This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/19/2022 at 06:06:44 (UTC).

W. v. Paley

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 W filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Paley. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-20671

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

J. W.

Lori Washington, as next friend J. W.

Defendant / Appellees

Elvin Paley

Katy Independent School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Martin J. Cirkiel

Attorney at Cirkiel & Associates, P.C.

1901 E. Palm Valley Boulevard

Round Rock, TX 78664-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Christopher Blewer Gilbert

Attorney at Thompson & Horton, L.L.P.

3200 Southwest Freewayphoenix Tower

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants J. W. and Ms. Lori Washington [21-20671] (CAG) [Entered: 12/21/2021 08:28 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9745244-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-20671] (CCR) [Entered: 12/30/2021 01:18 PM]

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 02/14/2022 for Appellants J. W. and Lori Washington. [21-20671] (CMB) [Entered: 01/04/2022 12:05 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Christopher Blewer Gilbert for Mr. Elvin Paley for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20671] (Christopher Blewer Gilbert ) [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:39 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants NFN J. W. and Ms. Lori Washington advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [21-20671] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants NFN J. W. and Ms. Lori Washington advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 01/06/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Cirkiel; Attorney for Appellee: Gilbert [21-20671] (Martin J. Cirkiel ) [Entered: 01/06/2022 08:37 AM]

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants NFN J. W. and Ms. Lori Washington to extend time to file brief as appellant until 03/30/2022 [9772130-2]. Date of service: 02/08/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Cirkiel; Attorney for Appellee: Gilbert [21-20671] (Martin J. Cirkiel ) [Entered: 02/08/2022 12:41 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting in part Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellants NFN J. W. and Ms. Lori Washington [ # 9772130-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 03/16/2022 for Appellants J. W. and Lori Washington [21-20671] (CCR) [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:44 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting in part Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellants NFN J. W. and Ms. Lori Washington [ # 9772130-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 03/16/2022 for Appellants J. W. and Lori Washington [21-20671] (CCR) [Entered: 02/09/2022 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants NFN J. W. and Ms. Lori Washington to extend time to file brief as appellant until 03/30/2022 [9772130-2]. Date of service: 02/08/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Cirkiel; Attorney for Appellee: Gilbert [21-20671] (Martin J. Cirkiel ) [Entered: 02/08/2022 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Christopher Blewer Gilbert for Appellee Katy Independent School District in 21-20671, Attorney Christopher Blewer Gilbert for Appellee Elvin Paley in 21-20671 [21-20671] (CCR) [Entered: 01/06/2022 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants NFN J. W. and Ms. Lori Washington advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [21-20671] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants NFN J. W. and Ms. Lori Washington advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 01/06/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Cirkiel; Attorney for Appellee: Gilbert [21-20671] (Martin J. Cirkiel ) [Entered: 01/06/2022 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Appellee Katy Independent School District added to case. Reason: counsel advised KISD is an appelee on appeal. [21-20671] (CCR) [Entered: 01/05/2022 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Christopher Blewer Gilbert for Mr. Elvin Paley for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20671] (Christopher Blewer Gilbert ) [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 02/14/2022 for Appellants J. W. and Lori Washington. [21-20671] (CMB) [Entered: 01/04/2022 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-20671] (CMB) [Entered: 01/04/2022 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:18-CV-1848. Electronic ROA due on 01/14/2022. [21-20671] (CCR) [Entered: 12/30/2021 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9745244-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-20671] (CCR) [Entered: 12/30/2021 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants J. W. and Ms. Lori Washington [21-20671] (CAG) [Entered: 12/21/2021 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher B Gilbert