This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/12/2022 at 05:35:38 (UTC).

Virgil Mitchell v. State of Alabama Department of Human Resources, et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 Virgil Mitchell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of Alabama Department of Human Resources. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10390

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

VIRGIL MITCHELL

Fairhope, AL 36532

Defendant / Appellees

STATE OF ALABAMA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN RESOURCES

SHARON HOLLIES

CARMEN BOSCH

SHERIFF

WILLIE WALKER

TALI GRAVES

SUSAN WHITE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Virgil Mitchell

407 Young St

Fairhope, AL 36532

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jennifer M. Bush

Attorney at State of Alabama Department of Human Resources

50 N Ripley St Rm 2122

Montgomery, AL 36130-1001

Steven Marshall

Attorney at Alabama Attorney General's Office

501 Washington Ave, Po Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130

Haley Lyckman

Attorney at Webb McNeill Walker, PC

1 Commerce St Ste 700

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

USDC Order DE 55

Open Document #4

USDC Report & Recommendation DE 45

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Virgil Mitchell on 02/04/2022. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/22/2022 as to Appellant Virgil Mitchell. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/08/2022 as to Appellees. [Entered: 02/08/2022 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sheriffs Office Jefferson Davis Parish is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer M. Bush

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Marshall