This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 06:25:41 (UTC).

Wasserman v. Commissioner, SSA

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 Wasserman filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, SSA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5109

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants

COMMISSIONER, SSA

ANDREW M. SAUL, Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff / Appellee

DARYN LEE WASSERMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jennifer Ann Randall

Attorney at Social Security Administration, Region VIII

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294-4003

Marc Thayne Warner

Attorney at Social Security Administration, Region VIII

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294-4003

Jeffrey Andrew Gallant

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

110 West 7Th Street, Suite 300

Tulsa, OK 74119

Kirsten A. Westerland

Attorney at Social Security Administration, Region VIII

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294-4003

Daniel J. Aguilar

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Mark B. Stern

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Joshua Marc Salzman

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Paul F. McTighe Jr.

Attorney at Paul F. McTighe, Jr. Law Office

6506 South Lewis Avenue, Suite 105

Tulsa, OK 74136-1020

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #2

Errata Sheet

Open Restricted Document #1

Main Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

[10708574] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellant's unopposed motion for abeyance. The court vacates the existing deadline for appellants consolidated opening brief and appendix. The court directs the Commissioner to file a written status report within five days after any developments that impact the abatement of this appeal. Served on 01/09/2020. [19-5108, 19-5109] [Entered: 01/09/2020 02:13 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

[10703235] Order filed by Clerk of the Court consolidating appeals 19-5108 and 19-5109. Served on 12/17/2019. [19-5108, 19-5109] [Entered: 12/17/2019 12:32 PM]

Open Restricted Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Restricted Document #1

Main Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10708574] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting appellant's unopposed motion for abeyance. The court vacates the existing deadline for appellants consolidated opening brief and appendix. The court directs the Commissioner to file a written status report within five days after any developments that impact the abatement of this appeal. Served on 01/09/2020. [19-5108, 19-5109] [Entered: 01/09/2020 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10708348] Motion filed by Appellant Commissioner, SSA in 19-5108, 19-5109 to abate case. Served on: 01/09/2020. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-5108, 19-5109] DJA [Entered: 01/09/2020 07:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10703235] Order filed by Clerk of the Court consolidating appeals 19-5108 and 19-5109. Served on 12/17/2019. [19-5108, 19-5109] [Entered: 12/17/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10703005] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Paul F. McTighe, Jr. for Daryn Lee Wasserman. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5109] [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docket[10702973] Entry of appearance submitted by Paul F McTighe Jr for Appellee Daryn Lee Wasserman for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/16/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5109]--[Edited 12/16/2019 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 12/16/19. ] PFM [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702903] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 12/16/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 01/27/2020 for Commissioner, SSA. [19-5109] [Entered: 12/16/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702342] Errata sheet for the docketing statement filed by Mr. Daniel J. Aguilar for Commissioner, SSA. Served on 12/13/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5109] DJA [Entered: 12/13/2019 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket[10702162] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 12/19/2019 for Mark C. McCartt, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-5109] [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702158] Notice of deficient docketing statement received from Commissioner, SSA.. [19-5109] [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702152] Notice received from Commissioner, SSA that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-5109] DJA [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702149] Docketing statement filed by Commissioner, SSA. Served on 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5109] --[Edited 12/13/2019 by SLS to attach errata sheet.] DJA [Entered: 12/12/2019 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702116] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Daniel J. Aguilar, Mr. Joshua Marc Salzman and Mr. Mark B. Stern for Commissioner, SSA. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5109] [Entered: 12/12/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket[10702053] Entry of appearance submitted by Mark B. Stern, Joshua M. Salzman, Daniel Aguilar for Appellant Commissioner, SSA for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/12/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5109]--[Edited 12/12/2019 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 12/12/19.] DJA [Entered: 12/12/2019 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10702018] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Kirsten A. Westerland for Commissioner, SSA. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5109] [Entered: 12/12/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docket[10701698] Entry of appearance submitted by Kirsten A. Westerland for Appellant Commissioner, SSA for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/11/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5109]--[Edited 12/12/2019 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 12/12/19.] KAW [Entered: 12/11/2019 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10699167] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 12/02/2019 Docketing statement due 12/16/2019 for Social Security Administration. Transcript order form due 12/16/2019 for Social Security Administration. Notice of appearance due on 12/16/2019 for Social Security Administration and Daryn Lee Wasserman. [19-5109] [Entered: 12/02/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.