This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2020 at 06:09:33 (UTC).

Victor Wilson v. Connie Horton

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Victor Wilson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Connie Horton. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1883

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

VICTOR LEON WILSON

Kincheloe, MI 49784

Respondent / Appellee

CONNIE HORTON, Warden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Victor Leon Wilson

Attorney at Chippewa Correctional Facility

4269 W. M-80

Kincheloe, MI 49784

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

17 #1

Letter

17 #2

miscellaneous letter sent

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Miscellaneous letter sent TO Mr. Wilson compliance with IFP forms. (RGF) [Entered: 10/14/2020 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Prisoner trust account statement filed. (RLJ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Financial Affidavit filed by Party Mr. Victor Leon Wilson Certificate of Service: 09/25/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Victor Leon Wilson to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 09/25/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Victor Leon Wilson to expedite decision on motion for certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 09/25/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Appellant Amended MOTION filed by Mr. Victor Leon Wilson to grant a certificate of appealability with supporting brief. Certificate of service: 09/25/2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER SENT to Mr. Victor Leon Wilson responding to his inquiry about ifp forms; case manager advised him to complete and return them by October 23, 2020. (RLJ) [Entered: 10/01/2020 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORRESPONDENCE: asking whether he should complete ifp packet sent to him by Mr. Victor Leon Wilson. (RLJ) [Entered: 09/30/2020 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Victor Leon Wilson to grant a certificate of appealability. Certificate of service: 09/17/2020. (RGF) [Entered: 09/23/2020 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Prisoner trust account statement filed. (RGF) [Entered: 09/23/2020 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Victor Leon Wilson to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 09/17/2020. (RGF) [Entered: 09/23/2020 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay appellate fee of $505.00 to the District or file a motion to proceed IFP in this Court on or before October 23, 2020. (RGF) [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Deficiency notice filed September 21, 2020. (RGF) [Entered: 09/21/2020 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Copy of Notice of Appeal from district court filed. (RGF) [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#16) Defendant not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (RGF) [Entered: 10/05/2020 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Mr. Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF) [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Prisoner Case Docketed with certificate of appealability denied August 28, 2020. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Victor Leon Wilson. Transcript needed: n. (RGF) [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less