This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/23/2021 at 06:03:34 (UTC).

Vista Health Plan v. HHS

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 Vista Health Plan filed an Other lawsuit against HHS. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-50963

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services

Seema Verma, Administrator of the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services

United States Department of Health and Human Services

Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services

Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services

Plaintiff / Appellants

Vista Service Corporation

Vista Health Plan, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

James Ryan Powers

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

1100 L Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Jeffrey Eric Sandberg

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jennifer Scott Riggs

Attorney at Riggs & Ray

506 W. 14Th Street

Austin, TX 78701-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jeffrey Eric Sandberg for party(s) Appellee Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services Appellee Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services Appellee HHS Appellee Seema Verma, in case 20-50963 [20-50963] (MVM) [Entered: 12/21/2020 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50963] (Jeffrey Eric Sandberg ) [Entered: 12/20/2020 12:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jennifer Scott Riggs for Appellant Vista Service Corporation in 20-50963, Attorney Jennifer Scott Riggs for Appellant Vista Health Plan, Incorporated in 20-50963 [20-50963] (AGL) [Entered: 12/18/2020 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Jennifer Scott Riggs for Vista Health Plan, Incorporated and Vista Service Corporation for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50963] (Jennifer Scott Riggs ) [Entered: 12/17/2020 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/25/2021 for Appellants Vista Health Plan, Incorporated and Vista Service Corporation. [20-50963] (DDL) [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-50963] (DDL) [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 1:18-CV-824. Electronic ROA due on 12/17/2020. [20-50963] (CNF) [Entered: 12/02/2020 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9453872-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-50963] (CNF) [Entered: 12/02/2020 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Vista Health Plan, Incorporated and Vista Service Corporation [20-50963] (CBW) [Entered: 11/24/2020 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VISTA SERV is a litigant

Latest cases where Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Vista Healthplan, Inc., on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated is a litigant

Latest cases where SEEMA VERMA, Administrator for the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services is a litigant