This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/03/2022 at 10:53:28 (UTC).

Warith Muhammad v. Home Box Office Incorporated

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 Warith Muhammad filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Home Box Office Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1110

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

WARITH R. MUHAMMAD

Peoria, IL 61605

WARITH R. MUHAMMAD, I

Peoria, IL 61605

Defendant / Appellee

HOME BOX OFFICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Warith R. Muhammad

2904 W. Antoinette Street

Peoria, IL 61605

Warith R. Muhammad I

Attorney at RAW HIT ENTERTAINMENT

2904 W. Antoinette Street

Peoria, IL 61605

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Natalie Spears

Attorney at DENTONS US LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-6361

Donald M. Craven

Attorney at DONALD M. CRAVEN PC

1005 N. Seventh Street

Springfield, IL 62702-3218

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER re: Supplemental brief, which this court construes as a motion to file a supplemental brief. [ # 22 ] The motion is DENIED. JPK [23] [7239761] [22-1110] (CG) [Entered: 06/01/2022 10:52 AM]

#22

(#22) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mr. Warith R. Muhammad, I to file a supplemental brief, construed per the court's 6/1/2022 order. [22] [7239758] [22-1110]--[Edited 06/01/2022 by CMD to update text.] (CG) [Entered: 06/01/2022 10:50 AM]

#21

(#21) Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Natalie J. Spears for Appellee Home Box Office Inc.. [21] [7236725] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1110] (Spears, Natalie) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:27 PM]

#19

(#19) 10 copies Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellant Mr. Warith R. Muhammad, I. Disk not required. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [19] [7232054] [22-1110] (CAG) [Entered: 04/26/2022 02:00 PM]

#18

(#18) Brief deficiency letter sent to Appellee Home Box Office Inc.. The Appellee brief was electronically filed on 04/04/2022. The paper copies of this brief were due to be submitted to the Clerk's Office by 04/11/2022. The paper copies have not been received by this court. Paper copies due on 04/29/2022 or the court may issue a Rule of Show Cause order pursuant to Circuit Rule 31. [18] [7231525] [22-1110] (MLM) [Entered: 04/22/2022 03:34 PM]

#17

(#17) Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellee Home Box Office Inc.. [17] [7230829] [22-1110] (Spears, Natalie) [Entered: 04/20/2022 10:28 AM]

#16

(#16) ORDER: Appellee Home Box Office Inc. shall file a paper captioned "Amended Jurisdictional Statement" that provides the omitted information noted in this order and otherwise complies with all the requirements of Fed.R.App.P. 28(a)(4) and Cir. Rule 28(a). The Clerk shall DISTRIBUTE, along with the briefs in this appeal, copies of this order and the "Amended Jurisdictional Statement" to the assigned merits panel. Amended jurisdictional statement due no later than 04/20/2022 for Appellee Home Box Office Inc. (See order for details) DW [16] [7229540] [22-1110] (AP) [Entered: 04/13/2022 12:47 PM]

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Natalie J. Spears for Appellee Home Box Office Inc.. [5] [7217049] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1110]--[Edited 02/14/2022 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Spears, Natalie) [Entered: 02/14/2022 12:10 PM]

4 #2

Instructions

4 #1

3(c) Rule to Showcause Order

#3

(#3) ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/03/2022 for Warith R. Muhammad. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/04/2022 for Home Box Office Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/25/2022 for Appellant Warith R. Muhammad [3] [7214660] [22-1110] (CAG) [Entered: 02/01/2022 11:49 AM]

#2

(#2) Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [2] [7214656] [22-1110] (CAG) [Entered: 02/01/2022 11:47 AM]

1 #4

Fee Notice

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Case

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER re: Supplemental brief, which this court construes as a motion to file a supplemental brief. [ # 22 ] The motion is DENIED. JPK [23] [7239761] [22-1110] (CG) [Entered: 06/01/2022 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Mr. Warith R. Muhammad, I to file a supplemental brief, construed per the court's 6/1/2022 order. [22] [7239758] [22-1110]--[Edited 06/01/2022 by CMD to update text.] (CG) [Entered: 06/01/2022 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Amended Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Natalie J. Spears for Appellee Home Box Office Inc.. [21] [7236725] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1110] (Spears, Natalie) [Entered: 05/17/2022 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket(#20) Paper copies of appellee brief and appendix filed by Appellee Home Box Office Inc.. [20] [7232570] [22-1110] (MLM) [Entered: 04/28/2022 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) 10 copies Appellant's reply brief filed by Appellant Mr. Warith R. Muhammad, I. Disk not required. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [19] [7232054] [22-1110] (CAG) [Entered: 04/26/2022 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Brief deficiency letter sent to Appellee Home Box Office Inc.. The Appellee brief was electronically filed on 04/04/2022. The paper copies of this brief were due to be submitted to the Clerk's Office by 04/11/2022. The paper copies have not been received by this court. Paper copies due on 04/29/2022 or the court may issue a Rule of Show Cause order pursuant to Circuit Rule 31. [18] [7231525] [22-1110] (MLM) [Entered: 04/22/2022 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Amended Jurisdictional Statement filed by Appellee Home Box Office Inc.. [17] [7230829] [22-1110] (Spears, Natalie) [Entered: 04/20/2022 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: Appellee Home Box Office Inc. shall file a paper captioned "Amended Jurisdictional Statement" that provides the omitted information noted in this order and otherwise complies with all the requirements of Fed.R.App.P. 28(a)(4) and Cir. Rule 28(a). The Clerk shall DISTRIBUTE, along with the briefs in this appeal, copies of this order and the "Amended Jurisdictional Statement" to the assigned merits panel. Amended jurisdictional statement due no later than 04/20/2022 for Appellee Home Box Office Inc. (See order for details) DW [16] [7229540] [22-1110] (AP) [Entered: 04/13/2022 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Submitted Supplemental Appendix by Natalie Spears for Appellee Home Box Office Inc.. [13] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7228086] [22-1110] (Spears, Natalie) [Entered: 04/07/2022 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Re-Submitted appellee brief by Natalie Spears for Appellee Home Box Office Inc.. [12] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7228077] [22-1110] (Spears, Natalie) [Entered: 04/07/2022 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE: Attorney Natalie Spears for Appellee Home Box Office Inc. will not be available for oral argument June 7-8, 2022 and August 2-3, 2022. [10] [7227342] [22-1110] (Spears, Natalie) [Entered: 04/04/2022 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Submitted Supplemental Appendix by Natalie J. Spears for Appellee Home Box Office Inc.. [9] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7227337] [22-1110] (Spears, Natalie) [Entered: 04/04/2022 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Submitted appellee brief by Natalie J. Spears for Appellee Home Box Office Inc.. [8] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [7227336] [22-1110] (Spears, Natalie) [Entered: 04/04/2022 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 10 copies of Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Mr. Warith R. Muhammad, I. Disk not required. REMINDER: Hearing notices are mailed shortly before the date of oral argument. Please note that counsel's unavailability for oral argument must be submitted by letter, filed electronically with the Clerk's Office, no later than the filing of the appellant's brief in a criminal case and the filing of an appellee's brief in a civil case. See Cir. R. 34(b)(3). The court's calendar is located at http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov/cal/argcalendar.pdf. Once scheduled, oral argument is rescheduled only in extraordinary circumstances. See Cir. R. 34(b)(4), (e). [7] [7221131] [22-1110] (MLM) [Entered: 03/04/2022 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Warith R. Muhammad. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7218480] [22-1110] (PS) [Entered: 02/22/2022 09:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Natalie J. Spears for Appellee Home Box Office Inc.. [5] [7217049] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-1110]--[Edited 02/14/2022 by MM to reflect addition of counsel.] (Spears, Natalie) [Entered: 02/14/2022 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Appellant Warith R. Muhammad is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Warith R. Muhammad by 02/22/2022. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7020 2450 0002 1930 3242. [4] [7215670] [22-1110] (AD) [Entered: 02/07/2022 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: This court received notice from the District Court that the appellant paid the required docketing fee. Briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 03/03/2022 for Warith R. Muhammad. Appellee's brief due on or before 04/04/2022 for Home Box Office Inc.. Appellant's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 04/25/2022 for Appellant Warith R. Muhammad [3] [7214660] [22-1110] (CAG) [Entered: 02/01/2022 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed notice from the District Court that the appeal docketing fee was received. [2] [7214656] [22-1110] (CAG) [Entered: 02/01/2022 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Warith R. Muhammad by 02/01/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 02/07/2022. Fee or IFP forms due on 02/07/2022 for Appellant Warith R. Muhammad [1] [7212968] [22-1110] (AG) [Entered: 01/24/2022 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald M Craven