellant Rian G. Waters. Served on 01/31/2022. [22-1054] (RGW) [Entered: 01/31/2022 03:10 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Facebook, Inc. filed by Attorney Eric Shumsky. Served on 02/01/2022. [22-1054] (ES) [Entered: 02/01/2022 03:00 PM]

Open Document

JUDGMENT entered: Upon consideration of appellant's unopposed motion, it is hereby ordered that this appeal be voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Mandate to issue forthwith. [22-1054] (JMK) [Entered: 02/14/2022 10:53 AM]

Open Document

MANDATE issued. [22-1054] (JMK) [Entered: 02/14/2022 10:54 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE issued. [22-1054] (JMK) [Entered: 02/14/2022 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT entered: Upon consideration of appellant's unopposed motion, it is hereby ordered that this appeal be voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Mandate to issue forthwith. [22-1054] (JMK) [Entered: 02/14/2022 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Facebook, Inc. filed by Attorney Eric Shumsky. Served on 02/01/2022. [22-1054] (ES) [Entered: 02/01/2022 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellant Rian G. Waters. Served on 01/31/2022. [22-1054] (RGW) [Entered: 01/31/2022 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Google LLC filed by Attorney Jason B. Mollick. Served on 01/24/2022. [22-1054] (JBM) [Entered: 01/24/2022 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 03/07/2022 for appellant Rian G. Waters. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [22-1054] (JMK) [Entered: 01/24/2022 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #115) filed by Appellant Rian G. Waters. Fee due 02/03/2022 . [22-1054] (JMK) [Entered: 01/20/2022 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Martin Batchelor