This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/20/2020 at 06:14:52 (UTC).

Vincent Jester v. Emerson Climate Technologies,, et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 Vincent Jester filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Emerson Climate Technologies. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-13147

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

VINCENT JESTER

Defendant / Appellees

EMERSON CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

JOHN DOE C

EMERSON ELECTRIC COMPANY, d.b.a. Fusite

JOHN DOE A

JOHN DOE B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Maha Yousef Amircani

Attorney at Amircani Law, LLC

Po Box 905132

Atlanta, GA 30377

Houston Dillard Smith III

Attorney at Link & Smith, PC

2142 Vista Dale Ct

Tucker, GA 30084-5417

Mark Link

Attorney at Link & Smith, PC

2142 Vista Dale Ct

Tucker, GA 30084-5417

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Melody H. Eagan

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35203

James Darren Summerville

Attorney at The Summerville Firm, LLC

1226 Ponce De Leon Ave

Atlanta, GA 30306

Adam K. Peck

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Christopher Cameron Yearout

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Anna Green Cross

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Maxwell Kent Thelen

Attorney at The Summerville Firm, LLC

1226 Ponce De Leon Ave

Atlanta, GA 30306

William H. Brooks

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35203

Christopher C. Yearout

Attorney at Lightfoot Franklin & White, LLC

400 20Th St N

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Appearance of counsel form not processed

Open Document #1

ATTY-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

USDC Order- doc #28

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Vincent Jester. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/16/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 10/06/2020 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPTS FILED. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Viola Zborowski, Filer: Vincent Jester, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 02/14/2020. [Entered: 10/06/2020 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 09/24/2020 05:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Reporter Acknowledgment filed. Transcript Order: Court Reporter Viola S. Zborowski, 09/04/2020, Vincent Jester, Pre-Trial Proceedings 02/14/2020. [Entered: 09/23/2020 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13147] (ECF: Christopher Yearout) [Entered: 09/22/2020 05:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Anna Green Cross for EMR and Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission. [Entered: 09/10/2020 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Anna G. Cross for Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., and Emerson Electric Co. --- Anna Green Cross for Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. and EMR. [20-13147] (ECF: Maxwell Thelen) [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Darren Summerville for Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., and Emerson Electric Co. --- James Darren Summerville for Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. and EMR. [20-13147] (ECF: Maxwell Thelen) [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Maxwell K. Thelen for Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc., and Emerson Electric Co. [20-13147] (ECF: Maxwell Thelen) [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Chris C. Yearout for Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. and EMR. [20-13147] (ECF: Christopher Yearout) [Entered: 09/08/2020 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Melody H. Eagan for Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. and EMR. [20-13147] (ECF: Melody Eagan) [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by William H. Brooks for Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. and Emerson Electric Co. [20-13147] (ECF: William Brooks) [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Adam K. Peck for Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. and EMR. [20-13147] (ECF: Adam Peck) [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM PROCESSED. Transcript Order: Filer: Vincent Jester, Court Reporter: Unknown Reporter, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Proceedings 02/14/2020. [Entered: 09/10/2020 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Mark Link for Appellant Vincent Jester. Transcript(s) ordered. [20-13147] (ECF: Mark Link) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Mark Link for Appellant Vincent Jester. [20-13147] (ECF: Mark Link) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mark Link for Appellant Vincent Jester. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-13147] (ECF: Mark Link) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Mark Link represents the appellant Vincent Jester Mark Link for Vincent Jester. [20-13147] (ECF: Mark Link) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 08/21/2020 as to Appellant Vincent Jester. [Entered: 08/25/2020 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Vincent Jester on 08/21/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/04/2020 as to Appellant Vincent Jester. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/18/2020 as to Appellee Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. [Entered: 08/25/2020 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMERSON CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Emerson Electric Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Darren Summerville