This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2019 at 06:10:08 (UTC).

Vipula Valambhia, et al v. United Republic of Tanzania, et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 Vipula Valambhia filed an Other lawsuit against United Republic of Tanzania. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7040

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

Priscilla D. Valambhia

Punita D. Valambhia

Krishnakant D. Valambhia

Bhavna D. Valambhia

Vipula D. Valambhia

Defendant / Appellees

Bank of Tanzania

Ministry of Defence and National Service

United Republic of Tanzania

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Meredith Parenti

Attorney at Parenti Law PLLC

Po Box 19152

Houston, TX 77224

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Lawrence Hedrick Martin

Attorney at Foley Hoag LLP

1717 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036-5342

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791177] filed by Bank of Tanzania, Ministry of Defence and National Service and United Republic of Tanzania [Service Date: 06/05/2019 ] [19-7040] (Martin, Lawrence) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:21 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791176] filed by Lawrence H. Martin on behalf of Appellees Bank of Tanzania, Ministry of Defence and National Service and United Republic of Tanzania. [19-7040] (Martin, Lawrence) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:19 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1790784] filed by Bhavna D. Valambhia, Krishnakant D. Valambhia, Priscilla D. Valambhia, Punita D. Valambhia and Vipula D. Valambhia [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-7040] (Parenti, Meredith) [Entered: 06/03/2019 07:02 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1790783] filed by Bhavna D. Valambhia, Krishnakant D. Valambhia, Priscilla D. Valambhia, Punita D. Valambhia and Vipula D. Valambhia [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ] [19-7040] (Parenti, Meredith) [Entered: 06/03/2019 07:01 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1790769] filed by Bhavna D. Valambhia, Krishnakant D. Valambhia, Priscilla D. Valambhia, Punita D. Valambhia and Vipula D. Valambhia [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ] [19-7040] (Parenti, Meredith) [Entered: 06/03/2019 04:53 PM]

Open Document #2

Underlying Decision in Case Filed

Open Document #1

Underlying Decision in Case Filed

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1790539] filed by Bhavna D. Valambhia, Krishnakant D. Valambhia, Priscilla D. Valambhia, Vipula D. Valambhia and Punita D. Valambhia [Service Date: 06/02/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-7040] (Parenti, Meredith) [Entered: 06/02/2019 06:37 PM]

Open Document #2

Preliminary Statement of Issues on Appeal

Open Document #1

Docketing Statement Filed

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1790537] filed by Meredith Parenti on behalf of Appellants Bhavna D. Valambhia, Krishnakant D. Valambhia, Priscilla D. Valambhia, Punita D. Valambhia and Vipula D. Valambhia. [19-7040] (Parenti, Meredith) [Entered: 06/02/2019 06:26 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1786443] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/21/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/06/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/06/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/06/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/21/2019 [19-7040] [Entered: 05/07/2019 11:07 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786432] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-00370-TSC filed by Bhavna D. Valambhia, Krishnakant D. Valambhia, Priscilla D. Valambhia, Punita D. Valambhia and Vipula D. Valambhia. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7040. [19-7040] [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:58 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1791177] filed by Bank of Tanzania, Ministry of Defence and National Service and United Republic of Tanzania [Service Date: 06/05/2019 ] [19-7040] (Martin, Lawrence) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791176] filed by Lawrence H. Martin on behalf of Appellees Bank of Tanzania, Ministry of Defence and National Service and United Republic of Tanzania. [19-7040] (Martin, Lawrence) [Entered: 06/05/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1790784] filed by Bhavna D. Valambhia, Krishnakant D. Valambhia, Priscilla D. Valambhia, Punita D. Valambhia and Vipula D. Valambhia [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-7040] (Parenti, Meredith) [Entered: 06/03/2019 07:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1790783] filed by Bhavna D. Valambhia, Krishnakant D. Valambhia, Priscilla D. Valambhia, Punita D. Valambhia and Vipula D. Valambhia [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ] [19-7040] (Parenti, Meredith) [Entered: 06/03/2019 07:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1790769] filed by Bhavna D. Valambhia, Krishnakant D. Valambhia, Priscilla D. Valambhia, Punita D. Valambhia and Vipula D. Valambhia [Service Date: 06/03/2019 ] [19-7040] (Parenti, Meredith) [Entered: 06/03/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1790540] submitted by Bhavna D. Valambhia, Krishnakant D. Valambhia, Priscilla D. Valambhia, Punita D. Valambhia and Vipula D. Valambhia [Service Date: 06/02/2019 ] [19-7040] (Parenti, Meredith) [Entered: 06/02/2019 06:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1790539] filed by Bhavna D. Valambhia, Krishnakant D. Valambhia, Priscilla D. Valambhia, Vipula D. Valambhia and Punita D. Valambhia [Service Date: 06/02/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-7040] (Parenti, Meredith) [Entered: 06/02/2019 06:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING STATEMENT [1790538] filed by Bhavna D. Valambhia, Krishnakant D. Valambhia, Priscilla D. Valambhia, Punita D. Valambhia and Vipula D. Valambhia [Service Date: 06/02/2019 ] [19-7040] (Parenti, Meredith) [Entered: 06/02/2019 06:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1790537] filed by Meredith Parenti on behalf of Appellants Bhavna D. Valambhia, Krishnakant D. Valambhia, Priscilla D. Valambhia, Punita D. Valambhia and Vipula D. Valambhia. [19-7040] (Parenti, Meredith) [Entered: 06/02/2019 06:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1786443] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/06/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/21/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/06/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/06/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/06/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/21/2019 [19-7040] [Entered: 05/07/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786432] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-00370-TSC filed by Bhavna D. Valambhia, Krishnakant D. Valambhia, Priscilla D. Valambhia, Punita D. Valambhia and Vipula D. Valambhia. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7040. [19-7040] [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-7040] [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.