This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/10/2021 at 06:10:04 (UTC).

Vocalife LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 Vocalife LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Amazon com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1937

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Cross Appellant

VOCALIFE LLC

Defendant / Appellants

AMAZON.COM LLC

AMAZON.COM, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Cross Appellant Attorneys

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Attorney at Fabricant LLP

411 Theodore Fremd Road

Rye, NY 10580

Enrique William Iturralde

Attorney at Fabricant LLP

411 Theodore Fremd Road

Rye, NY 10580

Peter Lambrianakos

Attorney at Fabricant LLP

411 Theodore Fremd Road

Rye, NY 10580

Vincent J. Rubino III

Attorney at Fabricant LLP

411 Theodore Fremd Road

Rye, NY 10580

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jennifer H. Doan

6500 N Summerhill Road

Texarkana, TX 75503

Joseph R. Re

Attorney at Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, LLP

2040 Main Street14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Colin B. Heideman

Attorney at Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, LLP

925 Fourth Avenue

Seattle, WA 98104

Alan Grayson Laquer

Attorney at Knobbe, Martens, Olson & Bear, LLP

2040 Main Street14Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Corrected Certificate of Interest for. Service: 07/01/2021 by email. [783893] [21-1937] [Colin Heideman] [Entered: 07/01/2021 05:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellants Amazon.com LLC and Amazon.com, Inc., Certificate of Interest [ # 16 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document is due on 07/09/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [783665] [EKD] [Entered: 07/01/2021 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 17 ] filed by Appellants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com LLC. The opening brief is due 07/26/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [783664] [EKD] [Entered: 07/01/2021 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION of Appellants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com LLC to extend the time to 07/26/2021 to file brief. Service: 06/30/2021 by email. [783633] [21-1937] [Colin Heideman] [Entered: 06/30/2021 09:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Amended Certificate of Interest for Appellants Amazon.com LLC and Amazon.com, Inc.. Service: 06/30/2021 by email. [783631] [21-1937] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 19 ] [Colin Heideman] [Entered: 06/30/2021 09:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Amended Entry of appearance for Alfred R. Fabricant; Peter Lambrianakos; Vincent J. Rubino, III; Enrique W. Iturralde as counsel for Cross-Appellant Vocalife LLC. Service: 06/15/2021 by email. [780445] [21-1937] [Alfred Fabricant] [Entered: 06/15/2021 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Amended Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellant Vocalife LLC. Service: 06/15/2021 by email. [780444] [21-1937] [Alfred Fabricant] [Entered: 06/15/2021 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Amended Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellant Vocalife LLC. Service: 06/15/2021 by email. [780443] [21-1937] [Alfred Fabricant] [Entered: 06/15/2021 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docket(#12) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-1937 Lead with 21-1984 Cross-Appeal. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [780169] [21-1937, 21-1984] [EKD] [Entered: 06/14/2021 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER consolidating appeals 21-1937 and 21-1984. The opening brief of appellants is due no later than July 12, 2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [780167] [21-1937, 21-1984] [EKD] [Entered: 06/14/2021 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Appellee Vocalife LLC. Service: 06/03/2021 by email. [778342] [21-1937] [Alfred Fabricant] [Entered: 06/03/2021 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corrected Entry of appearance for Alfred R. Fabricant; Peter Lambrianakos; Vincent J. Rubino, III; Enrique W. Iturralde as counsel for Appellee Vocalife LLC. Service: 06/03/2021 by email. [778339] [21-1937] [Alfred Fabricant] [Entered: 06/03/2021 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellee Vocalife LLC, Entry of Appearance and Certificate of Interest [ # 2 ], [ # 4 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents are due on 06/03/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [777237] [EKD] [Entered: 05/26/2021 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement for the Appellants Amazon.com LLC and Amazon.com, Inc.. Service: 05/25/2021 by email. [777100] [21-1937] [Colin Heideman] [Entered: 05/25/2021 06:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interest for Appellants Amazon.com LLC and Amazon.com, Inc.. Service: 05/25/2021 by email. [777099] [21-1937] [Colin Heideman] [Entered: 05/25/2021 06:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Joseph R. Re; Colin B. Heideman; Alan G. Laquer as counsel for Appellants Amazon.com LLC and Amazon.com, Inc.. Service: 05/25/2021 by email. [777097] [21-1937] [Colin Heideman] [Entered: 05/25/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Vocalife LLC. Service: 05/24/2021 by email. [776679] [21-1937] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 8 ] [Alfred Fabricant] [Entered: 05/24/2021 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docketing Statement for the Appellee Vocalife LLC. Service: 05/24/2021 by email. [776678] [21-1937] [Alfred Fabricant] [Entered: 05/24/2021 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Entry of appearance for Alfred R. Fabricant; Peter Lambrianakos; Vincent J. Rubino, III; Enrique W. Iturralde as counsel for Appellee Vocalife LLC. Service: 05/24/2021 by email. [776676] [21-1937] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 8 ] [Alfred Fabricant] [Entered: 05/24/2021 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 05/07/2021. [774265] Entry of Appearance is due on 05/25/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/25/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 05/25/2021. Appellants' brief is due on 07/12/2021. [EKD] [Entered: 05/11/2021 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vocalife LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan G. Laquer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin Barry Heideman