This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2019 at 06:07:29 (UTC).

Annette Williams v. Texas Children's Hospital

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 Annette Williams filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Texas Children's Hospital. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-20222

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

TEXAS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL

Plaintiff / Appellant

VICTORIA EAGLIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ruthie Nelson White

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, L.L.P.

1415 Louisiana Street, Wedge International Tower

Houston, TX 77002

Michael James Lombardino

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, L.L.P.

1415 Louisiana Street, Wedge International Tower

Houston, TX 77002

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Jakki A. Hansen

Attorney at Hansen Law Firm, P.C.

10190 Katy Freeway

Houston, TX 77043

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

QCBR-5 E-Filers Letter

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20222] (Michael James Lombardino ) [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:24 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/04/2019 for Appellant Victoria Eaglin. [19-20222] (CB) [Entered: 04/25/2019 01:06 PM]

Open Document #3

Record Excerpts Filed

Open Document #1

Paper Copies Form

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9027314-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/26/2019 for Appellant Victoria Eaglin [19-20222] (CSG) [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:23 AM]

Open Document #3

Appellant/Petitioner Brief Filed

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Jakki A. Hansen for Ms. Victoria Eaglin for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20222] (Jakki A. Hansen ) [Entered: 05/16/2019 03:57 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Ruthie Nelson White for Texas Children's Hospital for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20222] (Ruthie Nelson White ) [Entered: 04/29/2019 05:58 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Victoria Eaglin advising transcript unnecessary - no hearings. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-20222] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Victoria Eaglin advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 04/19/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Hansen; Attorney for Appellee: White [19-20222] (Jakki A. Hansen ) [Entered: 04/19/2019 01:34 PM]

Open Document #1

Brief Paper Copies Form

Open Document

CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Victoria Eaglin [19-20222] (CSG) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:00 PM]

Open Document #2

RE-5 Electronic Filers Letter

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS filed by Appellant Ms. Victoria Eaglin [ # 9067986-2 ] Date of service: 06/05/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Hansen; Attorney for Appellees: Lombardino, White [19-20222] (Jakki A. Hansen ) [Entered: 06/05/2019 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Appellant Ms. Victoria Eaglin [ # 9067981-2 ] Date of service: 06/05/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Hansen; Attorney for Appellees: Lombardino, White [19-20222] (Jakki A. Hansen ) [Entered: 06/05/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 06/10/2019 for Appellant Victoria Eaglin. [19-20222] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require: The court name to be corrected on the cover. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 06/18/2019 for Appellant Victoria Eaglin [19-20222] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Ms. Victoria Eaglin. Date of service: 06/04/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Hansen; Attorney for Appellees: Lombardino, White [19-20222] (Jakki A. Hansen ) [Entered: 06/04/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUFFICIENT APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 06/10/2019 for Appellant Victoria Eaglin. [19-20222] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires a proper court name on the cover. The Certificate of Compliance is out of order. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 06/18/2019 for Appellant Victoria Eaglin.. Appellee's Brief due on 07/05/2019 for Appellee Texas Children's Hospital [19-20222] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Victoria Eaglin. Date of service: 06/04/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Hansen; Attorney for Appellees: Lombardino, White [19-20222] (Jakki A. Hansen ) [Entered: 06/04/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jakki A. Hansen for Appellant Victoria Eaglin in 19-20222 [19-20222] (CAG) [Entered: 05/16/2019 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Jakki A. Hansen for Ms. Victoria Eaglin for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20222] (Jakki A. Hansen ) [Entered: 05/16/2019 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael James Lombardino for party(s) Appellee Texas Children's Hospital, in case 19-20222 [19-20222] (ABT) [Entered: 05/02/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20222] (Michael James Lombardino ) [Entered: 05/02/2019 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Ruthie Nelson White for Appellee Texas Children's Hospital in 19-20222 [19-20222] (ABT) [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Ruthie Nelson White for Texas Children's Hospital for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20222] (Ruthie Nelson White ) [Entered: 04/29/2019 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/04/2019 for Appellant Victoria Eaglin. [19-20222] (CB) [Entered: 04/25/2019 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20222] (CB) [Entered: 04/25/2019 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:17-CV-2245. Electronic ROA due on 05/07/2019. [19-20222] (ABT) [Entered: 04/22/2019 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Victoria Eaglin advising transcript unnecessary - no hearings. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-20222] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Victoria Eaglin advising transcript unnecessary Date of Service: 04/19/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Hansen; Attorney for Appellee: White [19-20222] (Jakki A. Hansen ) [Entered: 04/19/2019 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9027314-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/26/2019 for Appellant Victoria Eaglin [19-20222] (CSG) [Entered: 04/11/2019 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Victoria Eaglin [19-20222] (CSG) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.