This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/19/2020 at 05:14:34 (UTC).

VotelIn re: Votel

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 VotelIn re Votel was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2274

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellants

In re: THOMAS VOTEL

ANDREW OLSON

DOMINIQUE ARIS

Appellee

ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Randall Thomas Skaar

Attorney at Skaar Ulbrich Macari, P.A.

601 Carlson Parkway

Minnetonka, MN 55305

Appellee Attorney

Thomas W. Krause

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/14/2020. [722078] Entry of Appearance is due on 09/30/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/30/2020. Docketing Statement is due on 10/16/2020. Certified List due on 10/26/2020. [KMH] [Entered: 09/16/2020 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. Krause