This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 05:33:59 (UTC).

Vincent Foggey v. City of Chicago

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Vincent Foggey filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against City of Chicago. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1247

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

VINCENT T. FOGGEY

Defendant / Appellee

CITY OF CHICAGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Leonard Mungo

Attorney at MUNGO & MUNGO AT LAW, PLLC

31700 Telegraph

Bingham Farms, MI 48025

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

C. Ester Choi

Attorney at CITY OF CHICAGO LAW DEPARTMENT

30 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60602-0000

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) Appearance form filed by Attorney MYRIAM ZRECZNY KASPER for Appellee City of Chicago. [2] [7062716] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-1247] (Kasper, Myriam) [Entered: 02/14/2020 04:23 PM]

#1

Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Appearance form filed by Attorney MYRIAM ZRECZNY KASPER for Appellee City of Chicago. [2] [7062716] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-1247] (Kasper, Myriam) [Entered: 02/14/2020 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 02/27/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/24/2020 for Vincent T. Foggey. [1] [7062234] [20-1247] (AG) [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.