Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/27/2021 at 06:16:34 (UTC).

Vineyard v. University Health Systems

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Vineyard filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against University Health Systems. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-51044

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Bryan Alsip, in their individual and official capacity, Chief Medical Officer, University Health Systems

Bexar County Adult Detention Center, in their individual and official capacity

Howard Huber, in their individual and official capacity, Nurse, University Health Systems Detention Unit in BCADC

Olga Ali, in their individual and official capacity, Nurse Practictioner, University Health Systems Infirmary in BCADC

Sandra Wright, in their individual and official capacity, Nurse, University Health Systems Medical Pods (L.A.), University Health Systems Detention Unit in BCADC

University Health Systems, in their individual and official capacity, Correctional Care Health Services (Detention Unit in BCADC)

Jessica Yao, in their individual and official capacity, Physician's Assistant/Coordinator of Infirmary, University Health Systems Detention Unit in BCADC

Plaintiff / Appellant

Jay B. Vineyard

Henderson, TX 75653-8000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Laura Anne Cavaretta

Attorney at Cavaretta, Katona & Leighner, P.L.L.C.

700 N. Saint Mary'S Street

San Antonio, TX 78205

Lisa Arch Rocheleau

Attorney at Boone, Rocheleau & Rodriguez, P.L.L.C.

10101 Reunion Place

San Antonio, TX 78216

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jay B. Vineyard

Attorney at MTC East Texas Treatment Facility

P.O. Box 8000

Henderson, TX 75653-8000

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Special Letter

Open Restricted Document #1

Letter dated 02/12/2021

Open Document #2

MDT-1 Letter

Open Document #1

DIS-4 Order

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Jay B. Vineyard to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [9497537-2]. [20-51044] (CNF) [Entered: 02/04/2021 02:35 PM]

Open Document

LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: General Order 2020-7 rescinded [20-51044] (CBW) [Entered: 01/26/2021 12:00 PM]

Open Restricted Document #2

Special Letter

Open Restricted Document #1

Letter of 01/20/2021

Open Document #2

BR-9 Letter

Open Document #1

Unfiled Document

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Review after Fee Issue is Resolved (PLRA case). [9476354-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 03/02/2021 for Appellant Jay B. Vineyard [20-51044] (CBW) [Entered: 01/06/2021 02:55 PM]

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Jay B. Vineyard [20-51044] (RSM) [Entered: 12/29/2020 11:48 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: to provide a copy of the court's rules and procedures. Also advising appelllant a motion to dismiss the appeal was filed on February 4, 2021 [20-51044] (CNF) [Entered: 02/17/2021 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 filed by Appellant Mr. Jay B. Vineyard [ # 9497537-2 ] [20-51044] (CNF) [Entered: 02/04/2021 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Jay B. Vineyard to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [9497537-2]. [20-51044] (CNF) [Entered: 02/04/2021 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: General Order 2020-7 rescinded [20-51044] (CBW) [Entered: 01/26/2021 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: responding to our previous correspondence. It is unclear if he is asking to dismiss the appeal [20-51044] (CNF) [Entered: 01/25/2021 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the document entitled "Copy of notice of appeal with evidence requesting certificate oa eppealability, etc." received from Appellant Mr. Jay B. Vineyard. We cannot determine the specific relief being requested. The appeal is proceeding PLRA, a COA is not required. [20-51044] (CNF) [Entered: 01/07/2021 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Review after Fee Issue is Resolved (PLRA case). [9476354-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 03/02/2021 for Appellant Jay B. Vineyard [20-51044] (CBW) [Entered: 01/06/2021 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Jay B. Vineyard [20-51044] (RSM) [Entered: 12/29/2020 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less