This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2020 at 05:38:31 (UTC).

Vladimir Bykov v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Vladimir Bykov filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against William Barr, U S Atty Gen. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-60002

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VLADIMIR BYKOV, also known as Vladimir N. Bykov

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Bruce A. Coane Esq.

Attorney at Coane & Associates, P.L.L.C.

5177 Richmond Avenue

Houston, TX 77056

Respondent Attorney

Office of Immigration Litigation

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #1

Petition for Review

Open Restricted Document #2

DKT-4 Letter (IMG)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9222033-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-60002] (SEP) [Entered: 01/03/2020 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Mr. Vladimir Bykov. Date received in 5th Circuit: 12/30/2019. Immigration File Number: A076 187 206. Administrative Record due on 02/11/2020. [20-60002] (SEP) [Entered: 01/02/2020 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.