This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:34 (UTC).

Wally West v. Ryan Castleman, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Wally West filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Ryan Castleman. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2346

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

WALLY L. WEST

Sheridan, IL 60551-0000

Defendant / Appellees

CRAIG VIEIRA, Police Officer, Marion County Sheriffs Department

RYAN CASTLEMAN, Detective, Police Officer, Marion County Sheriffs Department

KEVIN CRIPPS, Sergeant, Police Officer with Marion County Sheriffs Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Wally L. West

Attorney at SHERIDAN CORRECTIONAL CENTER

4017 E. 2603 Road

Sheridan, IL 60551-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Daniel T. Corbett

Attorney at O'HALLORAN, KOSOFF, GEITNER & COOK, LLC

650 Dundee Road

Northbrook, IL 60062-0000

 

Court Documents

3 #2

PLRA Fee Notice AC

1 #3

Notice to District Court

3 #1

PLRA D.C. Denial of IFP

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Rights Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Prose motion filed by Appellant Wally L. West to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [5] [7025006] [19-2346] (AP) [Entered: 08/21/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed Appellant Wally L. West Memorandum In Support of PLRA Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. [4] [7025004] [19-2346] (AP) [Entered: 08/21/2019 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed District Court order DENYING Appellant Wally L. West leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP denied: 07/31/2019. [3] [7020970] PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 09/03/2019. [19-2346] (DSL) [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • (#2) Filed notice from the District Court that a motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending. [2] [7019927] [19-2346] (DSL) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Transcript information sheet due by 07/30/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Wally L. West by 07/23/2019. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 08/15/2019. [1] [7017648] [19-2346] (AD) [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.