This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/31/2022 at 06:08:56 (UTC).

Vida Skin Care, Inc., et al v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 Vida Skin Care, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-55540

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

VIDA SKIN CARE, INC., a California corporation

SARINE MARIE, INC., a California corporation

DEIRMENJIAN DENTAL GROUP, INC., DBA Desert Dental Group

VICTORVILLE GENERAL

VICTORVILLE PED

VICTORVILLE ORTHO

HESPERIA GENERAL

HESPERIA CHILDREN'S, a California corporation

EUROPEAN & AYKMAN JEWELRY INC., a California corporation

MAMUSHI, INC.

ROYAL PROJECT, LLC

BOSH-ISH CORP, DBA Fresh Cleaners & Alterations

A NEW LOOK PRINTING, INC., a California corporation

STEPHAN GRIGORIAN MD, INC.

ANCORA CASTINGS, a California corporation

BRITTON CHIROPRACTIC, LLC

CARLOS & CATHY HAMPARSUMIAN, DBA Bubble Cuts

HAROUT ZHAMKOCHYAN, DBA Tux Station

MGR ENTERPRISES, INC., a California corporation

RAHMATOLAH & BETY RASHIDIDOST

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Eileen Keusseyan

Attorney at Law Offices of Eileen Keusseyan

16530 Ventura Blvd., Suite 555

Encino, CA 91436

Natalie Siran Hairabedian Esquire

Attorney at The Keosian Law Group

16530 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 555

Encino, CA 91436

Melkon Melkonian

Attorney at Keosian Berberian LLP

16530 Ventura Boulevard

Encino, CA 91436

Other Attorneys

Robyn C. Crowther

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

633 W 5Th Street, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Johanna Dennehy

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Tadhg Dooley

Attorney at Wiggin & Dana, LLP

265 Church Street, One Century Tower

New Haven, CT 06510-7001

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants A New Look Printing, Inc., Ancora Castings, Atikan, Inc., Bad II, LLC, Barbara A James, D.D.S., Bosh-Ish Corp, Britton Chiropractic, LLC, Carlos & Cathy Hamparsumian, Deirmenjian Dental Group, Inc., European & Aykman Jewelry Inc., Harmony Dental Group, Hesperia Children's, Hesperia General, Image Cube, Inc., Juliette Rose Catering, LLC, Sarkis Kardoudrian, Mamushi, Inc., MGR Enterprises, Inc., Mike Naderi & Reza Naderi, Nooshin Majd, DMD, MSD, Inc., Rahmatolah & Bety Rashididost, Royal Project, LLC, Sarah Zirakzadeh, DDS, Sarine Marie, Inc., Prapion Sousani, Stephan Grigorian MD, Inc., Victorville General, Victorville Ortho, Victorville Ped, Vida Skin Care, Inc., Watch City, Inc. and Harout Zhamkochyan Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/03/2022. [12463090] [22-55540] (Keusseyan, Eileen) [Entered: 06/03/2022 01:07 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 06/21/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12465551] (VS) [Entered: 06/07/2022 01:44 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellants' opening brief is due September 06, 2022; appellees' answering brief is due October 06, 2022; appellants' optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [12484046] (WL) [Entered: 06/30/2022 12:44 PM]

#8

(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 08/04/2022, 2:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [12484143] (VS) [Entered: 06/30/2022 01:40 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 08/04/2022, 2:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [12484143] (VS) [Entered: 06/30/2022 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellants' opening brief is due September 06, 2022; appellees' answering brief is due October 06, 2022; appellants' optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief. [12484046] (WL) [Entered: 06/30/2022 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Docket(#6) Added Attorney Tadhg Dooley for Appellee Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., in case 22-55540. [12470691] (HH) [Entered: 06/14/2022 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Tadhg Dooley (Wiggin and Dana LLP, One Century Tower, 265 Church Street, New Haven, CT 06510) for Appellee Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. Date of service: 06/14/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12470647] [22-55540] (Dooley, Tadhg) [Entered: 06/14/2022 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 06/21/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12465551] (VS) [Entered: 06/07/2022 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/03/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12463546]. [22-55540] (AD) [Entered: 06/03/2022 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants A New Look Printing, Inc., Ancora Castings, Atikan, Inc., Bad II, LLC, Barbara A James, D.D.S., Bosh-Ish Corp, Britton Chiropractic, LLC, Carlos & Cathy Hamparsumian, Deirmenjian Dental Group, Inc., European & Aykman Jewelry Inc., Harmony Dental Group, Hesperia Children's, Hesperia General, Image Cube, Inc., Juliette Rose Catering, LLC, Sarkis Kardoudrian, Mamushi, Inc., MGR Enterprises, Inc., Mike Naderi & Reza Naderi, Nooshin Majd, DMD, MSD, Inc., Rahmatolah & Bety Rashididost, Royal Project, LLC, Sarah Zirakzadeh, DDS, Sarine Marie, Inc., Prapion Sousani, Stephan Grigorian MD, Inc., Victorville General, Victorville Ortho, Victorville Ped, Vida Skin Care, Inc., Watch City, Inc. and Harout Zhamkochyan Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/03/2022. [12463090] [22-55540] (Keusseyan, Eileen) [Entered: 06/03/2022 01:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants A New Look Printing, Inc., Ancora Castings, Atikan, Inc., Bad II, LLC, Barbara A James, D.D.S., Bosh-Ish Corp, Britton Chiropractic, LLC, Carlos & Cathy Hamparsumian, Deirmenjian Dental Group, Inc., European & Aykman Jewelry Inc., Harmony Dental Group, Hesperia Children's, Hesperia General, Image Cube, Inc., Juliette Rose Catering, LLC, Sarkis Kardoudrian, MGR Enterprises, Inc., Mamushi, Inc., Mike Naderi & Reza Naderi, Nooshin Majd, DMD, MSD, Inc., Rahmatolah & Bety Rashididost, Royal Project, LLC, Sarah Zirakzadeh, DDS, Sarine Marie, Inc., Prapion Sousani, Stephan Grigorian MD, Inc., Victorville General, Victorville Ortho, Victorville Ped, Vida Skin Care, Inc., Watch City, Inc. and Harout Zhamkochyan Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/08/2022. Appellants A New Look Printing, Inc., Ancora Castings, Atikan, Inc., Bad II, LLC, Barbara A James, D.D.S., Bosh-Ish Corp, Britton Chiropractic, LLC, Carlos & Cathy Hamparsumian, Deirmenjian Dental Group, Inc., European & Aykman Jewelry Inc., Harmony Dental Group, Hesperia Children's, Hesperia General, Image Cube, Inc., Juliette Rose Catering, LLC, Sarkis Kardoudrian, MGR Enterprises, Inc., Mamushi, Inc., Mike Naderi & Reza Naderi, Nooshin Majd, DMD, MSD, Inc., Rahmatolah & Bety Rashididost, Royal Project, LLC, Sarah Zirakzadeh, DDS, Sarine Marie, Inc., Prapion Sousani, Stephan Grigorian MD, Inc., Victorville General, Victorville Ortho, Victorville Ped, Vida Skin Care, Inc., Watch City, Inc. and Harout Zhamkochyan opening brief due 08/01/2022. Appellees Does and Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. answering brief due 08/29/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12461504] (JMR) [Entered: 06/01/2022 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAMUSHI, INC., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Johanna Dennehy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robyn C. Crowther