This case was last updated from PACER on 04/09/2019 at 06:05:09 (UTC).

Victoria Handle v. Postmaster General of the Unit, et al

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 Victoria Handle filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Postmaster General of the Unit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1330

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

POSTMASTER GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES

UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE

Plaintiff / Appellant

VICTORIA HANDLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Anne B. Taylor Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

Camden Federal Building & Courthouse, 401 Market Street

Camden, NJ 08101

J. Andrew Ruymann Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

402 East State Street

Trenton, NJ 08608

Daniel J. Gibbons Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

970 Broad Street, Room 700

Newark, NJ 07102

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

David F. Corrigan Esq.

54B West Front Street

Keyport, NJ 07735

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

Open Document #1

Standing Order

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Victoria Handle advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-1330] (DFC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 05:16 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Victoria Handle, filed. [19-1330] (DFC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 05:15 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Victoria Handle, received. [19-1330] (DFC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 05:13 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David F. Corrigan on behalf of Appellant(s) Victoria Handle. [19-1330] (DFC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 05:09 PM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to David F. Corrigan, Esq. for Victoria Handle requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 03/21/2019. Information Statement on or before 03/21/2019. Concise Summary on or before 03/21/2019. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 03/21/2019. (PDB) [Entered: 03/07/2019 06:22 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Anne B. Taylor, AUSA on behalf of Appellee(s) POSTMASTER GENERAL, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE; UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. [19-1330] (ABT) [Entered: 02/12/2019 01:25 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J.ANDREW RUYMANN, CHIEF, CIVIL DIVISION on behalf of Appellee(s) POSTMASTER GENERAL, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE; UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. [19-1330] (JAR) [Entered: 02/12/2019 01:12 PM]

Open Document #10

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #9

Standing Order

Open Document #7

District Court Memorandum dated 081117

Open Document #6

District Court Opinion dated 011119

Open Document #5

District Court Opinion dated 043018

Open Document #4

District Court Order dated 011119

Open Document #3

District Court Oeder dated 043018

Open Document #2

District Court Order dated 081117

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Victoria Handle due on or before 05/07/2019. Appendix due on or before 05/07/2019. (PDB) [Entered: 03/28/2019 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Victoria Handle advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-1330] (DFC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Victoria Handle, filed. [19-1330] (DFC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Victoria Handle, received. [19-1330] (DFC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David F. Corrigan on behalf of Appellant(s) Victoria Handle. [19-1330] (DFC) [Entered: 03/21/2019 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to David F. Corrigan, Esq. for Victoria Handle requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 03/21/2019. Information Statement on or before 03/21/2019. Concise Summary on or before 03/21/2019. Transcript Purchase Order on or before 03/21/2019. (PDB) [Entered: 03/07/2019 06:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Anne B. Taylor, AUSA on behalf of Appellee(s) POSTMASTER GENERAL, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE; UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. [19-1330] (ABT) [Entered: 02/12/2019 01:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J.ANDREW RUYMANN, CHIEF, CIVIL DIVISION on behalf of Appellee(s) POSTMASTER GENERAL, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE; UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. [19-1330] (JAR) [Entered: 02/12/2019 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 02/08/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Victoria Handle in District Court No. 3-15-cv-08071. (PDB) [Entered: 02/08/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less