Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2021 at 06:45:34 (UTC).

Waldo, et al v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust, et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Waldo filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Bank of New York Mellon Trust. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-4050

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellants and Debtors

CHARLES C. WALDO

West Jordan, UT 84084-1711

ETHANNE S. WALDO

West Jordan, UT 84084-1711

In re: CHARLES C. WALDO

West Jordan, UT 84084-1711

Appellees

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY

OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Debtor Attorneys

Charles C. Waldo

6807 South 3420 West

West Jordan, UT 84084-1711

Ethanne S. Waldo

6807 South 3420 West

West Jordan, UT 84084-1711

Appellee Attorneys

Mark Middlemas

Attorney at Lundberg & Associates

3269 South Main Street, Suite 100

Salt Lake City, UT 84115

Emilie K. Edling

Attorney at Houser & Allison

9600 S.W. Oak Street, Suite 570

Portland, OR 97223

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10833064] Appellants opening brief filed by Charles C. Waldo and Ethanne S. Waldo. Original and 4 copies. Served on 05/24/2021 by US mail. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. Appellees' brief due 06/28/2021 for Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC [21-4050] [Entered: 05/27/2021 01:33 PM]

Open Document

[10827660] Entry of appearance filed by Emilie K Edling for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/04/2021. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [21-4050] [Entered: 05/05/2021 02:13 PM]

Open Document

[10827344] Second Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance now due on 05/07/2021 for Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. [21-4050] [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:03 PM]

Open Document

[10825936] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance now due on 05/03/2021 for Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. [21-4050] [Entered: 04/28/2021 01:05 PM]

Open Document

[10825516] Entry of appearance filed by Ethanne S. Waldo. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/21/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-4050] [Entered: 04/27/2021 11:11 AM]

Open Document #2

Interested Party

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

[10823611] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume I - Pleadings. [21-4050] [Entered: 04/20/2021 08:13 AM]

Open Document

[10823447] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 05/10/2021. Appellants' brief due on 06/01/2021 for Charles C. Waldo and Ethanne S. Waldo [21-4050] [Entered: 04/19/2021 01:29 PM]

Open Document #3

General Docketing Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #2

Transmittal letter

Open Document #1

Preliminary Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10833064] Appellants opening brief filed by Charles C. Waldo and Ethanne S. Waldo. Original and 4 copies. Served on 05/24/2021 by US mail. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. Appellees' brief due 06/28/2021 for Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC [21-4050] [Entered: 05/27/2021 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10827660] Entry of appearance filed by Emilie K Edling for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/04/2021. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [21-4050] [Entered: 05/05/2021 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docket[10827432] Entry of appearance submitted by Emilie K. Edling for Appellees Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/04/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-4050]--[Edited 05/05/2021 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 5/5/21.] EKE [Entered: 05/04/2021 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10827344] Second Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance now due on 05/07/2021 for Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. [21-4050] [Entered: 05/04/2021 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10825936] Deficiency notice issued. Notice of appearance now due on 05/03/2021 for Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. [21-4050] [Entered: 04/28/2021 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10825516] Entry of appearance filed by Ethanne S. Waldo. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/21/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-4050] [Entered: 04/27/2021 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10825246] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Charles C. Waldo. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/21/2021. Manner of Service: US mail. [21-4050] --[Edited 04/28/2021 by SLS to add certificate of interested party.] [Entered: 04/26/2021 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10823611] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume I - Pleadings. [21-4050] [Entered: 04/20/2021 08:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10823447] Jurisdictional review complete. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 05/10/2021. Appellants' brief due on 06/01/2021 for Charles C. Waldo and Ethanne S. Waldo [21-4050] [Entered: 04/19/2021 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10821905] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 04/13/2021. Notice of appearance due on 04/27/2021 for Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, and Notice of appearance due on 05/13/2021 for Charles C. Waldo and Ethanne S. Waldo [21-4050] [Entered: 04/13/2021 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant