This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/07/2022 at 06:13:27 (UTC).

In re: Walker County, TX v. OptumRx, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 In re Walker County, TX filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against OptumRx, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-3491

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

In re: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION

Plaintiff / Appellant

WALKER COUNTY, TX

Defendant / Appellees

OPTUMRX, INC.

OPTUMRX ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC

UNITED HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS, INC.

EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC.

EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY

UNITEDHEALTH GROUP, INC.

OPTUM, INC.

PERRIGO COMPANY, PLC

PADDOCK LABORATORIES, INC.

ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.

PURDUE PHARMA, INC.

PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY

ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC., nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., nka Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

51 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Sherri Ann Saucer

Attorney at Fears Nachawati

5489 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Mark A. Correro

Attorney at Law Offices

2900 North Loop West, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77092

John Raggio

Attorney at Fears Nachawati

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kimberly Chemerinsky

Attorney at Alston & Bird

333 S. Hope Street, 16Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Douglas Stuart Griffith

Attorney at Yetter Coleman

811 Main Street, Suite 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Raffi Melkonian

Attorney at Wright Close

One Riverway, Suite 2200

Houston, TX 77056

Hannah De Marco Sibiski

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer

700 Louisiana Street, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002-2755

Noelle M. Reed

Attorney at Skadden Arps

1000 Louisiana, Suite 6800

Houston, TX 77002

Stephen E. McConnico

Attorney at Scott, Douglass & Monnico

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

Other Attorneys

Bruce Davidson Oakley

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

609 Main Street, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Corey S. Reed

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons

1 Riverway, Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77056

Alper T. Ertas

101 California Street, Suite 3800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Maria Wyckoff Boyce

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

609 Main Street, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Brian M. Ercole

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius

600 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1600

Miami, FL 33131

Jeffrey Roger Parsons

Attorney at Parsons McEntire McCleary

One Riverway, Suite 1800

Houston, TX 77056

Brandon Egan Caire

711 Louisiana Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002

Heather Coghlan Barger

Attorney at Alston & Bird

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2300

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael W. Mengis

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Houston

811 Main Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77022

Kristen W. Kelly

Attorney at Gray Reed & McGraw

1300 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Timothy E. Hudson

Attorney at Thompson & Knight

1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Walker County, TX. Transcript needed: n. (AEG) [Entered: 05/26/2022 06:15 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Walker County, TX by Sherri Ann Saucer. Certificate of Service: 05/27/2022. [22-3491] (SAS) [Entered: 05/27/2022 02:46 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Neos Therapeutics, Inc. by C. Scott Jones. Certificate of Service: 06/09/2022. [22-3491] (SJ) [Entered: 06/09/2022 01:52 PM]

#6

(#6) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Sherri Ann Saucer for Appellant Walker County, TX.. Certificate of Service: 06/09/2022. [22-3491] (SAS) [Entered: 06/09/2022 05:12 PM]

7 #1

Cover Letter

7 #2

show cause order filed

8 #1

Response to Show Cause Order

8 #2

Appendix

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Plaintiff's Executive Committee by Peter H. Weinberger. Certificate of Service: 07/13/2022. [22-3491] (PHW) [Entered: 07/13/2022 11:09 AM]

10 #1

reply/response of Real Party in Interest Plaintiffs' Executive Committee to Show

10 #2

Additional Document

11 #1

showcause response

11 #2

Additional Document

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE filed to the show cause for jurisdiction - non-appealable order, [ # 7 ]. Response filed by Attorney Mr. Peter H. Weinberger for Appellee Plaintiff's Executive Committee. [22-3491] (PHW) [Entered: 07/13/2022 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) *LOCKED* REPLY filed by Mr. Peter H. Weinberger for Plaintiff's Executive Committee regarding Response of Real Party in Interest Plaintiffs' Executive Committee to Show Cause Order on Dismissal for Lack of Jurisdiction Certificate of Service: 07/13/2022. [22-3491] ***COUNSEL: Incorrect event selected. Please re-file as a showcause response.*** --[Edited 07/13/2022 by AEG] (PHW) [Entered: 07/13/2022 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Plaintiff's Executive Committee by Peter H. Weinberger. Certificate of Service: 07/13/2022. [22-3491] (PHW) [Entered: 07/13/2022 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE filed to the show cause for jurisdiction - non-appealable order, [ # 7 ]. Response filed by Attorney Ms. Sherri Ann Saucer for Appellant Walker County, TX. Certificate of Service: 07/06/2022. [22-3491] (SAS) [Entered: 07/06/2022 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SHOW CAUSE order: It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE, within twenty-one (21) days of the file date of this order, why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Following receipt of a response from Plaintiff or expiration of the 21-day response period, whichever occurs first, Defendants, if they so choose, shall have ten (10) days in which to file a reply. Thereafter, the issue of appellate jurisdiction will be referred to the court for disposition.. Response due by 07/06/2022 for Sherri Ann Saucer. (AEG) [Entered: 06/15/2022 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Sherri Ann Saucer for Appellant Walker County, TX.. Certificate of Service: 06/09/2022. [22-3491] (SAS) [Entered: 06/09/2022 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Neos Therapeutics, Inc. by C. Scott Jones. Certificate of Service: 06/09/2022. [22-3491] (SJ) [Entered: 06/09/2022 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Walker County, TX by Sherri Ann Saucer. Certificate of Service: 05/27/2022. [22-3491] (SAS) [Entered: 05/27/2022 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • Docket(#3) Update fee status change to paid. (AEG) [Entered: 05/26/2022 06:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Amy Gigliotti (513) 564-7012 (AEG) [Entered: 05/26/2022 06:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Walker County, TX. Transcript needed: n. (AEG) [Entered: 05/26/2022 06:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Walker County Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Paddock Laboratories Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where OPTUMRX, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant