This case was last updated from PACER on 08/20/2021 at 06:10:42 (UTC).

Voyageur Outward Bound School, et al v. USA, et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 Voyageur Outward Bound School filed an Other lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-5138

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Voyageur Outward Bound School

Wenonah Canoe, Inc.

Sawbill Canoe Outfitters, Inc.

Piragis Northwoods Company, Inc.

River Point Resort and Outfitting Company

Northeastern Minnesotans for Wilderness

Hungry Jack Outfitters

Women's Wilderness Discovery

Northstar Canoe

Ely Outfitting Company & Boundary Waters Guide Service

Defendant / Appellees

Bureau of Land Management

Debra A. Haaland, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Interior

United States of America

United States Department of the Interior

Daniel H. Jorjani, in his official capacity as the Principal Deputy Solicitor for the U.S. Department of the Interior, 18cv1499

Joseph Balash, in his official capacity as Assistant Secretary for Lands and Minerals Management for the U.S. Department of the Interior, 18cv1496

Brian Steed, in his official capacity as the official exercising the authority of the Director of the Bureau of Land Management

Plaintiff / Appellees

Center for Biological Diversity, 18cv1496

Izaak Walton League of America, 18cv1496

Wilderness Society, 18cv1496

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

James Sigel

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Joseph R. Palmore

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20037

Joseph Alex Ward

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20037

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Rachel Heron

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7415

Amelia G. Yowell

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7415

Rebecca Jaffe

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 7611, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7611

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Erin Whalen

Attorney at Earthjustice

325 Fourth Street

Juneau, AK 99801

Eric Paul Jorgensen Esquire

Attorney at Earthjustice

325 Fourth Street

Juneau, AK 99801

Other Attorneys

Stephen Safranski

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Amy Catharine Lishinski Esquire

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1420

Daniel Stephen Volchok

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1420

Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1420

Eric J. Magnuson

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Ari Bernard Lukoff

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE [1909228] to withdraw attorney Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson who represented Franconia Minerals (US) LLC and Twin Metals Minnesota LLC in 20-5097, Franconia Minerals (US) LLC and Twin Metals Minnesota LLC in 20-5098, Franconia Minerals (US) LLC and Twin Metals Minnesota LLC in 20-5099, Franconia Minerals (US) LLC and Twin Metals Minnesota LLC in 21-5137, Franconia Minerals (US) LLC and Twin Metals Minnesota LLC in 21-5138 and Franconia Minerals (US) LLC and Twin Metals Minnesota LLC in 21-5139 filed by Franconia Minerals (US) LLC and Twin Metals Minnesota LLC in 20-5097, 20-5098, 20-5099, 21-5137, 21-5138, 21-5139 [Service Date: 08/06/2021 ] [20-5097, 20-5098, 20-5099, 21-5137, 21-5138, 21-5139] (Wolfson, Paul) [Entered: 08/06/2021 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPER CURIAM ORDER [1905522] filed that the following briefing schedule and format apply in these consolidated cases: Replacement Joint Brief for Appellants (not to exceed 15,000 words) due 09/07/2021. Brief for Federal Appellees (not to exceed 15,000 words) due 11/08/2021. Brief for Intervenor-Defendants-Appellees (not to exceed 10,500 words) due 11/08/2021. Joint Reply Brief for Appellants (not to exceed 8,500 words) due 12/08/2021. Before Judges: Rogers, Millett and Katsas. [20-5097, 20-5098, 20-5099, 21-5137, 21-5138, 21-5139] [Entered: 07/08/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE [1904654] to withdraw attorney Ari Bernard Lukoff who represented Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness in 20-5097, Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness in 20-5098, Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness in 20-5099, Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness in 21-5137, Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness in 21-5138 and Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness in 21-5139 filed by Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness in 20-5097, 20-5098, 20-5099, 21-5137, 21-5138, 21-5139 [Service Date: 07/01/2021 ] [20-5097, 20-5098, 20-5099, 21-5137, 21-5138, 21-5139] (Lukoff, Ari) [Entered: 07/01/2021 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1904440] filed considering motion to remove case from abeyance [ # 1902323-2 ]; considering motion to consolidate [ # 1903178-2 ], removing case from abeyance, consolidating cases 21-5137, 21-5138, 21-5139 with 20-5097. FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed briefing schedule and format be referred to a panel of the court for disposition. [20-5097, 20-5098, 20-5099, 21-5137, 21-5138, 21-5139] [Entered: 06/30/2021 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION [1903178] to consolidate cases and proposed briefing format filed by Ely Outfitting Company & Boundary Waters Guide Service, Hungry Jack Outfitters, Northeastern Minnesotans for Wilderness, Northstar Canoe, Piragis Northwoods Company, Inc., River Point Resort and Outfitting Company, Sawbill Canoe Outfitters, Inc., Voyageur Outward Bound School, Wenonah Canoe, Inc. and Women's Wilderness Discovery in 20-5097, Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness in 20-5098, Center for Biological Diversity, Izaak Walton League of America and Wilderness Society in 20-5099 [Service Date: 06/21/2021 ] Length Certification: 875 words. [20-5097, 20-5098, 20-5099, 21-5137, 21-5138, 21-5139]--[Edited 06/29/2021 by TAM] (Sigel, James) [Entered: 06/21/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1903083] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-01463-TNM filed by Ely Outfitting Company & Boundary Waters Guide Service, Hungry Jack Outfitters, Northeastern Minnesotans for Wilderness, Northstar Canoe, Piragis Northwoods Company, Inc., River Point Resort and Outfitting Company, Sawbill Canoe Outfitters, Inc., Voyageur Outward Bound School, Wenonah Canoe, Inc. and Women's Wilderness Discovery. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 21-5138. [21-5138] [Entered: 06/21/2021 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [21-5138] [Entered: 06/21/2021 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wenonah Canoe, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Izaak Walton League of America, 18cv1496 is a litigant