This case was last updated from PACER on 04/08/2019 at 06:04:38 (UTC).

Vivek Shah v. Marcus Holmes

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 Vivek Shah filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against Marcus Holmes. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1237

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

VIVEK SHAH

Schaumburg, IL 60173

Respondent / Appellee

MARCUS HOLMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Vivek Shah

236 Woburn Lane

Schaumburg, IL 60173

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Debra Riggs Bonamici

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

219 S. Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604-0000

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Vivek Shah to become an electronic filer. [3] [6984984] [19-1237] (PS) [Entered: 02/15/2019 03:25 PM]

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#7

(#7) On March 18, 2019, this court received a document from Vivek Shah titled, "Opening Brief of Appellant." Shah seeks to challenge the district court's order dismissing his petition for writ of habeas corpus as an unauthorized second and successive petition filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. This appeal will proceed to a determination of whether a certificate of appealability should issue, and this court will review Shah's brief as part of that determination. SCR [7] [6992017] [19-1237] (AG) [Entered: 03/20/2019 10:58 AM]

#1

2255/Appealability Denied Case

#2

(#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Vivek Shah. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [6984982] [19-1237] (PS) [Entered: 02/15/2019 03:24 PM]

#4

(#4) ORDER re: Motion for leave to file documents electronically. [ # 3 ] The motion to become an electronic filer is GRANTED. Vivek Shah is granted permission to electronically file documents in this appeal. This court's Electronic Case Filing Procedures, the Electronic Case Filing User Manual, and answers to frequently asked questions regarding Electronic Case Filing are available at the Seventh Circuit's website: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov. The court will terminate Shah's filing user status upon the termination of the case, termination of his pro se status, or for any abuse of filing privileges. RFG [4] [6985172] [19-1237] (PS) [Entered: 02/19/2019 09:27 AM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#6

(#6) Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Vivek Shah. Electronically Transmitted. [6] [6991964] [19-1237] (CM) [Entered: 03/20/2019 09:58 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) On March 18, 2019, this court received a document from Vivek Shah titled, "Opening Brief of Appellant." Shah seeks to challenge the district court's order dismissing his petition for writ of habeas corpus as an unauthorized second and successive petition filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. This appeal will proceed to a determination of whether a certificate of appealability should issue, and this court will review Shah's brief as part of that determination. SCR [7] [6992017] [19-1237] (AG) [Entered: 03/20/2019 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Vivek Shah. Electronically Transmitted. [6] [6991964] [19-1237] (CM) [Entered: 03/20/2019 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Submitted appellant brief by Vivek Shah for Appellant Vivek Shah. [5] NOTE: Access to this entry is limited to counsel of record. Once the document is approved by the court, it will be filed onto the court's docket as a separate entry which will be open to the public. [6991502] [19-1237] (Shah, Vivek) [Entered: 03/18/2019 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER re: Motion for leave to file documents electronically. [ # 3 ] The motion to become an electronic filer is GRANTED. Vivek Shah is granted permission to electronically file documents in this appeal. This court's Electronic Case Filing Procedures, the Electronic Case Filing User Manual, and answers to frequently asked questions regarding Electronic Case Filing are available at the Seventh Circuit's website: http://www.ca7.uscourts.gov. The court will terminate Shah's filing user status upon the termination of the case, termination of his pro se status, or for any abuse of filing privileges. RFG [4] [6985172] [19-1237] (PS) [Entered: 02/19/2019 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Vivek Shah to become an electronic filer. [3] [6984984] [19-1237] (PS) [Entered: 02/15/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Vivek Shah. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [2] [6984982] [19-1237] (PS) [Entered: 02/15/2019 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Federal prisoner's 2255 case docketed. Certificate of Appealability denied 01/08/2019. IFP. Transcript information sheet due by 02/21/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Vivek Shah by 02/14/2019. [1] [6982947] [19-1237]-[Edited 02/08/2019 by VG - updated forms to reflect correct noa date] (VG) [Entered: 02/07/2019 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.