This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/21/2022 at 06:13:28 (UTC).

Vivian Saroki-Keller v. University of Michigan, et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Vivian Saroki-Keller filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against University of Michigan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1754

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

VIVIAN J. SAROKI-KELLER

Defendant / Appellee

UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Andrew G. Peterson

Attorney at Law Office

5700 Crooks Road, Suite 200

Troy, MI 48098

R. Ian Hunter

Attorney at Law Office

5700 Crooks Road, Suite 200

Troy, MI 48098

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

David John Masson

Attorney at University of Michigan

503 Thompson Street, Suite 4010 Fleming Building

Ann Arbor, MI 48109

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Vivian J. Saroki-Keller. Transcript needed: y. (SSS) [Entered: 11/22/2021 03:12 PM]

#3

(#3) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 12/15/2021 at 9:30 am EASTERN TIME with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:33 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 12/17/2021 at 10:00 am EASTERN TIME with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:30 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee University of Michigan by David J. Masson. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2021. [21-1754] (DJM) [Entered: 12/06/2021 11:43 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Vivian J. Saroki-Keller by Andrew G. Peterson. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2021. [21-1754] (AGP) [Entered: 12/06/2021 04:12 PM]

#8

(#8) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 01/18/2022; appellee brief due 02/17/2022. (SSS) [Entered: 12/06/2021 04:27 PM]

#9

(#9) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew G. Peterson for Appellant Vivian J. Saroki-Keller.. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2021. [21-1754] (AGP) [Entered: 12/06/2021 04:35 PM]

#10

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) MOTION filed by Mr. Andrew G. Peterson for Vivian J. Saroki-Keller to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 01/11/2022. [21-1754] (AGP) [Entered: 01/11/2022 01:08 PM]

#12

(#12) MEDIATOR LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 11 ] filed by Mr. Andrew G. Peterson, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 02/01/2022. appellee brief now due 03/03/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 01/11/2022 02:51 PM]

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Vivian J. Saroki-Keller by R. Ian Hunter. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2022. [21-1754] (RIH) [Entered: 01/14/2022 02:14 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Vivian J. Saroki-Keller by R. Ian Hunter. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2022. [21-1754] (RIH) [Entered: 01/14/2022 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEDIATOR LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 11 ] filed by Mr. Andrew G. Peterson, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 02/01/2022. appellee brief now due 03/03/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 01/11/2022 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION filed by Mr. Andrew G. Peterson for Vivian J. Saroki-Keller to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 01/11/2022. [21-1754] (AGP) [Entered: 01/11/2022 01:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LOCKED - STATUS REPORT filed by Mr. David John Masson for University of Michigan. [PLEASE FILE THIS DOCUMENT DIRECTLY WITH THE MEDIATION OFFICE] Certificate of Service: 12/10/2021. [21-1754]--[Edited 12/10/2021 by CAW] (DJM) [Entered: 12/10/2021 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew G. Peterson for Appellant Vivian J. Saroki-Keller.. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2021. [21-1754] (AGP) [Entered: 12/06/2021 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 01/18/2022; appellee brief due 02/17/2022. (SSS) [Entered: 12/06/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docket(#7) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Andrew G. Peterson for Vivian J. Saroki-Keller. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2021. [21-1754] (AGP) [Entered: 12/06/2021 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Vivian J. Saroki-Keller by Andrew G. Peterson. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2021. [21-1754] (AGP) [Entered: 12/06/2021 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee University of Michigan by David J. Masson. Certificate of Service: 12/06/2021. [21-1754] (DJM) [Entered: 12/06/2021 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 12/17/2021 at 10:00 am EASTERN TIME with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 11/23/2021 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEDIATION OFFICE is involved in this appeal. MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Mediation conference has been scheduled for 12/15/2021 at 9:30 am EASTERN TIME with John A. Minter. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Sharday Swain (SSS) [Entered: 11/22/2021 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Vivian J. Saroki-Keller. Transcript needed: y. (SSS) [Entered: 11/22/2021 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The University of Michigan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David J. Masson