This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/29/2020 at 06:15:07 (UTC).

Wastow Enterprises, LLC v. TruckMovers.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 Wastow Enterprises, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against TruckMovers com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2349

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

TRUCKMOVERS.COM, INC.

DEALER'S CHOICE TRUCKAWAY SYSTEM, INC, dba TruckMovers

Plaintiff / Appellant

WASTOW ENTERPRISES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Keith Jude Grady

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

100 South Fourth Street, Suite 1000

St. Louis, MO 63102

Michael Dulin

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

1401 Lawrence Street

Denver, CO 80202

Colby Brian Springer

Attorney at Polsinelli LLP

3 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Daniel A. Kent Esq.

Attorney at Kent & Risley LLC

5755 N Point Parkway

Alpharetta, GA 30022

Samuel Najim

Attorney at Kent & Risley LLC

5755 N Point Parkway

Alpharetta, GA 30022

Olivia Marbutt

Attorney at Kent & Risley LLC

5755 N Point Parkway

Alpharetta, GA 30022

Stephen Robert Risley

Attorney at Kent & Risley, LLC

5755 North Point Parkway, Suite 57

Alpharetta, GA 30022

Cortney Alexander

Attorney at Kent & Risley LLC

5755 N Point Parkway

Alpharetta, GA 30022

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#8

#9

#10

#12

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 13 ] filed by Appellant Wastow Enterprises, LLC. The opening brief is due 12/14/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [731753] [EKD] [Entered: 10/27/2020 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION of Appellant Wastow Enterprises, LLC to extend the time to 12/14/2020 to file brief. Service: 10/27/2020 by email. [731666] [20-2349] [Daniel Kent] [Entered: 10/27/2020 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Docketing Statement for the Appellees TruckMovers.com, Inc. and Dealer's Choice Truckaway Systems, Inc. Service: 10/20/2020 by email. [730323] [20-2349]--[Edited 10/20/2020 by JAL to add party filer] [Michael Dulin] [Entered: 10/20/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#11) Notice to Appellees Dealer's Choice Truckaway System, Inc and TruckMovers.com, Inc.: The record of this case indicates that no Docketing Statement under FCR 33.1(a) has been filed. Failure to file required documents may result in adverse action. See FCR 25(h). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [730237] [EKD] [Entered: 10/20/2020 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Interest for Appellee TruckMovers.com, Inc.. Service: 10/14/2020 by email. [728608] [20-2349] [Michael Dulin] [Entered: 10/14/2020 01:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Entry of appearance for Michael P. Dulin; Colby B. Springer as counsel for Appellee TruckMovers.com, Inc.. Service: 10/14/2020 by email. [728604] [20-2349] [Michael Dulin] [Entered: 10/14/2020 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellees Dealer's Choice Truckaway System, Inc and TruckMovers.com, Inc., Entry of Appearance and Certificate of Interest [ # 5 ], [ # 6 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents are due on 10/21/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [728576] [EKD] [Entered: 10/14/2020 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re: Doc No. [ # 5 ], Doc No. [ # 6 ], ERROR: The case number is incorrect. CORRECTION: For future filings, please use case number 20-2349. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. [728573] [EKD] [Entered: 10/14/2020 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Dealer's Choice Truckaway System, Inc and TruckMovers.com, Inc.. Service: 10/14/2020 by email. [728551] [20-2349] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 8 ] [John Posthumus] [Entered: 10/14/2020 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Michael P. Dulin; Colby B. Springer as counsel for Appellees TruckMovers.com, Inc. and Dealer's Choice Truckaway System, Inc. Service: 10/14/2020 by email. [728548] [20-2349] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 8 ] [John Posthumus] [Entered: 10/14/2020 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Wastow Enterprises, LLC. Service: 10/09/2020 by email. [727960] [20-2349] [Daniel Kent] [Entered: 10/09/2020 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Wastow Enterprises, LLC. Service: 10/09/2020 by email. [727956] [20-2349] [Daniel Kent] [Entered: 10/09/2020 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Daniel A. Kent; Stephen R. Risley; Samuel J. Najim; Olivia E. Marbutt; Cortney Alexander as counsel for Appellant Wastow Enterprises, LLC. Service: 10/09/2020 by email. [727955] [20-2349] [Daniel Kent] [Entered: 10/09/2020 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/29/2020. [725624] Entry of Appearance is due on 10/14/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/14/2020. Docketing Statement is due on 10/14/2020. Appellant's brief is due on 11/30/2020. [EKD] [Entered: 09/30/2020 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Truckmovers.com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEALERS CHOICE TRUCKAWAY SYSTEM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cortney Alexander